Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:24-bk-40622

Kansas Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Dale L Somers
Case #: 5:24-ap-07010
Nature of Suit63 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(8), student loan
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
United States Department of Education
Represented By
United States Department of Education
contact info
Plaintiff
Chante S Neaves-Forbus
1324 Southwest Western Avenue Apt 11
Topeka, KS 66604
Represented By
Chante S Neaves-Forbus
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 1:07 PM CDT
Thursday, January 23, 2025
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/23 2:21 PM
Adversary Case 5:24-ap-7010 Closed . (tms)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/13 3:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 01/10/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Dismissing Case - AP
9 9 court Returned Mail Fri 01/10 9:25 AM
Returned Mail Related [+]. (tms)
Related: [-] 8 Order Dismissing an Adversary Proceeding. Signed on 1/8/2025 (tms)
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
8 8 order Dismissing Case - AP Wed 01/08 4:33 PM
Order Dismissing an Adversary Proceeding. Signed on 1/8/2025 (tms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Thu 12/19 11:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] Notice Date 12/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Show Cause
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
6 6 court Returned Mail Wed 12/18 1:49 PM
Returned Mail Related [+]. (tms)
Related: [-] 5 Order to Appear and Show Cause Failure to effect service. Written response due 12/31/2024. Signed on 12/17/2024 (tms)
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
5 5 order Show Cause Tue 12/17 11:27 AM
Order to Appear and Show Cause Failure to effect service. Written response due 12/31/2024. Signed on 12/17/2024 (tms)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 09/13 9:33 AM
Summons Issued on United States Department of Education Date Issued 9/13/2024, Answer Due 10/15/2024 . (tms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Request Fri 09/13 9:30 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Chante S Neaves-Forbus - summons(es) requested on United States Department of Education (tms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
2 2 cmp Summons Request Wed 09/04 9:12 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons(es) by Chante S Neaves-Forbus - summons(es) requested on United States Department of Education [summons contains incorrect address for clerk, corrected summons requested] (tbc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/04 8:37 AM
Adversary case 24-07010 Complaint by Chante S Neaves-Forbus against United States Department of Education . Receipt Number WAIVED, Fee Amount $350 Nature(s) of Suit: (63 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(8), student loan)) (tbc)
Related: [-]