Florida Middle District Court
Judge:John L Badalamenti
Referred: Philip R Lammens
Case #: 5:24-cv-00470
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:15 AM EST
Defendant
FNU Britt
Defendant
FNU Hammond
Defendant
FNU Roberts
Defendant
FNU Smith
Defendant
Billy Woods
Defendant
Barnes
Plaintiff
Richard Albert Logsdon
A0256515 Marion County Jail 3290 N.W. 10th Street
Ocala, FL 34475


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
26 26 motion Dismiss Mon 05/05 2:48 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by All Defendants. (Glassman, Gary)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/07 11:14 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/6/2025 by Richard Albert Logsdon as to Barnes. (RLK)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/07 11:12 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/6/2025 by Richard Albert Logsdon as to FNU Britt. (RLK)
Related: [-]
23 23 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/07 11:10 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/6/2025 by Richard Albert Logsdon as to FNU Roberts. (RLK)
Related: [-]
22 22 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/07 11:06 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/6/2025 by Richard Albert Logsdon as to FNU Smith. (RLK)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons returned executed Fri 03/07 11:01 AM
RETURN of service executed on 3/6/2025 by Richard Albert Logsdon as to FNU Hammond. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 service Summons returned executed Wed 03/05 1:51 PM
RETURN of service executed on 3/4/2025 by Richard Albert Logsdon as to Billy Woods. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
19 19 service Summons issued Fri 02/14 3:43 PM
SUMMONS issued as to Barnes, FNU Britt, FNU Hammond, FNU Roberts, FNU Smith, and Billy Woods. (KLS)
Related: [-]
18 18 5 pgs order Order to Answer Fri 02/14 3:22 PM
ORDER TO ANSWER and Notice to Plaintiff. The United States Marshal or Deputy United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the Amended Complaint (Doc. 16), and this Order upon the Defendants within 30 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to provide necessary documents to United States Marshal for service of process. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 2/14/2025. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
17 17 service Proposed summons Thu 02/06 5:00 PM
Received PROPOSED summons to be issued and 7 copies of the amended complaint by Richard Albert Logsdon. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/17 10:51 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against FNU Britt, FNU Hammond, FNU Roberts, FNU Smith, Billy Woods, and Barnes filed by Richard Albert Logsdon.(KLS)
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Fri 01/17 10:46 AM
ORDER granting 13 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff shall mail 6 service copies and service forms within 14 days from the date of this Order. The Clerk is directed to docket 13 Proposed Amended Complaint as Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and send Plaintiff 1 blank summons and USM-285 form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 1/17/2025. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 service Proposed summons Mon 01/06 5:00 PM
Received PROPOSED summons to be issued by Richard Albert Logsdon. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
13 13 motion Amend / Correct / Modify / Supplement Thu 01/02 3:04 PM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint by Richard Albert Logsdon.(MGB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint,
Att: 2 Mailing Envelope
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
12 12 2 pgs order Order to complete service forms Wed 12/18 3:36 PM
ORDER to complete service forms. Plaintiff is directed to return forms within 21 days of the date of this order. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff 5 blank summons and 5 blank USM-285 forms. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/18/2024. (KLS)
Related: [-]
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/18 3:35 PM
ORDER granting 7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and granting 9 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief. Plaintiff shall pay an initial partial filing fee of $0.00 and is assessed the total $350 filing fee. The Clerk is directed to send a copy of this Order to the Supervisor, Inmate Trust Funds at Plaintiff's current place of incarceration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 12/18/2024. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
10 10 misc Prisoner consent form and financial certificate Mon 11/25 1:30 PM
PRISONER consent form and financial certificate by Richard Albert Logsdon. (RLK)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 1:29 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to accept prisoner consent form as timely by Richard Albert Logsdon. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
8 8 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/01 9:56 AM
ORDER ruling deferred 7 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to either pay the filing fee or complete and file a prisoner consent form within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 11/1/2024. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 10/29 2:15 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis / Affidavit of Indigency by Richard Albert Logsdon. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
6 6 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/24 3:03 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice 5 Motion to issue a show cause order for ifp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 10/24/2024. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
5 5 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/22 4:02 PM
MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically to issue a show cause order for ifp by Richard Albert Logsdon. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Copies Wed 09/25 3:52 PM
ORDER granting 3 Motion for Copies. Plaintiff is directed to file a completed Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, 6-month account statement, and Prisoner Consent form. The Clerk is directed to send Plaintiff a blank Application to Proceed in forma pauperis and Prisoner Consent form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/25/2024. (KLS)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
3 3 motion Copies Mon 09/23 11:42 AM
MOTION for Copies by Richard Albert Logsdon. (RLK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
2 2 order Standing Order - Pro Se Litigants Wed 09/04 10:47 AM
STANDING ORDER for all incarcerated pro se litigants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/4/2024. (LAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 09/04 10:42 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Richard Albert Logsdon. (Five service copies provided, no MIFP filed)(LAB)
Related: [-]