Connecticut District Court
Judge:Kari A Dooley
Referred: Robert M Spector
Case #: 3:24-cv-01423
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
Patrick Cassidy
Represented By
Sheila J. Hall
State Of Connecticut
contact info
Defendant
Brian Ferguson
Represented By
Sheila J. Hall
State Of Connecticut
contact info
Defendant
Lynn Jurich
Represented By
Justyn P. Stokely
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Finn
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David X. Sullivan
Mccarter & English
contact info
Gregory Alan Hall
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Defendant
Mary Powell
Represented By
Justyn P. Stokely
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Finn
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David X. Sullivan
Mccarter & English
contact info
Gregory Alan Hall
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sunrun Installation Services, Inc.
Represented By
Justyn P. Stokely
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Finn
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David X. Sullivan
Mccarter & English
contact info
Gregory Alan Hall
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Defendant
Paul Winnowski
Represented By
Justyn P. Stokely
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Finn
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David X. Sullivan
Mccarter & English
contact info
Gregory Alan Hall
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sunrun, Inc.
Represented By
Justyn P. Stokely
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Thomas J. Finn
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
David X. Sullivan
Mccarter & English
contact info
Gregory Alan Hall
Mccarter & English LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
George Edward Steins
Represented By
Robert M. Berke
Law Office Of Robert M. Berke
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
44 44 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Tue 04/29 11:26 AM
ORDER granting in part42 Motion for Extension of Time. While it does not appear that discovery is necessary to address the immunity issues raised by Defendants Ferguson and Cassidy, in light of counsel's obligations and time constraints, see ECF No. 42, the deadline for Plaintiff to file his opposition to Defendants Cassidy and Ferguson's Motion to Dismiss is extended, nunc pro tunc , to May 19, 2025 . Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on April 29, 2025. (Spears, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
43 43 respm Objection Mon 04/28 3:38 PM
OBJECTION re42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply nunc pro tunc as to32 MOTION to Dismiss until June 27, 2025 filed by Patrick Cassidy, Brian Ferguson. (Hall, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 27, 2025
42 42 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Sun 04/27 2:53 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply nunc pro tunc as to32 MOTION to Dismiss until June 27, 2025 by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
41 41 trial Exhibit Sat 04/26 9:42 PM
EXHIBIT 1, Arrest Warrant by George Edward Steins re40 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
40 40 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Sat 04/26 9:37 PM
Memorandum in Opposition re33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
39 39 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 04/04 9:32 AM
ORDER granting38 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Ferguson and Cassidy shall respond to Plaintiff's discovery requests on or before May 2, 2025 . Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on April 4, 2025. (Spears, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
38 38 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/02 2:36 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until May 2, 2025 to Respond to Discovery by Patrick Cassidy, Brian Ferguson. (Hall, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
37 37 utility Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/05 4:22 PM
Reset Deadlines as to32 MOTION to Dismiss ,33 MOTION to Dismiss . Responses due by 4/26/2025 (Gould, K)
Related: [-]
36 36 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Tue 03/04 10:21 AM
ORDER granting35 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiff shall respond to the Defendants' pending Motions to Dismiss, ECF Nos. 32, 33, on or before April 26, 2025 . Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on March 4, 2025. (Spears, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
35 35 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Motion Mon 03/03 3:01 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to33 MOTION to Dismiss ,32 MOTION to Dismiss until April 26, 2025 by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
34 34 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 02/19 2:21 PM
Memorandum in Support re33 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Sunrun, Inc., Paul Winnowski. (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
33 33 motion Dismiss Wed 02/19 2:18 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Sunrun, Inc., Paul Winnowski.Responses due by 3/12/2025 (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Dismiss Wed 02/19 11:27 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Patrick Cassidy, Brian Ferguson.Responses due by 3/12/2025(Hall, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/21 11:13 AM
ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time; granting29 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the Complaint on or before February 20, 2025 . Signed by Judge Kari A. Dooley on January 21, 2025. (Spears, A.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
30 30 order Order of Transfer Fri 01/17 4:12 PM
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Kari A. Dooley for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 1/17/2025.(Hushin, Z.)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/17 2:44 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until February 20, 2025 to Respond to1 Complaint by Sunrun, Inc., Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Paul Winnowski. (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
28 28 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/16 3:42 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until February 20, 2025 to file a responsive pleading 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Brian Ferguson, Patrick Cassidy. (Hall, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
27 27 motion Appear Mon 01/13 1:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Attorney Justyn P. Stokely. by Sunrun, Inc., Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Paul Winnowski. (Stokely, Justyn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 12/09 4:08 PM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Extension of Time January 21, 2025 to Respond to1 Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/9/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Mon 12/09 4:09 PM
Answer deadline updated for Lynn Jurich to 1/21/2025; Mary Powell to 1/21/2025; Sunrun Installation Services, Inc. to 1/21/2025; Sunrun, Inc. to 1/21/2025; Paul Winnowski to 1/21/2025. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
25 25 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 12/06 4:37 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Extension of Time Time until January 21, 2025 to file a responsive pleading to the complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/6/2024. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extension of Time Fri 12/06 4:18 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until January 21, 2025 to Respond to1 Complaint by Sunrun, Inc., Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Paul Winnowski. (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Deadline Fri 12/06 4:41 PM
Answer deadline updated for Patrick Cassidy to 1/21/2025; Brian Ferguson to 1/21/2025. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time Thu 12/05 3:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until January 21, 2025 to file a responsive pleading to the complaint20 Waiver of Service Executed by Brian Ferguson, Patrick Cassidy. (Hall, Sheila)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
22 22 order Scheduling Order Wed 12/04 1:40 PM
GENERAL SCHEDULING ORDER. The parties' Rule 26(f) Planning Report (Doc. #21 ) is hereby APPROVED as modified by this order. All discovery shall be completed by December 31, 2025 , and all other interim discovery dates set forth in the parties' Rule 26(f) Report are hereby adopted. Any dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by February 15, 2026 , and any response to dispositive summary judgment motions shall be filed by March 16, 2026 . The parties' joint trial memorandum is due by February 15, 2026 , or within 30 days of the Court's ruling on dispositive summary judgment motions, whichever date is later. The Court will thereafter set a trial date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to jury selection within 30 days of the filing of the joint trial memorandum. Please refer to Judge Meyer's webpage on the District of Connecticut website for Judge Meyer's "Instructions for Discovery Disputes" and "Instructions for Joint Trial Memorandum" and "Pretrial Preferences" and "Trial Preferences." The parties are encouraged to commence discovery forthwith and to arrange their schedules in contemplation of the briefing deadlines for any dispositive motions, because the Court is unlikely to grant a future request for an extension of the scheduling order absent extraordinary and unforeseeable circumstances. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 12/4/2024.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
21 21 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 12/02 4:56 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
20 20 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 10/24 6:02 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Brian Ferguson waiver sent on 10/23/2024, answer due 12/22/2024; Patrick Cassidy waiver sent on 10/23/2024, answer due 12/22/2024 filed by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sheila J. Hall on behalf of Patrick Cassidy, Brian Ferguson (Hall, Sheila)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/23 8:15 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sunrun, Inc. waiver sent on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024 filed by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/23 8:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sunrun Installation Services, Inc. waiver sent on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024 filed by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/23 8:14 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Mary Powell waiver sent on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024 filed by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/23 8:13 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Paul Winnowski waiver sent on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024 filed by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 10/23 8:12 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Lynn Jurich waiver sent on 10/11/2024, answer due 12/10/2024 filed by George Edward Steins. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 11:53 AM
Disclosure Statement by Sunrun Installation Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sunrun, Inc., Other Affiliate Sunrun South LLC for Sunrun Installation Services, Inc.. (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 11:48 AM
Disclosure Statement by Sunrun, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackrock Finance, Inc. for Sunrun, Inc.. (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 11:43 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by David X. Sullivan on behalf of Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Sunrun, Inc., Paul Winnowski (Sullivan, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 11:41 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory Alan Hall on behalf of Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Sunrun, Inc., Paul Winnowski (Hall, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/18 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Finn on behalf of Lynn Jurich, Mary Powell, Sunrun Installation Services, Inc., Sunrun, Inc., Paul Winnowski (Finn, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
8 8 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 10/15 7:48 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Patrick Cassidy, Brian Ferguson* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Robert M. Berke* *Law Office of Robert M. Berke* *640 Clinton Avenue* *Bridgeport, CT 06605*. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
service Request to Issue Summons Fri 10/11 10:14 AM
Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Patrick Cassidy, Brian Ferguson. (Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
7 7 order Electronic Service Documents Thu 09/05 1:30 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines,4 Electronic Filing Order,5 Standing Protective Order, 2 Notice re: Disclosure Statement,1 Complaint filed by George Edward Steins,6 Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Signed by Clerk on 9/5/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
6 6 misc Notice of Option to Consent to MJ Jurisdiction (intake) Thu 09/05 1:29 PM
Notice of Option to Consent to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. (Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Standing Protective Order (Intake) Thu 09/05 1:28 PM
Standing Protective Order Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/4/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Electronic Filing Order Thu 09/05 1:27 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 9/4/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Thu 09/05 1:27 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/3/2024 Discovery due by 3/6/2025 Dispositive Motions due by 4/10/2025 Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2024.(Chartier, A.)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Thu 09/05 8:32 AM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 9/4/2024.(Maturo, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/04 4:32 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $405 receipt number ACTDC-7891366.), filed by George Edward Steins.(Berke, Robert)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/05 10:24 AM
Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer and Judge Robert M. Spector added. (Freberg, B)
Related: [-]