Delaware District Court
Judge:Colm F Connolly
Case #: 1:24-cv-01012
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
New Castle County, Delaware
Represented By
Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
New Castle County
contact info
Michael F. McTaggart
Doj-Usao
contact info
Karen V. Sullivan
New Castle County Law Dept.
contact info
Aaron Christopher Baker
New Castle County Office Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Sean Sweeney-Jones
Represented By
Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
New Castle County
contact info
Michael F. McTaggart
Doj-Usao
contact info
Karen V. Sullivan
New Castle County Law Dept.
contact info
Aaron Christopher Baker
New Castle County Office Of Law
contact info
Defendant
Vaughan M. Bond, Jr.
Represented By
Helene Elizabeth Episcopo
New Castle County
contact info
Michael F. McTaggart
Doj-Usao
contact info
Karen V. Sullivan
New Castle County Law Dept.
contact info
Aaron Christopher Baker
New Castle County Office Of Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Trynity Hood-Anderson
Represented By
Michael Patrick Minuti
Mccann Dillon Jaffe & Lamb, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
21 21 order SO ORDERED Wed 02/26 2:55 PM
SO ORDERED, re18 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Reply to Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to February 21, 2025 filed by New Castle County, Delaware, Sean Sweeney-Jones, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 2/26/2025. (mws)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 respm Brief - Reply Fri 02/21 2:35 PM
REPLY BRIEF re18 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Reply to Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to February 21, 2025,10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, New Castle County, Delaware, Sean Sweeney-Jones.(McTaggart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance - Substitution of Counsel Fri 02/07 12:44 PM
NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL re New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones: Entry of appearance of attorney Michael F. McTaggart. Attorney Aaron C. Baker terminated.(McTaggart, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Thursday, January 30, 2025
18 18 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 01/30 4:59 PM
Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Reply to Plaintiff's Answering Brief in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss to February 21, 2025 - filed by New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones. (Sullivan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/29 4:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karen V. Sullivan on behalf of New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones(Sullivan, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
16 16 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Wed 01/08 12:18 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re10 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 1/15/2025.(Minuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 27, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/27 12:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Christopher Baker on behalf of New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones(Baker, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
14 14 order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Wed 12/18 4:05 PM
SO ORDERED, re13 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to January 10, 2025, filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson. Reset Briefing Schedule: Answering Brief due 1/10/2025. Reply Brief due 1/31/2025. Signed by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 12/18/2024. (kmd)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 12/18 10:13 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Plaintiff's Deadline to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss to January 10, 2025 - filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson. (Minuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
12 12 misc Deficiency Notice Tue 12/10 11:29 AM
DEFICIENCY NOTICE by the Court issued to New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones re11 Opening Brief in Support. Pursuant to the Court's Standing Order Regarding Briefing in All Cases, dated November 10, 2022, "[t]he covers of briefs filed in connection with all motions except for motions in limine included in a pretrial order shall be as follows: i. Opening Brief - Blue; ii. Answering Brief - Red; iii. Reply Brief - Gray." Courtesy copies of D.I.11 are not in compliance with the Court's standing order. Please resubmit courtesy copies of your brief with the corrected covers. Pursuant to the Standing Order issued 5/10/2022, "Unless a specific Order to the contrary is entered in a case, all parties shall provide to the Court two (2) courtesy copies of all briefs (including letter briefs), as well as any documents filed in support of such briefs (i.e., appendices, exhibits, declarations, affidavits, tutorials, etc.)." (kmd)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
11 11 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Fri 12/06 3:19 PM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones.Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 12/20/2024.(Episcopo, Helene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
10 10 motion Dismiss/Other Fri 12/06 3:10 PM
MOTION to Dismiss - filed by New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones.(Episcopo, Helene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Tue 11/19 2:48 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to December 6, 2024 - filed by New Castle County, Delaware, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr, Sean Sweeney-Jones. (Episcopo, Helene)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 11/19 2:55 PM
SO ORDERED, re9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to December 6, 2024, filed by New Castle County, Delaware, Sean Sweeney-Jones, Vaughan M. Bond, Jr. Reset Answer Deadlines: Vaughan M. Bond, Jr answer due 12/6/2024; New Castle County, Delaware answer due 12/6/2024; Sean Sweeney-Jones answer due 12/6/2024. Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 11/19/2024. (kmd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
8 8 cmp Complaint - Amended Tue 11/05 8:22 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against New Castle County, Delaware- filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson.(Minuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Cover Letter
Thursday, October 31, 2024
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Thu 10/31 9:53 AM
SO ORDERED, re7 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal. Set Briefing Schedule: (Answering Brief due 11/5/2024). Ordered by Judge Colm F. Connolly on 10/31/2024. (mws)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
7 7 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 10/30 1:14 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to RESPOND to Defendants' Motion for Partial Dismissal to November 5, 2024 - filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson. (Minuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
6 6 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Tue 10/15 4:01 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim - filed by New Castle County, Delaware, Sean Sweeney-Jones.(Episcopo, Helene)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Compliance,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service
utility - CORRECTING ENTRY Tue 10/15 4:00 PM
CORRECTING ENTRY: Per counsel's request, D.I. 6 has been removed for refiling (cdd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
5 5 service Affidavit of Service Wed 09/11 4:27 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Sean Sweeney-Jones on September 10, 2024, filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson. (Minuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Wed 09/11 4:26 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Adam Singer for Defendant New Castle Coutnty, Delaware on September 10, 2024, filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson. (Minuti, Michael)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs order Order Wed 09/11 3:32 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING IN ALL CASES (nmf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/11 9:47 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Colm F. Connolly. Please include the initials of the Judge (CFC) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
2 2 misc Magistrate Consent Forms Thu 09/05 2:51 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (vfm)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 09/05 2:51 PM
COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against New Castle County, Delaware, Sean Sweeney-Jones ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4491823.) - filed by Trynity Hood-Anderson. (vfm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
service No Summons Issued Thu 09/05 2:52 PM
No Summons Issued. (vfm)
Related: [-]