Louisiana Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:John W Kolwe
Case #: 2:24-bk-20406
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
RFC Homes, LLC
171 Clark Rd
Dequincy, LA 70633-6205
Represented By
Wade N. Kelly
Packard Lapray
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
DIP
U.S. Trustee
Office of U. S. Trustee
300 Fannin St., Suite 3196
Shreveport, LA 71101


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:02 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
148 148 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 05/08 11:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 146 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
147 147 answer Objection Tue 05/06 2:27 PM
Objection to Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Lucy G. Sikes on behalf of Lucy G. Sikes (Ch 11 Sub V Trustee) (Sikes, Lucy)
Related: [-] 137 U. S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case, Motion to Convert Case From Chapter 7 to 11
146 146 order Expedite Hearing Tue 05/06 10:49 AM
Order Granting Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. (katc)
Related: [-] 144 Motion to Expedite Hearing Re:143 Application for Compensation/Administrative Expenses filed by Debtor RFC Homes, LLC
Sunday, May 04, 2025
145 145 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 05/04 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 141 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing
Friday, May 02, 2025
144 144 motion Expedite Hearing Fri 05/02 10:25 AM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of RFC Homes, LLC (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-] 143 Application for Compensation/Administrative Expenses
143 143 motion Compensation/Administrative Expenses Fri 05/02 10:23 AM
Application for Administrative Compensation/Expenses Requested for Wade N. Kelly in the Amount of Fees for $30,059.95 Expenses for $1,838.00 with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of RFC Homes, LLC (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Time & Expense Sheet
142 142 trustee Trustee's Notice of Withdrawal - Generic Fri 05/02 10:14 AM
Notice by Trustee of Withdrawal of Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of RFC Homes, LLC (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-] 139 Application for Compensation/Administrative Expenses
Thursday, May 01, 2025
141 141 order Expedite Hearing Fri 05/02 7:09 AM
Order Granting Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 10:30 AM at Courtroom, 2nd Floor, Lake Charles. (micc)
Related: [-] 139 Application for Compensation/Administrative Expenses filed by Debtor RFC Homes, LLC,140 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor RFC Homes, LLC
140 140 motion Expedite Hearing Thu 05/01 1:35 PM
Motion to Expedite Hearing Related [+] with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of RFC Homes, LLC (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-] 139 Application for Compensation/Administrative Expenses
139 139 motion Compensation/Administrative Expenses Thu 05/01 1:25 PM
Application for Administrative Compensation/Expenses Requested for Wade N. Kelly in the Amount of Fees for $30,059.95 Expenses for $1,838.00 with Certificate of Service Filed by Wade N. Kelly on behalf of RFC Homes, LLC (Kelly, Wade)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Time & Expense Sheet