New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Tonianne J Bongiovanni
Case #: 3:24-cv-08938
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 02, 2025 4:26 AM EST
Defendant
APICORE US LLC
Defendant
RK PHARMA INC.
Plaintiff
HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD.
Represented By
JING XIA
Tarter Krinsky & Drogin LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
11 11 service Certificate of Service Fri 01/31 8:40 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD. re10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANTS APICORE US LLC and RK PHARMA INC. (XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 01/30 8:43 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANTS APICORE US LLC and RK PHARMA INC. . Motion set for 3/3/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
10 10 motion Default Judgment Wed 01/29 6:16 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to DEFENDANTS APICORE US LLC and RK PHARMA INC. by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD..(XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT,
Att: 2 Declaration DECLARATION OF WEN JIAO,
Att: 3 Affidavit AFFIDAVIT OF JING XIA,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
Friday, January 10, 2025
misc Docket Annotation (public) Fri 01/10 9:49 AM
Please take notice: The Notice of Call for Dismissal8 is WITHDRAWN. (kas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
9 9 misc Letter Thu 01/09 2:26 PM
Letter from Jing Xia re Local Civil Rule 41.1(a) Notice (ECF No. 8). (XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
8 8 notice Notice of Call for Dismissal Tue 01/07 1:01 PM
Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 41.1(a). Motion set for 2/7/2025 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kas, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 10/02 10:09 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Apicore US LLC and RK Pharma Inc. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
7 7 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 10/01 2:04 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD. against Apicore US LLC and RK Pharma Inc.. (XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
qc QC - Fillable PDF Thu 09/19 8:37 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The6 "DIVERSITY DISCLOSURE STATEMENT" filed by JING XIA on 9/18/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (mlh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
6 6 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 09/18 6:08 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD.. (XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 09/18 1:46 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD. identifying Humanwell Healthcare (Group) Co., Ltd. as Corporate Parent.. (XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Fri 09/13 11:26 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet served on RK Pharma Inc. on September 6, 2024, filed by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD.. (XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Affidavit of Service Fri 09/13 11:24 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet served on Apicore US LLC on September 6, 2024, filed by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD.. (XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/05 3:27 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to APICORE US LLC, RK PHARMA INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 09/05 3:26 PM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Tonianne J. Bongiovanni added. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
qc QC - Lack of Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 09/04 4:01 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party or intervenor. Please refer to the Court's website at[LINK:www.njd.uscourts.gov] for a form and filing instructions. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Wed 09/04 4:01 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT against APICORE US LLC, RK PHARMA INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number CNJDC-15634117), filed by HUMANWELL PURACAP PHARMACEUTICALS (WUHAN) CO., LTD..(XIA, JING)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet