Texas Western District Court
Judge:David Counts
Referred: David B Fannin
Case #: 4:24-cv-00041
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 2:41 AM CST
Defendant
Badlands Tank Lines Texas, LLC
Represented By
Ryan M. Kunhart
Dvorak Law Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
OTH Transit LLC
Represented By
Bernard R. Mazaheri
Mazaheri & Mazaheri
contact info
Sean Paul Rabalais
Law Office Of Sean Rabalais
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, February 24, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 02/24 10:36 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sean Paul Rabalais on behalf of OTH Transit LLC. Attorney Sean Paul Rabalais added to party OTH Transit LLC(pty:pla) (Rabalais, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
9 9 order Scheduling Order Tue 01/28 3:42 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/16/2026 03:00 PM in Pecos before Judge, Jury Selection and Jury Trial set for 4/20/2026 08:00 AM in Pecos before Judge David Counts, All Motions to Amend or Supplement Pleadings due by 3/5/2025, All Discovery due by 9/30/2025, All Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2025. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
8 8 misc Scheduling Recommendations/Proposed Scheduling Order Mon 01/27 12:16 PM
Scheduling Recommendations Jointly Submitted by OTH Transit LLC. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
7 7 2 pgs order Order Fri 12/27 11:11 AM
Order and Advisory. The parties are hereby ORDERED to notify the Court whether or not they consent under 28 U.S.C. § 636(c) to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
Related: [-]
6 6 4 pgs order Order Fri 12/27 11:09 AM
Order for Scheduling Recommendations. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order to the Court within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. The parties shall first confer as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f). Signed by Judge David Counts. (ab1)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/24 9:15 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint . Attorney Ryan M. Kunhart added to party Badlands Tank Lines Texas, LLC(pty:dft) by Badlands Tank Lines Texas, LLC.(Kunhart, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Wed 12/18 8:11 AM
Order to Require Service re1 Complaint filed by OTH Transit LLC. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff provide proof of service on Defendant Badlands Tank Lines Texas, LLC no later than Friday, January 17, 2025. Failure to respond or to explain why service has not been accomplished by this date will result in this case being dismissed against Defendant Badlands Tank Lines Texas, LLC for FAILURE OF PLAINTIFF TO PROSECUTE OR TO COMPLY under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Signed by Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/06 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to OTH Transit LLC. (ab1)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 09/05 4:48 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by OTH Transit LLC. (Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/05 4:47 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19192895), filed by OTH Transit LLC.(Mazaheri, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/06 8:27 AM
Case assigned to Judge David Counts. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ab1)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 09/06 8:28 AM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge David B. Fannin. (ab1)
Related: [-]