Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas M Durkin
Case #: 1:24-cv-08026
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Terminated:Oct 31, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 2:39 AM CST
Defendant
The Partnerships and Unincorporated Associations Identified on Schedule A
Defendant
STRAWBERRY Store
Defendant
SUNNY NO.6 Store Store
Defendant
Shop1102273272 Store
Defendant
Shop1102284127 Store
Defendant
Shop1102298440 Store
Defendant
Shop1102300651 Store
Defendant
Shop1102302560 Store
Defendant
Shop1102314752 Store
Defendant
Shop1102336660 Store
Defendant
Shop1102346201 Store
Defendant
Shop1102375269 Store
Defendant
Shop1102376106 Store
Defendant
Shop1102410023 Store
Defendant
Shop1102440069 Store
Defendant
Shop1102469274 Store
Defendant
Shop1102473203 Store
Defendant
Shop1102475245 Store
Defendant
Shop1102526569 Store
Defendant
Shop1102546388 Store
Defendant
Shop1102563931 Store
Defendant
Shop1102566015 Store
Defendant
Shop1102589189 Store
Defendant
Shop1102601836 Store
Defendant
Shop1102636681 Store
Defendant
Shop1102671841 Store
Defendant
Shop1102675456 Store
Defendant
Shop1102680706 Store
Defendant
Shop1102688405 Store
Defendant
Shop1102690261 Store
Defendant
Shop1102702074 Store
Defendant
Shop1102706035 Store
Defendant
Shop1102710401 Store
Defendant
Shop1102712303 Store
Defendant
Shop1102717315 Store
Defendant
Shop1102718930 Store
Defendant
Shop1102726331 Store
Defendant
Shop1102733426 Store
Defendant
Shop1102765439 Store
Defendant
Shop1102813679 Store
Defendant
Shop1102842842 Store
Defendant
Shop1102859952 Store
Defendant
Shop1102884228 Store
Defendant
Shop1102898124 Store
Defendant
Shop1102909877 Store
Defendant
Shop1102929290 Store
Defendant
Shop1102964227 Store
Defendant
Shop1103010525 Store
Defendant
Shop1103012538 Store
Defendant
Shop1103052110 Store
Defendant
Shop1103079396 Store
Defendant
Shop1103311888 Store
Defendant
Shop1103326724 Store
Defendant
Shop1103330104 Store
Defendant
Shop1103378188 Store
Defendant
Shop1103424006 Store
Defendant
Shop1103512058 Store
Defendant
Shop1103517460 Store
Defendant
Shop1103529244 Store
Defendant
Shop1103532076 Store
Defendant
Shop1103532590 Store
Defendant
Shop1103554240 Store
Defendant
Shop1103572021 Store
Defendant
Shop1103592732 Store
Defendant
Shop1103597424 Store
Defendant
Shop1103600367 Store
Defendant
Shop1103603713 Store
Defendant
Shop1103615777 Store
Defendant
Shop1103619302 Store
Defendant
Shop1103677497 Store
Defendant
Shop1103677703 Store
Defendant
Shop1103685347 Store
Defendant
Shop1103690193 Store
Defendant
Shop1103711350 Store
Defendant
Shop1103724872 Store
Defendant
Shop1103729272 Store
Defendant
Shop1103739971 Store
Defendant
Shop1103742616 Store
Defendant
Shop1103743535 Store
Defendant
Shop1103743952 Store
Defendant
Shop1103746540 Store
Defendant
Shop1103746677 Store
Defendant
Shop1103748141 Store
Defendant
Shop1103749189 Store
Defendant
Shop1103754399 Store
Defendant
Shop1103777463 Store
Defendant
Shop1103790216 Store
Defendant
Shop1103803131 Store
Defendant
Shop1103811500 Store
Defendant
Shop1103833453 Store
Defendant
Shop1103846844 Store
Defendant
Shop1103857921 Store
Defendant
Shop1103882850 Store
Defendant
Shop1103911020 Store
Defendant
Shop1103921063 Store
Defendant
Shop1815334 Store
Defendant
Shop1850782 Store
Defendant
Shop3486010 Store
Defendant
Shop4217035 Store
Defendant
Shop4485050 Store
Defendant
Shop5003081 Store
Defendant
Shop5092018 Store
Defendant
Shop5134078 Store
Defendant
Shop5248056 Store
Defendant
Shop5249058 Store
Defendant
Shop5726018 Store
Defendant
Shop5797016 Store
Defendant
Shop5871401 Store
Defendant
Shop5888910 Store
Defendant
Shop5952044 Store
Defendant
Shop824382 Store
Defendant
Shop910447251 Store
Defendant
Shop910897019 Store
Defendant
Shop911425247 Store
Defendant
Shop912661528 Store
Defendant
Small Frogs Store Store
Defendant
Smil 21650065 Store
Defendant
Spring Girl Store
Defendant
Star Card Animation Store
Defendant
Stefanie2022 Store
Defendant
StickerPlus Store
Defendant
Strange Treasures And Treasures Store
Defendant
Stuffed Toys Store
Defendant
Sunny Clothing Store Store
Defendant
SunnyToys Store
Defendant
Sunshine Toys Store
Defendant
Super Factory Official Store
Defendant
Swallow Art Store
Defendant
TAKARA TOMY PERIPHERY Store
Defendant
TAKARATOMY Star Store
Defendant
TAYLOR-SWIFT Store
Defendant
TEES HOLIC Store
Defendant
TENSUKA Store
Defendant
TH11 Elements Store
Defendant
TIM-1 Store
Defendant
TMJUMP Pro Store
Defendant
TOPGLOBAL Store
Defendant
TOPWISDOM Store
Defendant
TT Sky Cosplay Store
Defendant
Takara Tomy 1 Store
Defendant
TeeTee Temple Store
Defendant
Textile Online Store
Defendant
The Fifth Temptation Store
Defendant
The House Art
Defendant
The man2018 Store
Defendant
TheOne Decorative Store
Defendant
TianMao Store
Defendant
Torankusu Toy Store
Defendant
Toy Shop For Stir Frying Meat Store
Defendant
Toy Town Store
Defendant
Toy2204 Store
Defendant
Trendy Anime Figure Store
Defendant
TumiOvO Store
Defendant
Two Dimensional Anime Figure Model Store
Defendant
UHAPPEE TEES Store
Defendant
Unisex Custom T-Shirt Store
Defendant
Visual Cloth Painting Store
Defendant
Vogee Store
Defendant
Waiker Store
Defendant
Wall Poster And Prints Store
Defendant
Wholesale toys Store
Defendant
Win-Win Decor Store
Defendant
Wind Chime Store
Defendant
Wonderland Toy Store Store
Defendant
Wuxia World Store
Defendant
X137 Toy Store Store
Defendant
XuBaby Store
Defendant
YAYI Toys Store
Defendant
YGJZ Figure Toys Store
Defendant
YKES Store
Defendant
YLCOS Store
Defendant
YM Good Cotton Clothes Store
Defendant
YOYOUME Store
Defendant
YO~YO Store
Defendant
Yihan baby toy Store
Defendant
Yinuoda Design Phone Case Store
Defendant
Yinuoda Home Decor Store
Defendant
YoGlod-02 Store
Defendant
Yorozuya Anime Clothing Store
Defendant
You Qian-09 Store
Defendant
You are not alone Store
Defendant
Ypodscap Store
Defendant
Yu Gi Oh Cards Store
Defendant
Yuan Yuan Toy Plush Store
Defendant
ZHYYYYYY Store
Defendant
ZOro Anime Toys Store
Defendant
ZSIIBO MiNiZo Store
Defendant
ZW-TOYS Store
Defendant
ZheJiang Xincheng Trading Co. Ltd.
Defendant
ZhiZaoSi Hanfu Clothing And Costume Store
Defendant
Zoeybaby Store
Defendant
switheskeys Store
Defendant
syukukaNetwork Store
Defendant
taotao14 Store
Defendant
tesee Store
Defendant
yuan8888 Store
Defendant
zl1993 Store
Plaintiff
Ground Works Co., Ltd.
Represented By
Yi Bu
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Adam Grodman
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Christopher Romero
Jiangip, LLC
contact info
Keith A. Vogt
Keith Vogt, Ltd.
contact info
Monica Rita Martin
Jiang Ip LLC
contact info
Yanling Jiang
contact info
Plaintiff
Khara Inc.
Represented By
Yi Bu
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Cameron Eugene Mcintyre
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Adam Grodman
Jiangip LLC
contact info
Christopher Romero
Jiangip, LLC
contact info
Keith A. Vogt
Keith Vogt, Ltd.
contact info
Monica Rita Martin
Jiang Ip LLC
contact info
Yanling Jiang
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/22/2024 9:53 AM CST
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Keri L. Holleb Hotaling. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 2). (men, )
Related: [-]
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 73.1(b), a United States Magistrate Judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action. If all parties consent to have the currently assigned United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings in this case, including trial, the entry of final judgment, and all post-trial proceedings, all parties must sign their names on the attached[LINK:Consent To] [LINK:form. This consent form is eligible for filing only if executed by all parties. The parties can also express their consent to jurisdiction by a magistrate judge in any joint filing, including the Joint Initial Status Report or proposed Case Management Order. (men, )
Related: [-]
1 1 19 pgs COMPLAINT filed by Khara Inc., Ground Works Co., Ltd.; Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AILNDC-22435371.(Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
2 2 SEALED DOCUMENT by Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. Schedule A to Complaint 1 (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
3 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
4 4 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. by Keith A. Vogt (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. by Adam Grodman (Grodman, Adam)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. by Cameron Eugene Mcintyre (Mcintyre, Cameron)
Related: [-]
7 7 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. by Christopher Romero (Romero, Christopher)
Related: [-]
8 8 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. by Monica Rita Martin (Martin, Monica)
Related: [-]
9 9 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. by Yanling Jiang (Jiang, Yanling)
Related: [-]
10 10 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. by Yi Bu (Bu, Yi)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. for leave to file under seal (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
13 13 MOTION by Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. for leave to file excess pages (Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
15 15 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of 14 Exparte Motion(Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Keith A. Vogt,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1-4, of Keith A. Vogt's Declaration,
Att: 3 Declaration of Yasuhiro Kamimura,
Att: 4 Exhibit 1, of Yasuhiro Kamimura's Declaration
16 16 SEALED EXHIBIT by Plaintiffs Ground Works Co., Ltd., Khara Inc. Sealed Exhibit 2, Declaration of Yasuhiro Kamimura regarding memorandum in support of motion,15(Vogt, Keith)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2-1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2-3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2-4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 2-5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 2-6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 2-7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2-8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 2-9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 2-10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 2-11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 2-12