Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Cathy Bissoon
Case #: 2:24-cv-01258
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause46:688 Jones Act
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 4:04 AM EST
Defendant
IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC
Represented By
Dennis A Watson
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
Devon F. Ferris
Dickie, Mccamey & Chilcote, P.C
contact info
Plaintiff
JEFFREY NEWLAND
Represented By
Gary W. Baun
O'Bryan Baun Karamanian
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
31 31 order Order Staying Case ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 03/25 3:45 PM
ORDER. The parties'30 Joint Motion to Stay is GRANTED. This case is hereby STAYED until 1/31/2026. It is further ordered that a Telephonic Status Conference is set for 1/23/2026 at 10:00 AM before Judge Cathy Bissoon. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/25/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Stay Tue 03/25 1:01 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Hahn, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, March 24, 2025
29 29 minutes Initial Case Management Conference Mon 03/24 12:51 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cathy Bissoon: Initial Case Management Conference held on 3/24/2025. The parties indicated that an administrative stay is necessary in light of Plaintiff's condition. The Court ordered the parties to file a motion requesting such relief by tomorrow, 3/25/2025. (Court Reporter: None) (jmm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
28 28 adr Stipulation Selecting ADR process Thu 03/20 2:50 PM
STIPULATION selecting ADR process by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (McMinn, Jineane)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
27 27 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 03/17 3:35 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 03/17 11:01 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Attorney Signature Deficient Mon 03/17 12:46 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re26 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. ERROR: Attorney signature missing required information specifically attorney's id number. CORRECTION: Attorney directed to comply with requirements of LCvR 5.2(B) in all future filings. This message is for informational purposes only. (cel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
25 25 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 03/13 8:44 AM
ORDER granting24 Motion for Jineane R. McMinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/12/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Thu 03/13 8:29 AM
MOTION for attorney Jineane R. McMinn to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8750630) by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (McMinn, Jineane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
23 23 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/13 8:24 AM
ORDER granting21 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Devon F. Ferris is terminated as to this matter. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/13/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 03/13 8:23 AM
ORDER granting20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Dennis A Watson is terminated as to this matter. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/13/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
21 21 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/12 5:32 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Ferris, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
20 20 motion Withdraw as Attorney Wed 03/12 5:24 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Watson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/12 4:14 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Ryan A. Hahn to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 3/12/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (for Attorney filers only, Credit Card required) Wed 03/12 3:34 PM
MOTION for attorney Ryan A. Hahn to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-8749952) by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Hahn, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Ryan A. Hahn,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
17 17 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 02/25 10:05 AM
ORDER that the Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 3/28/2025 is RESCHEDULED for 3/24/2025 at 11:30 AM before Judge Cathy Bissoon. All other provisions set forth per the11 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/25/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
16 16 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 02/21 5:33 PM
ORDER granting15 Joint Motion to Continue. The Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 2/24/2025 is RESCHEDULED for 3/28/2025 at 10:30 AM before Judge Cathy Bissoon. All other deadlines and provisions set forth per the 11 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 2/21/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Continue Fri 02/21 3:57 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Deadlines and Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Videoconference by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Ferris, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion to Continue Tue 01/07 2:37 PM
ORDER granting13 Consent Motion to Continue Initial Case Management Deadlines and Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Videoconference. The Initial Case Management Conference currently set for 1/10/2025 is RESCHEDULED for 2/24/2025 at 1:00 PM before Judge Cathy Bissoon. All other deadlines and provisions set forth per the11 Order remain in effect. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 1/7/2025. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jmm)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Continue Tue 01/07 12:24 PM
Consent MOTION to Continue Initial Case Management Deadlines and Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Videoconference by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Ferris, Devon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 1 pgs order Order Wed 11/20 3:23 PM
ORDER. All counsel of record in this case must read the attached article on mediation prior to the Initial Case Management Conference and share the same with their client(s). The attached article is being disseminated with permission of the author and The Pennsylvania Lawyer. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/20/2024. (jmm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Appendix Mediation Article
11 11 order Initial Local Rule 16.1 Scheduling Order Wed 11/20 3:15 PM
ORDER. A Video Initial Case Management Conference is set for 1/10/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Cathy Bissoon. See contents of this filing for detailed instructions and deadlines. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 11/20/2024. (jmm)
Related: [-]
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 11/20 11:51 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Watson, Dennis) Modified text on 11/20/2024 to add linkage. (rjr)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)) Wed 11/20 11:48 AM
Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate by IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Watson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Document incorrectly linked Wed 11/20 3:12 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re10 Answer to Complaint. ERROR: Document was not linked. CORRECTION: Linked to appropriate document. This message is for informational purposes only. (rjr)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 09/25 3:29 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by JEFFREY NEWLAND. IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC waiver sent on 9/25/2024, answer due 11/25/2024. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/25 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Devon F. Ferris on behalf of IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Ferris, Devon)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 09/25 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dennis A Watson on behalf of IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC. (Watson, Dennis)
Related: [-]
misc QC - Party did not file Disclosure Statement Wed 09/25 2:52 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re6 Notice of Appearance,7 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement identifying all parent companies, subsidiaries, and affiliates that have issued shares or debt securities to the public as required pursuant to LR 7.1.A. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days under Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > Disclosure Statement (LR 7.1.A and/or FRCvP 7.1(a)(2)). Disclosure Statement due by 10/2/2024. (cel)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
5 5 2 pgs order Order Fri 09/06 4:24 PM
ORDER governing procedures for motions filed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. See contents of this filing for instructions. Signed by Judge Cathy Bissoon on 9/6/2024. (jmm)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 09/06 3:57 PM
Summons Issued as to IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC (cel)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Errata (to be used by filers) Fri 09/06 2:18 PM
Errata re Quality Control message - Incorrect document attached by JEFFREY NEWLAND. Reason for Correction: incorrect document filed. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
misc QC - Incorrect document is attached Fri 09/06 9:14 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re1 COMPLAINT. ERROR: Incorrect document attached. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile the document, using the Errata event and attach the correct document. (cel)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 09/06 3:53 PM
Judge Cathy Bissoon added. (cel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
2 2 service Praecipe to Issue Summons Thu 09/05 2:50 PM
PRAECIPE to Issue Summons by Jeffrey Newland (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 cmp ATTORNEY Complaint (Credit Card Required) Thu 09/05 2:21 PM
COMPLAINT against IMPERIAL RIVER TRANSPORT, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $405, receipt number APAWDC-8442555), filed by Jeffrey Newland. (Baun, Gary)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet