Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Jeffrey P Norman
Case #: 4:24-bk-34142
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Dismissed:Mar 24, 2025
Terminated:May 02, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$500,001 to $1 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Air Starter Components, Inc.
13935 Stafford Road
Stafford, TX 77477
Represented By
Russell Van Beustring
Attorney At Law
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 9:26 PM CST
Creditor
Ally Bank c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC
4515 N Santa Fe Ave. Dept. APS
Oklahoma City, OK 73118
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Jeannie Lee Andresen P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Jeannie Lee Andresen
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
George Morales
Represented By
Donald Patrick Arthur Yarborough
Foster Yarborough PLLC
contact info
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Office of the US Trustee 515 Rusk Ave Ste 3516
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Hector Duran, Jr
U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 16 minutes ago
Sunday, May 04, 2025
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 05/04 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Generic Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 order Generic Order Fri 05/02 10:43 AM
Order Closing Case Signed on 5/2/2025 (srh4)
Related: [-]
court Close Bankruptcy Case Fri 05/02 10:44 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (srh4)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
27 27 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Mon 04/14 6:01 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 3/24/2025, $300621 disbursed (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/26 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 32. Notice Date 03/26/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Order on U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case
Monday, March 24, 2025
25 25 2 pgs order Order on U.S. Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Mon 03/24 8:58 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case With Prejudice Related [+] Barred Debtor Air Starter Components, Inc. starting 3/24/2025 to 9/20/2025. Signed on 3/24/2025. (trc4)
Related: [-] 21
Friday, March 21, 2025
24 24 misc Proposed Order Fri 03/21 3:20 PM
Proposed Order RE: (Filed By US Trustee ) Related [+] (Duran, Hector)
Related: [-] 21 US Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case
Thursday, March 20, 2025
23 23 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Thu 03/20 2:04 PM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 2/28/2025, $419142 disbursed (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/07 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 33. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 US Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
21 21 6 pgs motion US Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case (BNC NOTICING) Tue 03/04 8:04 PM
US Trustee's Motion to Dismiss Case Filed by U.S. Trustee US Trustee Hearing scheduled for 4/8/2025 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (Duran, Hector)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Service List
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, March 03, 2025
20 20 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Mon 03/03 7:03 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 1/31/2025, $437117 disbursed (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix bank stmt
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
19 19 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Wed 01/29 7:12 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 12/31/2024, $322714 disbursed (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Wed 01/29 7:11 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 11/30/2024, $431639 disbursed (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Wed 01/29 7:10 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 10/31/2024, $396997 disbursed (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
16 16 audio MP3 Wed 11/06 12:30 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/6/2024 11:04:14 AM ]. File Size [ 808 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:41 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Courtroom Minutes Wed 11/06 11:44 AM
Courtroom Minutes. Time Hearing Held: 11:00. Appearances: Russell Van Beustring for Air Starter Components Inc., US Trustee Hector Duran. Related [+] Status Conference held. Court takes no action. (srh4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
14 14 misc Cash Flow Statement Tue 11/05 4:16 PM
Cash Flow Statement for Small Business (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Tax Documents Tue 11/05 4:10 PM
Tax Documents for the Year 2022. Tax documents are available for reviewing in the office of the clerk (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
12 12 misc Operating Report - Debtor-in-Possession Monthly Tue 10/29 10:55 AM
Debtor-In-Possession Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period ending 9/30/2024, $355701 disbursed (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
11 11 misc Equity Security Holders Tue 10/08 8:11 AM
Equity Security Holders (Filed By Air Starter Components, Inc. ). (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors Held Tue 10/08 11:10 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held. Debtor appeared. Hearing concluded on 10/8/2024. Related [+] (Duran, Hector)
Related: [-] 2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 09/11 9:53 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Donald Patrick Arthur Yarborough Filed by on behalf of George Morales (Yarborough, Donald Patrick)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 09/10 7:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Donald Patrick Arthur Yarborough Filed by on behalf of George Morales (Yarborough, Donald Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 09/09 4:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Jeannie Lee Andresen Filed by on behalf of Fort Bend County (Andresen, Jeannie)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors) Mon 09/09 5:58 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ally Bank c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC (Sharma, Amitkumar)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Creditors) Mon 09/09 5:55 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ally Bank c/o AIS Portfolio Services, LLC (Sharma, Amitkumar)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 07, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 09/07 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Hearing
4 4 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sat 09/07 11:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 31. Notice Date 09/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set
Thursday, September 05, 2024
3 3 order Setting Hearing Thu 09/05 2:07 PM
Order to Debtor-In-Possession in a Small Business Case and Setting Status Conference Signed on 9/5/2024 Related [+] Status conference to be held on 11/6/2024 at 11:00 AM at Houston, Courtroom 403 (JPN). (trc4)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
2 2 trustee Chapter 11 Meeting of Creditors for Corporate Debtor Set (BNC NOTICING) Thu 09/05 9:36 AM
Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 for Non-Individual Debtor Set 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/8/2024 at 10:00 AM, US Trustee Houston Teleconference. Proofs of Claims due by 1/6/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 3/4/2025. (Duran, Hector)
Related: [-]
trustee Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/05 9:25 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Hector Duran Jr (Duran, Hector)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
1 1 59 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) [system event] Wed 09/04 3:15 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Air Starter Components, Inc.. Chapter 11 Plan (Small Business) due by 03/3/2025. (Beustring, Russell)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Wed 09/04 3:16 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-34142 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A25544300. Fee amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]