Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Gail A Weilheimer
Case #: 2:24-cv-04679
Nature of Suit485 Other Statutes - Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Cause47:227 Restrictions of Use of Telephone Equipment
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Apr 16, 2025 7:13 AM EDT
Defendant
COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC
Represented By
Aleksander W. Smolij
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
ELYSE N. COHEN
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough
contact info
SHARON R. O'REILLY
Arentfox Schiff LLP
contact info
DANIEL R. WALWORTH
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
ROBERT G. BERNHOFT
The Bernhoft Law Firm, S.C.
contact info
PATRICK KANE
The Bernhoft Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES E. SHELTON
Represented By
Andrew Roman Perrong
Perrong Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 87 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/29 2:39 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINITFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO THE DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM IS GRANTED. PLAINITFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 5/22/2025 IN ORDER TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING TO DEFENDANT'S COUNTERCLAIM. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 4/29/2025.4/29/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
36 36 2 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/28 11:09 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re35 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim filed by JAMES E. SHELTON.Certificate of Service.(Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
35 35 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 04/24 4:50 PM
ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against JAMES E. SHELTON by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC.(COHEN, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit 2
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
34 34 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Wed 04/09 10:53 AM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by PATRICK KANE on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC(KANE, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
33 33 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 04/08 3:15 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT A 14 DAY EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT UP TO AND INCLUDING 4/24/2025 IS APPROVED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 4/7/2025. 4/7/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
32 32 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 04/08 1:02 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by ROBERT G. BERNHOFT on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC(BERNHOFT, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
31 31 3 pgs misc Stipulation Thu 04/03 2:37 PM
STIPULATION re1 Complaint (Attorney) for an Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC. (COHEN, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
30 30 2 pgs notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 04/01 4:59 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by DANIEL R. WALWORTH on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC(WALWORTH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Tue 04/01 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Aleksander W. Smolij on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC(Smolij, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
28 28 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/31 4:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by ELYSE N. COHEN on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC with Certificate of Service(COHEN, ELYSE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
27 27 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 03/27 12:17 PM
ORDER THAT DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS (DOC. 21) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER ON 3/27/2025.3/27/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
26 26 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/14 1:12 PM
NOTICE by JAMES E. SHELTON re24 Response in Opposition to Motion, of Supplemental Authority(Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 12 pgs Exhibit A - Memorandum Opinion and Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 01/16 2:48 PM
ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA TO DISTRICT JUDGE GAIL A WEILHEIMER FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY GEORGE V WYLESOL, CLERK OF COURT ON 01/16/2025. 01/16/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
24 24 26 pgs respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 12/26 4:22 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by JAMES E. SHELTON.(Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of James E. Shelton,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Transcript of Call,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
23 23 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/27 9:40 AM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE PLAINTIFF SHALL HAVE UNTIL 12/26/24, TO OPPOSED OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/27/24. 11/27/24 ENTERED AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
22 22 misc Stipulation Tue 11/26 1:34 PM
STIPULATION re21 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint For An Extension of Time To Respond by JAMES E. SHELTON. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
21 21 motion Dismiss Mon 11/25 9:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC.Memorandum, Declaration, Certificate of Service.(WALWORTH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum,
Att: 2 Declaration of Patrick Kane, Esq.,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Kane Declaration - Final Verdict Solutions Website,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Kane Declaration - Jacovetti Law, P.C. v. Shelton Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Kane Declaration - Comcast Motion to Compel Arbitration (Shelton v. Comcast),
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Wed 11/06 1:59 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF ROBERT G. BERNHOFT IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 11/6/2024.11/6/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
19 19 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 10/31 9:43 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Robert G. Bernhoft ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17849098.) filed by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC.Certificate of Service.(Smolij, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
18 18 order Stipulation and Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 10/28 3:52 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT SHALL HAVE THIRTY DAYS FROM OCTOBER 25, 2024 TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/28/2024. 10/28/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Mon 10/28 3:48 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE OF PATRICK KANE IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/28/2024.10/28/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
16 16 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Thu 10/24 2:56 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Patrick Kane, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17834277.) filed by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC.Certificate of Service.(Smolij, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance Thu 10/24 2:04 PM
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by SHARON R. O'REILLY on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC(O'REILLY, SHARON)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 10/24 1:47 PM
STIPULATION of the Parties for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC. (Smolij, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/24 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aleksander W. Smolij on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC with Certificate of Service(Smolij, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
12 12 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Thu 10/24 1:38 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 with Certificate of Service by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC.(WALWORTH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/24 1:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL R. WALWORTH on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC with Certificate of Service(WALWORTH, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Set Aside Default Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/08 3:50 PM
ORDERED AS FOLLOWS: 1. DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SET ASIDE ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS GRANTED AS UNOPPOSED, AND THE ENTRY OF DEFAULT IS SET ASIDE. 2. DEFENDANTS MOTION TO EXTEND THE DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT IS GRANTED, AND DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 25, 2024. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN R. PADOVA ON 10/8/2024.10/8/2024 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 10/08 12:24 PM
NOTICE by JAMES E. SHELTON re7 MOTION to Set Aside Default Of Non-Opposition (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 10/08 11:49 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint (Attorney) filed by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC.Certificate of Service.(O'REILLY, SHARON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
7 7 motion Set Aside Default Tue 10/08 11:42 AM
MOTION to Set Aside Default filed by COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC.Certificate of Service.(O'REILLY, SHARON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
6 6 order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 10/08 10:35 AM
DEFAULT BY COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC FOR FAILURE TO PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (sg)
Related: [-]
misc Default Entered Tue 10/08 10:44 AM
Default Entered (sg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 10/07 7:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by SHARON R. O'REILLY on behalf of COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC with Certificate of Service(O'REILLY, SHARON)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
4 4 misc Request for Default Fri 10/04 1:55 PM
Request for Default by JAMES E. SHELTON against COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/24 2:34 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by JAMES E. SHELTON re: Yasmin Pardillo served Summons and Complaint upon COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC by Personal Service. COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC served on 9/6/2024, answer due 9/27/2024. (Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 09/05 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 9/5/2024 (sg)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Thu 09/05 10:55 AM
COMPLAINT against COMMITTEE FOR POLICE OFFICERS DEFENSE PAC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17720611.), filed by JAMES E. SHELTON.(Perrong, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Appendix