North Carolina Western District Court
Judge:Graham Mullen
Case #: 3:24-cv-00806
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
CauseDiversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 3:36 AM EST
Counter Claimant
App Solutions International, Inc.
Represented By
Jason Michael Fedo
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Angelika Hunnefeld
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
contact info
Counter Defendant
Accelerance, Inc.
Represented By
Meagan Lynn Allen
Wagner Hicks PLLC
contact info
Sean C. Wagner
Wagner Hicks PLLC
contact info
Defendant
App Solutions International, Inc.
Represented By
Jason Michael Fedo
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Angelika Hunnefeld
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
Accelerance, Inc.
Represented By
Meagan Lynn Allen
Wagner Hicks PLLC
contact info
Sean C. Wagner
Wagner Hicks PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
24 24 order Scheduling Order Mon 03/10 3:52 PM
Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan: Estimated Trial Time: 2-3 days. Discovery due by 9/30/2025. Motions due by 10/31/2025. Mediation deadline set for 10/31/2025. Jury Trial set for 3/9/2026 10:00 AM in Courtroom #8, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 3/10/2025. (add)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
23 23 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Fri 03/07 3:06 PM
Joint CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan (Allen, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
22 22 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/27 7:02 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Stay Initial Attorney's Conference Deadlines and RESPONSE re 19 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan by Accelerance, Inc.. Replies due by 3/6/2025 (Allen, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
21 21 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/26 4:50 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint, by App Solutions International, Inc..(Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 respoth Response Tue 02/18 5:34 PM
RESPONSE re19 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan by App Solutions International, Inc.. (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
19 19 discov Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan Thu 02/13 8:21 PM
CERTIFICATION of initial attorney conference and discovery plan(Allen, Meagan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 2025.02.10 DRAFT Proposed IAC Certification and Report
18 18 motion Stay Thu 02/13 3:35 PM
MOTION to Stay Initial Attorney's Conference Deadlines by App Solutions International, Inc.. Responses due by 2/27/2025 (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Counterclaim Wed 02/12 2:22 PM
ANSWER to13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Accelerance, Inc..(Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 02/12 2:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against App Solutions International, Inc., filed by Accelerance, Inc..(Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Professional Services Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Addendum,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - June 19, 2024 Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - July 2, 2024 Letter,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - October 14, 2024 Letter
Thursday, January 23, 2025
notice Notice to Conduct Initial Attorneys Conference Thu 01/23 8:10 AM
NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 you are required to conduct an Initial Attorney's Conference within 14 days. At the conference, the parties are required to discuss the issue of consent to jurisdiction of a magistrate judge in accordance with Local Rules 16.1(A) and 73.1(C). The[LINK:Certificate of Initial Attorneys Conference] , and if applicable, the[LINK:Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise jurisdiction by a US Magistrate Judge] , should be filed within 7 days of the conference. If appropriate, a party may file a Motion to Stay the Initial Attorney's Conference. CIAC Report due by 2/13/2025. (kab)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
15 15 misc Miscellaneous Filing Wed 01/22 4:03 PM
Miscellaneous Filing by App Solutions International, Inc.. re:13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Defendant's Disclosure by Party or Intervenor in a Diversity Case (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 01/22 3:49 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by App Solutions International, Inc.. (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Wed 01/22 3:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses , COUNTERCLAIM against Accelerance, Inc. by App Solutions International, Inc..(Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 12/12 10:02 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on December 12, 2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time Wed 12/11 6:33 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by App Solutions International, Inc.. (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 2:40 PM
ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Angelika Hunnefeld for App Solutions International, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Attorney served via NEF). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/25/2024. (kab)
Related: [-]
notice Notice - Out of State Counsel Mon 11/25 2:43 PM
Notice to Angelika Hunnefeld: Pursuant to Local Rule 83.1 you are required to Register for E-Filing Access or Link Existing Account[LINK:Link] . (Attorney served via NEF) Deadline by 12/2/2024. (kab)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
10 10 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice - one motion per atty Thu 11/21 6:26 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Angelika Hunnefeld Filing fee $ 300, receipt number ANCWDC-6745050. by App Solutions International, Inc.. (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Fri 11/08 11:52 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER granting 9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. All Defendants.. Entered by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on November 8, 2024. (DC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time Thu 11/07 5:57 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re:1 Complaint, by App Solutions International, Inc.. (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/07 5:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Michael Fedo on behalf of All Defendants (Fedo, Jason)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
7 7 service Affidavit of Service Tue 11/05 4:25 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service filed by Accelerance, Inc.. App Solutions International, Inc. served on 10/18/2024, answer due 11/8/2024.(Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Process Server
Monday, September 09, 2024
6 6 misc Citizenship Disclosure Statement Mon 09/09 5:14 PM
Disclosure Statement of Citizenship of Party or Intervenor by Accelerance, Inc.. (Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 09/09 8:39 AM
Summons Issued Electronically as to App Solutions International, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print the summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4 . (llp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 09/09 8:36 AM
Case assigned to Senior Judge Graham Mullen. Notice: You must click this link to retrieve the[LINK:Case Assignment Packet] . This is your only notice - you will not receive a separate document. (llp)
Related: [-]
utility Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence Mon 09/09 8:36 AM
Standing Order Regarding Use of Artificial Intelligence (3:24-mc-104). Click on this link to retrieve the Standing Order (llp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 6:39 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Meagan Lynn Allen on behalf of Accelerance, Inc. (Allen, Meagan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/05 6:32 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Accelerance, Inc.. (Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/05 6:30 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sean C. Wagner on behalf of Accelerance, Inc. (Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/05 6:27 PM
COMPLAINT against App Solutions International, Inc., d/b/a Applaudo Studios, a/k/a Applaudo with Jury Demand ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ANCWDC-6656511), filed by Accelerance, Inc..(Wagner, Sean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Professional Services Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - PSA Addendum