Jackson v. Terrace Gardens Nursing Center LLC et al.
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | J Philip Calabrese |
Case #: | 1:24-mc-00043 |
Case Filed: | Aug 30, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 05, 2024 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, September 05, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Minutes of proceedings before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. A telephone status conference was conducted on September 5, 2024 on Plaintiff's Motion to Quash the Subpoena for Barbara Barnette's Deposition and Request for Documents. Counsel for Defendants stated the subpoena has been withdrawn. Plaintiff's counsel agreed and stated that the Motion to quash is therefore moot. Accordingly, Plaintiffs Motion to Quash (Doc No.1 ) is dismissed as moot. Referral terminated. Time: 15 minutes. (D,Ky) |
|
oth_evt
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge
Thu 09/05 9:09 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (R,AP) |
||
order
Order of Referral
Thu 09/05 9:13 AM
Order: [non-document] Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), Rule 72(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and Local Rule 72.1, the Magistrate Judge may hear and decide all pretrial matters not dispositive of any party's claim or defense and, where appropriate, issue a written order stating the decision. Therefore, the Court REFERS this matter to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg to resolve any pretrial matters the parties may raise in connection with these proceedings. Judge J. Philip Calabrese on 9/5/2024. (D,I) |
||
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
utility
Add and Terminate Judge
Wed 09/04 3:33 PM
Judge J. Philip Calabrese assigned to case. (F,AW) |
||
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Motion to Quash the Subpoena for Barbara Barnette's Deposition and Request for Documents filed by Plaintiff Joy Jackson. Filing fee $52.00 paid, receipt #153732.(F,AW) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |