Colorado District Court
Judge:Regina M Rodriguez
Referred: Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:24-cv-02451
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Case in other court:Douglas County District Court, 2024CV30641
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 1:19 AM MST
Defendant
Roger F. Werner
Represented By
Karen H. Safran
Colorado Department Of Law
contact info
Caroline Maria Knight
Goodspeed Merrill LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC
Represented By
Cedric Dwight Logan
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Habib Nasrullah
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info
Iva Velickovic
Wheeler Trigg O'Donnell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, April 25, 2025
37 37 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Fri 04/25 1:56 PM
MINUTE ORDER: THIS MATTER, having come before the Court on Parties' Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order (the "Motion"), ECF No.35 , and the Court being fully advised, orders as follows: The Motion, ECF No.35 , is GRANTED IN PART and it is HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Order be amended as follows. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/25/2025. [Please see attached Minute Order for dates](dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
36 36 order Order Referring Motion Thu 04/24 10:54 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 35 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify27 Scheduling Order filed by Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 4/24/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
35 35 motion Amend/Correct/Modify Thu 04/24 9:39 AM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify27 Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC. (Velickovic, Iva)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
34 34 misc Reassigning Magistrate Judge Tue 01/07 8:58 AM
REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Chung at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-02451-RMR-CYC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Chung in Courtroom C-205 in the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse, 1961 Stout St, Denver, CO 80294. If previously directed to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty or his Chambers, Parties shall instead contact Chung Chambers at the following telephone number or email address: 303-335-2761 and Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (Text only entry) (cmadr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
order ~Util - Motions No Longer Referred Fri 12/13 8:38 AM
Motion(s) No Longer Referred:13 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery . SO OREDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 12/13/2024. Text Only Entry. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
33 33 minutes Status Conference Mon 12/09 4:23 PM
COURTROOM MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty: Status Conference held on 12/9/2024. FTR: A501. (cthom, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Wed 11/20 11:47 AM
MINUTE ORDER: For good cause shown, the Court hereby grants the Motion to Withdraw as attorney for Defendant Roger F. Werner filed by Karen H. Safran, Esq., of Goodspeed Merrill LLC. ECF30 . Caroline Maria Knight, Esq., of Goodspeed Merrill LLC, will continue representing Defendant. Ms. Safran's representation of Defendant in this case is hereby terminated. After docketing this Minute Order, the Clerk of Court shall remove her information from the case caption and remove her email address so that she does not receive future NEFs from this civil action. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/2024.(dgumb, )
Related: [-]
31 31 order Order Referring Motion Wed 11/20 11:17 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 30 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by Roger F. Werner. Motion referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 11/20/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
30 30 motion Withdraw as Attorney Tue 11/19 5:12 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Defendant Roger F. Werner.(Safran, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
29 29 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/23 9:53 AM
REPLY to Response to13 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery Attorney Caroline Maria Knight added to party Roger F. Werner(pty:dft) filed by Defendant Roger F. Werner. (Knight, Caroline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
28 28 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/16 12:02 PM
BRIEF in Opposition to13 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery filed by Plaintiff Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC. (Velickovic, Iva)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
27 27 order Scheduling Order Tue 10/08 4:13 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/7/2024. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
26 26 minutes Scheduling Conference ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Tue 10/08 4:12 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held on 10/7/2024 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. FTR: A501. (jtorr, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
25 25 order Minute Order Wed 10/02 4:37 PM
MINUTE ORDER: At ECF7 , the Court ordered that on or before September 30, 2024, the Parties shall file the proposed Scheduling Order and submit a Word copy by joint email to the Court at hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. That deadline has passed. The Parties filed the proposed Scheduling Order but have yet to email a Word copy to the Court. The Parties shall promptly email a Word copy of ECF24 to Chambers. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/02/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Proposed Scheduling Order Wed 10/02 12:06 PM
Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Roger F. Werner. (Safran, Karen)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 09/30 12:28 PM
ORDER: In light of the corrected version of this9 Motion to Dismiss being filed at ECF No.13 , this Motion9 is deemed MOOT. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 9/30/2024. Text Only Entry(rmrja)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Protective Order Mon 09/30 12:07 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/30/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 09/30 11:15 AM
ORDER granting19 the Parties' "Joint Motion for Entry of Proposed Protective Order" for good cause shown. The Parties shall promptly email a Word copy of the proposed protective order, ECF 19-1, to Chambers (hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov) so the Court can issue the protective order. See D.C.COLO.MJ V.5 ("[A]ll Magistrate Judges require parties to jointly email Chambers a Word copy of the proposed protective order to more efficiently modify and docket orders."). Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 09/30/2024. Text Only Entry (mehlc7)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Order Referring Motion Mon 09/30 10:44 AM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 9/30/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Protective Order Mon 09/30 9:39 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC.(Logan, Cedric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Document Protective Order
order ~Util - Motions No Longer Referred Mon 09/30 12:07 PM
Motion(s) No Longer Referred:9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery , by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 9/30/2024. Text Only Entry. (ccuen, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 order Order Referring Motion Thu 09/26 1:40 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTIONS: 9 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery filed by Roger F. Werner, 13 MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery filed by Roger F. Werner. Motions referred to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 9/26/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 09/26 1:39 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 9/26/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Thu 09/26 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Habib Nasrullah on behalf of Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLCAttorney Habib Nasrullah added to party Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC(pty:pla) (Nasrullah, Habib)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Letter Reassigning Case Thu 09/26 12:15 PM
CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to12 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All parties do not consent. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-2451-RMR . (Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
14 14 order Minute Order Thu 09/26 12:11 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the consent form filed by the Parties declining consent under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c) [ECF12 ], the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1(c). Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/26/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss Thu 09/26 9:49 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Corrected Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery by Defendant Roger F. Werner. (Safran, Karen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
12 12 misc Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge Wed 09/25 4:05 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC All parties do not consent.. (Logan, Cedric)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 09/25 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Iva Velickovic on behalf of Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLCAttorney Iva Velickovic added to party Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC(pty:pla) (Velickovic, Iva)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Entry of Appearance Wed 09/25 3:44 PM
NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cedric Dwight Logan on behalf of Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLCAttorney Cedric Dwight Logan added to party Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC(pty:pla) (Logan, Cedric)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Wed 09/25 9:23 AM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Or, In the Alternative, Bifurcate the Dispositive Issue of Mr. Buchl's Disability and Stay Remaining Discovery by Defendant Roger F. Werner. (Safran, Karen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/24 2:41 PM
NOTICE of Submission of Register of Actions by Defendant Roger F. Werner(Safran, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Register of Actions 9-12-24
Monday, September 09, 2024
7 7 order Minute Order Mon 09/09 3:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Magistrate Consent Form due 9/30/2024 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/30/2024 . Scheduling Conference set for 10/7/2024 10:15 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is ORDERED that Defendant shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference . Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/9/2024. (dgumb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 misc Magistrate Judge Consent Form Fri 09/06 9:59 AM
Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Case Assigned to Judge Fri 09/06 9:58 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
Related: [-]
4 4 service Affidavit/Return of Service - Other than Complaint Fri 09/06 9:58 AM
AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Roger F. Werner on 8/7/2024 (efoga, )
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Complaint Fri 09/06 9:57 AM
COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Roger F. Werner, filed by Mile High Meetings & Incentives LLC.(efoga, )
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases Fri 09/06 9:56 AM
FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 09/05 5:13 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roger Werner from Douglas County District Court, Case Number 2024CV30641. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9858726), filed by Roger Werner.(Safran, Karen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Complaint & Jury Demand,
Att: 3 Exhibit B CO SOS & Other Public Records,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Civil Case Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Affidavit of Service,
Att: 6 Exhibit E Summons