California Central District Court
Judge:Josephine L Staton
Referred: Margo A Rocconi
Case #: 2:24-cv-07526
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:101 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Terminated:Dec 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 12:26 AM PST
Defendant
BRP Records, LLC
Represented By
Eleanor M Lackman
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Defendant
Blair Russell Productions LLC
Represented By
Eleanor M Lackman
Mitchell Silberberg And Knupp LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Rivera-Herrans
Represented By
David Binder Jonelis
Lavely And Singer PC
contact info
Max Dylan Fabricant
Lavely And Singer P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
20 20 1 pgs notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Wed 12/18 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jorge Rivera-Herrans. Dismissal is Without prejudice. (Jonelis, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
19 19 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Tue 11/26 12:14 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/27/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 1/10/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kd)
Related: [-]
18 18 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 11/26 11:55 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Upon the reassignment of this case, this Court hereby resets the Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Blair Russell Productions LLC, BRP Records, LLC.15 for hearing on 01/10/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. Counsel shall take notice of this new date and time. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kd)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 11/26 11:46 AM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Josephine L. Staton. (kd)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Mon 11/25 5:12 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson to Judge Josephine L. Staton for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-07526 JLS(MARx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
15 15 motion Dismiss Case Fri 11/22 2:38 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Blair Russell Productions LLC, BRP Records, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/8/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint,
Att: 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint
Friday, November 01, 2024
14 14 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Fri 11/01 11:13 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document RE: Notice of Appearance,11 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G-123.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
13 13 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Thu 10/31 3:20 PM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (hr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
12 12 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Wed 10/30 12:23 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Blair Russell Productions LLC answer now due 11/22/2024; BRP Records, LLC answer now due 11/22/2024, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by defendants Blair Russell Productions LLC; BRP Records, LLC.(Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Appearance Wed 10/30 12:16 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Eleanor M Lackman on behalf of Defendants Blair Russell Productions LLC, BRP Records, LLC (Attorney Eleanor M Lackman added to party Blair Russell Productions LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Eleanor M Lackman added to party BRP Records, LLC(pty:dft))(Lackman, Eleanor)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/06 7:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Rivera-Herrans. upon BRP Records, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/5/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Jordan Greenberger, Counsel for BRP Records LLC. (Fabricant, Max)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 09/06 7:01 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiffs Jorge Rivera-Herrans. upon Blair Russell Productions LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 9/5/2024, answer due 11/4/2024. Waiver of Service signed by Jordan Greenberger, Counsel for Blair Russell Productions LLC. (Fabricant, Max)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
8 8 misc Miscellaneous Document Thu 09/05 9:59 PM
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) filed by Plaintiff Jorge Rivera-Herrans re: Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form,7 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 (Jonelis, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Thu 09/05 4:10 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately. The event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings.. (car)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Thu 09/05 3:41 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants BRP Records, LLC, Blair Russell Productions LLC. (car)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Clerical Error (G-11) Thu 09/05 3:39 PM
NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Notice to Counsel re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program was entered twice. Duplicate entry removed. (car)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Thu 09/05 3:14 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 09/04 2:11 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFFS JORGE RIVERA-HERRANS, (Jonelis, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Wed 09/04 2:08 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiffs JORGE RIVERA-HERRANS. (Jonelis, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Wed 09/04 2:03 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38149962 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiffs JORGE RIVERA-HERRANS. (Attorney David Binder Jonelis added to party JORGE RIVERA-HERRANS(pty:pla))(Jonelis, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet