Kansas District Court
Judge:John W Lungstrum
Referred: Gwynne E Birzer
Case #: 5:24-cv-04088
Nature of Suit120 Contract - Marine
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Terminated:Sep 30, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 2:43 AM CST
Defendant
Joyce Rakestraw
84 SW Pepper Tree Lane
Topeka, KS 66611
Plaintiff
The Standard Fire Insurance Company
Kansas Insurance Commissioner 420 SW 9th Street
Topeka, KS 66612
Represented By
Robert L. Brady
Watters Wolf Bub & Hansmann LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Monday, September 30, 2024
5 5 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 09/30 2:01 PM
ORDERED - Plaintiff's4 motion to dismiss the action is hereby granted, and this action is hereby dismissed with prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a), with plaintiff to bear all costs. Signed by District Judge John W. Lungstrum on 9/30/2024. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss Mon 09/30 12:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff The Standard Fire Insurance Company (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Thu 09/05 11:19 AM
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge John W. Lungstrum and Magistrate Judge Gwynne E. Birzer for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE AVAILABILITY: A United States magistrate judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action if all parties voluntarily consent. Information & consent forms are available at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/civil-forms/notice-consent-and-reference-civil-action-magistrate-judge (nac)
Related: [-]
service Summons Issued Thu 09/05 11:23 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Joyce Rakestraw. (issued to Attorney for service) Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge Form provided to counsel for service with complaint. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (nac)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
3 3 misc Designation of Place of Trial Wed 09/04 3:13 PM
DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff The Standard Fire Insurance Company - trial to be held in Topeka. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/04 3:10 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (attorney) Wed 09/04 3:08 PM
COMPLAINT with trial location of Topeka ( Filing fee $405, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-6457543.), filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company.(Brady, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2