New Jersey District Court
Judge:Brian R Martinotti
Referred: Cathy L Waldor
Case #: 2:24-cv-08962
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Trademark
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 3:37 AM EST
Defendant
BHUTTA LLC
25 SE 2nd Ave, STE 550 PMB 50
Miami, FL 33131
Defendant
COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC
114 Clinton Road
Fairfield, NJ 07004
Represented By
PASQUALE ANTONIO PONTORIERO
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
ERIC MICHAEL GONZALEZ
Kennedys Cmk LLP
contact info
Defendant
HASH7 LLC
25 SE 2nd Ave, STE 550 PMB 50
Miami, FL 33131
Plaintiff
EETHO BRANDS, INC.
51 NE 24th St, Suite 206
Miami, FL 33137
Represented By
KELLY JONES HOWELL
Harris Beach Murtha Cullina PLLC
contact info
ARVIND JAYAKUMAR
Jayakumar Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
JMGRETAIL, LLC
Terminated: 10/25/2024
15059 SW 113th Terrace
Miami, FL 33196


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
38 38 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 10:46 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC LEE POLISHOOK on behalf of COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC (POLISHOOK, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Mon 03/24 2:40 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee: $500.00, receipt number NEW51707 as to EMILY BRANDENBURG & GARRET W. THOMPSON. (ps)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
37 37 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/18 4:12 PM
ORDER ADMITTING EMILY BRANDENBURG AND GARRET W. THOMPSON PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 3/18/2025. (sm)
Related: [-]
36 36 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 03/18 1:02 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Brandenburg and Garret W. Thompson by EETHO BRANDS, INC..(JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Arvind Jayakumar (Local Counsel) in Support,
Att: 2 Certification Certification of Emily Brandenburg in Support,
Att: 3 Certification Certification of Garret W. Thompson in Support,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motions Referred Tue 03/18 2:17 PM
36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Brandenburg and Garret W. Thompson REFERRED to Cathy L. Waldor. (lr, )
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 03/18 3:43 PM
Set Deadlines as to36 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Emily Brandenburg and Garret W. Thompson. Motion set for 4/21/2025 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (adc, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
35 35 misc Substitution of Attorney Thu 02/27 1:47 PM
Substitution of Attorney - Attorney KELLY JONES HOWELL terminated. Attorney ARVIND JAYAKUMAR for EETHO BRANDS, INC. added.. (JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
utility Motions No Longer Referred Thu 12/19 12:45 PM
30 MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint ,29 MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint no longer referred to the Magistrate Judge. Motions to be decided by the District Judge. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
34 34 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 12/09 11:40 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by EETHO BRANDS, INC. re30 MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order Mon 12/09 3:34 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court accepts Defendant Common Sense Distributors LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. (ECF No.30 ). For docket clarity purposes, barring any subsequent extensions, any reply submissions must be filed today, 12/9/24. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 12/9/24. (tjd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
32 32 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Fri 12/06 4:09 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC re30 MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint ,29 MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint (GONZALEZ, ERIC)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Letter Fri 12/06 3:27 PM
Letter from Common Cents regarding extension of time to file opposition. (GONZALEZ, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/20 9:29 AM
Set Deadlines as to29 MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint ,30 MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint . Motion set for 12/16/2024 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
30 30 motion Strike Tue 11/19 4:34 PM
MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint by EETHO BRANDS, INC..(JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order granting Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses
29 29 motion Strike Tue 11/19 12:56 PM
MOTION to Strike25 Answer to Complaint by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. (JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Motion - Missing Supporting Document Tue 11/19 3:27 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - A MOTION and SUPPORTING DOCUMENTATION was not submitted with MOTION to Strike29 submitted by ARVIND JAYAKUMAR on 11/19/2024. PLEASE SUBMIT THE MISSING DOCUMENT(S) ONLY. (mj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
28 28 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/05 6:36 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants HASH7 LLC and BHUTTA LLC by EETHO BRANDS, INC..(JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Emily Brandenburg in Support of Motion for Default Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Brandenburg Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Brandenburg Declaration
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 11/05 11:35 AM
Set Deadlines as to28 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants HASH7 LLC and BHUTTA LLC . Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Judge Brian R. Martinotti. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/31 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ERIC MICHAEL GONZALEZ on behalf of COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC (GONZALEZ, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
26 26 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 10/29 4:15 PM
LETTER ORDER granting24 Plaintiff's Request for a seven (7) day extension of the deadline to file Plaintiff's forthcoming motion for default judgment against Defendants Bhutta LLC and Hash7 LLC; extending the deadline from Tuesday, 10/29/2024 to Tuesday, 11/5/2024. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/29/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
25 25 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/29 1:59 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND by COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC.(PONTORIERO, PASQUALE)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 10/29 7:45 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Bhutta LLC and Hash7 LLC by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. (JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/29 1:39 PM
Set Deadlines as to24 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Default Judgment against Defendants Bhutta LLC and Hash7 LLC . Motion set for 12/2/2024 before Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mj)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
23 23 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Fri 10/25 9:52 AM
ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without Prejudice of Defendant JMG Retail, LLC. Signed by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/25/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Thu 10/24 2:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant JMG Retail, LLC by EETHO BRANDS, INC. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
21 21 order Text Order Tue 10/15 3:59 PM
TEXT ORDER: You are hereby directed to move this civil action as to BHUTTA LLC and HASH7 LLC by requesting that default judgment be entered, or submitting an extension to Answer out of time, within fourteen (14) days from the date hereof. Should you fail to do so, this action shall be listed for dismissal on October 29, 2024, at 9:00 a.m. SO ORDERED by Judge Brian R. Martinotti on 10/15/2024. (lr, )
Related: [-]
order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 10/15 2:35 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to BHUTTA LLC, HASH7 LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (mj)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order Fri 10/11 2:46 PM
CONSENT ORDER EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER. Defendant JMGRETAIL, LLC's time to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint filed on or about 9/4/2024 is extended from 10/4/2024 to 10/18/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/11/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
19 19 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 10/10 6:05 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by EETHO BRANDS, INC. against HASH7 LLC.(HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kelly J. Howell,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-affidavit of service
18 18 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 10/10 6:04 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by EETHO BRANDS, INC. against Bhutta LLC.(HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kelly J. Howell,
Att: 2 Exhibit Affidavit of Service
17 17 misc Request for Default Judgment by Clerk Thu 10/10 5:48 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment by EETHO BRANDS, INC. against HASH7 LLC.(HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Kelly J. Howell,
Att: 2 Exhibit A- Proof of Service
16 16 misc Proposed Order Thu 10/10 1:23 PM
Proposed Order on Consent for Extension of Time to Answer by EETHO BRANDS, INC. re1 Complaint,. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
15 15 misc AO121 Copyright Form Thu 10/03 2:17 PM
AO121 Copyright Form filed. (dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibits
14 14 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Thu 10/03 2:14 PM
AO120 Trademark Form filed. (dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibits
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
13 13 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/25 5:23 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. HASH7 LLC served on 9/12/2024, answer due 10/3/2024. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/25 5:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. BHUTTA LLC served on 9/12/2024, answer due 10/3/2024. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/24 9:51 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/17 3:52 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 09/17 3:47 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by EETHO BRANDS, INC. as to HASH7 LLC. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Tue 09/17 2:18 PM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by EETHO BRANDS, INC. as to BHUTTA LLC. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/17 2:12 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. JMGRETAIL, LLC served on 9/13/2024, answer due 10/4/2024. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/17 2:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Tue 09/17 2:01 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action; Complaint and Demand for jury Trial; Civil Cover Sheet; Corporate Disclosure Statement served on JMGRetail, LLC on 9/13/2024, filed by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/09 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by KELLY JONES HOWELL on behalf of EETHO BRANDS, INC. (HOWELL, KELLY)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 08, 2024
3 3 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Sun 09/08 7:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by EETHO BRANDS, INC.. (JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
2 2 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 09/05 2:29 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to BHUTTA LLC, COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC, HASH7 LLC, JMGRETAIL, LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Thu 09/05 9:50 AM
Case assigned to Judge Brian R. Martinotti and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor. (jr)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Fillable PDF Thu 09/05 2:24 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The CIVIL COVER SHEET1 filed by ARVIND JAYAKUMAR on 9/5/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (mj)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/05 2:25 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (mj)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
1 1 23 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 09/04 8:17 PM
COMPLAINT against BHUTTA LLC, COMMON CENTS DISTRIBUTORS LLC, HASH7 LLC, JMGRETAIL, LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15637852) with JURY DEMAND, filed by EETHO BRANDS, INC..(JAYAKUMAR, ARVIND)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 49 pgs Exhibit Exhibits to Complaint,
Att: 2 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 1 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet - Attachment