Arkansas Western District Court
Judge:Timothy L Brooks
Case #: 2:24-cv-02111
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 2:21 AM CST
Defendant
Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By
Colt D. Galloway
Mitchell Williams Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Automata Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Michael N. Shannon
Quattlebaum, Grooms, Tull & Burrow PLLC
contact info

GPO Apr 02 2025
en enter an initial scheduling order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 2, 2025. (mjm)OPINION AND ORDER granting 12 Motion to Set Aside Default and the Clerk's default 11 is SET ASIDE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that RHE must file an answer or other responsive pleading by no later than Wednesday, April 9, 2025. The Court will th

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 04/30 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Blake Brizzolara on behalf of Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc.. (Brizzolara, Blake)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
26 26 order Initial Scheduling Order Tue 04/29 3:03 PM
INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Hearing set for 6/3/2025 10:00 AM in Fayetteville -- 5th flr (Rm 509) before Honorable Timothy L. Brooks. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/23/2025. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 29, 2025. (slc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney filed Complaint) Tue 04/08 8:16 PM
ANSWER to2 Complaint, And Request For Injunctive Relief by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc..(Galloway, Colt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
24 24 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Wed 04/02 2:42 PM
OPINION AND ORDER granting12 Motion to Set Aside Default and the Clerk's default11 is SET ASIDE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that RHE must file an answer or other responsive pleading by no later than Wednesday, April 9, 2025. The Court will then enter an initial scheduling order. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on April 2, 2025. (mjm)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
23 23 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/31 10:35 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc.. (Galloway, Colt)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion for Leave Mon 03/31 10:01 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting21 Motion for Leave to File Reply. The reply brief attached to the motion should be filed of record. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on March 31, 2025. (ee)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
21 21 motion Leave Fri 03/28 4:09 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion to Set Aside Default by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc..(Galloway, Colt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Reply Brief
Friday, March 21, 2025
20 20 respm Response to Motion Fri 03/21 3:27 PM
RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO Motion re12 MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by Automata Holdings, LLC.(Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, Response, Texts,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, Response, Affidavit
Friday, February 21, 2025
19 19 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/21 2:47 PM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting18 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Defendant's motion to set aside default. The new response deadline is March 21, 2025. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 21, 2025. (ee)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 02/21 2:18 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to12 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Automata Holdings, LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
17 17 misc Sealed Document Thu 02/20 3:01 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO SET ASIDE CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc.. An Order was entered on 2/20/2025 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to13 Memorandum Brief in Support. (Galloway, Colt) Modified docket text on 2/20/2025 (tmc)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Sealed Document Thu 02/20 3:00 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS FILED UNDER SEAL WITH THE COURT. MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc.. An Order was entered on 2/20/2025 allowing the document(s) to be filed under seal. This docket entry is related to12 MOTION to Set Aside Default . (Galloway, Colt) Modified docket text on 2/20/2025 (tmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 7 - Filed Under Seal,
Att: 2 Exhibit 10 - Filed Under Seal
15 15 order Order on Motion for Leave Thu 02/20 11:58 AM
TEXT ONLY ORDER granting14 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal. Signed by Honorable Timothy L. Brooks on February 20, 2025. (ee)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
14 14 motion Leave Wed 02/19 7:12 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc.. (Galloway, Colt)
Related: [-]
13 13 23 pgs msupport Memorandum Brief in Support Wed 02/19 6:16 PM
MEMORANDUM BRIEF in Support of12 MOTION to Set Aside Default (REDACTED) by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc.. (Galloway, Colt)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Set Aside Default Wed 02/19 6:13 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Default by Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc..(Galloway, Colt)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 2 pgs Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 1 pgs Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 3 pgs Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 6 pgs Exhibit 6 - Redacted,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Redacted,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Redacted,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14 - Redacted
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
11 11 1 pgs misc Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 01/22 2:08 PM
CLERK'S ENTRY of Default as to Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc. (bjb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
10 10 1 pgs misc Affidavit in Support of Default Tue 01/21 1:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support of Default by Automata Holdings, LLC as to Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc. . (Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
9 9 1 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 11/27 1:25 PM
NOTICE by Automata Holdings, LLC Letter to Ronald E. Dowling, Clerk (Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Default Thu 11/07 11:13 AM
NOTICE OF DEFAULT PROCEDURE under FRCP 55 directed to plaintiff as to default of Defendant Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc. Affidavit in Support of Default due by 11/21/2024.(tmc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Affidavit
Monday, October 28, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Mon 10/28 12:23 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons,Complaint w_Exhibits, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge, filed by Automata Holdings, LLC. Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc. served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024.(Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Friday, September 06, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Fri 09/06 4:12 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS AND CASE PARTICIPANTS. Summons Issued as to Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc. and returned to attorney or plaintiff for service. YOU MUST PRINT THIS ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH IS THE MAIN DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (jlm)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Requested Fri 09/06 4:03 PM
THE DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO COURT USERS. Summons Requested as to Robert Hurley Enterprises, Inc. for service of the following document: 2 Complaint, 4 Magistrate Notice/Consent Form. (Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
4 4 1 pgs notice Magistrate Notice/Consent Form Thu 09/05 8:09 AM
Magistrate Notice/Consent Form (jlm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
3 3 1 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement - Filed by Attorney Wed 09/04 5:00 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Automata Holdings, LLC. (Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 13 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/04 4:58 PM
COMPLAINT Verified Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief against Automata Holdings, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AARWDC-3047689), filed by Automata Holdings, LLC.(Shannon, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 6 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 12 pgs Exhibit 2
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Wed 09/04 4:26 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Automata Holdings, LLC. Please proceed with filing your case initiating document(s). If the case initiating documents are not filed by Close of Business the next business day, this file may be closed. A civil action is commenced by filing a complaint with the Court (Fed.R.Civ.P.3). (jlm)
Related: [-]