Florida Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Roberta A Colton
Case #: 8:24-bk-05274
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Feb 18, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors100-199
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tervis Tumbler Company, Debtor
201 Triple Diamond Blvd
North Venice, FL 34275-3634
Represented By
Steven M Berman
Shumaker, Loop & Kendrick, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee - TPA
Timberlake Annex, Suite 1200 501 E Polk Street
Tampa, FL 33602


Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
402 402 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (BK) Fri 05/02 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+]. Notice Date 05/01/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #401 )
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
401 401 court Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Tue 04/29 9:47 AM
Notice Regarding Filing of Transcript and Deadline for Filing Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of Transcript to be filed within 7 calendar days of the date of service of this notice, but an additional three days may be added if the notice is served by U.S. Mail Related [+]. (Ryan S.)
Related: [-] 400
Monday, April 28, 2025
400 400 court Transcript Mon 04/28 4:11 PM
Certified Transcript Regarding Hearing Held 02/11/2025 on Case Confirmation. To purchase a copy of this transcript, please contact Acorn Transcripts, LLC: 941-426-4465 Nancy B. Gardelli . Transcript access will be restricted through 07/28/2025. (Acorn Transcripts, LLC (NBG))
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
399 399 misc Certificate Of Service (BK) Fri 04/25 3:35 PM
Certificate of Service Re: Order Approving Final Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses filed by Johnson Pope Bokor Ruppel and Burns, LLP as Counsel for Committee (Doc. No. 398). Filed by Angelina E Lim on behalf of Creditor Committee Committee for Unsecured Creditors Related [+]. (Lim, Angelina)
Related: [-] 398
Att: 1 Mailing Matrix
398 398 order Compensation Fri 04/25 1:38 PM
Order Granting Application For Compensation Related [+]. Fees awarded to Angelina E Lim in the amount of $163442.50, expenses awarded: $8472.80 Service Instructions: Angelina Lim is directed to serve a copy of this order on interested parties and file a proof of service within 3 days of entry of the order. (Deborah K.)
Related: [-] 361
Thursday, April 24, 2025
397 397 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/25 12:21 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+]. Notice Date 04/24/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] (Related Doc #388 )