Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 2:24-cv-02319
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 1:21 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC
Represented By
Michael A Eixenberger
Kirton & Mcconkie
contact info
Phillip Winston Londen
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Travis Charles Hunt
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
James T Burton
Kirton & Mcconkie
contact info
Counter Defendant
Trans-West Incorporated
Represented By
Charles Luce, Jr.
Fennemore Craig Pc - Delgany St. Denver
contact info
Mario Carmelo Vasta
Fennemore Craig Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info
Defendant
Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC
Represented By
Michael A Eixenberger
Kirton & Mcconkie
contact info
Phillip Winston Londen
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
Travis Charles Hunt
Osborn Maledon PA
contact info
James T Burton
Kirton & Mcconkie
contact info
Plaintiff
Trans-West Incorporated
Represented By
Charles Luce, Jr.
Fennemore Craig Pc - Delgany St. Denver
contact info
Mario Carmelo Vasta
Fennemore Craig Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM MST
Monday, April 14, 2025
34 34 20 pgs order Order on Stipulation ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 04/14 5:23 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER pursuant to the parties'33 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/14/2025. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
33 33 misc Stipulation Tue 04/01 12:50 PM
STIPULATION for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order and Stipulated Federal Rule of Evidence 502(d) Order and Clawback Agreement by Trans-West Incorporated.(Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order
Friday, March 28, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 03/28 5:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trans-West Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
31 31 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/28 1:06 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trans-West Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
30 30 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/21 6:02 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trans-West Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
29 29 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 02/07 6:52 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trans-West Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
28 28 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 01/13 2:15 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. (Burton, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 12/13 9:49 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. (Burton, James)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Fri 12/13 10:59 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by Trans-West Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Wed 12/11 10:53 AM
ORDER granting the parties' Joint Motion for Clarification (Doc.24 ). Section 5(d) of the Rule 16 Scheduling Order (Doc.23 ) is clarified and amended to provide that expert depositions shall be completed by no later than 1/31/2026 rather than 1/31/2025. Ordered by Judge Diane J Humetewa. (CR) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
24 24 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 12/10 4:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Clarification of Rule 16 Scheduling Order re:23 Scheduling Order,, Terminate Hearings,, Terminate Motions, by Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC.(Burton, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order re: Motion for Clarification
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
23 23 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 11/26 11:44 AM
RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/29/2025. Dispositive motions due by 2/27/2026. ORDERED the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for December 2, 2024 is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically (Doc.22 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 11/26/2024. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
22 22 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 11/25 4:58 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically for Charles F Luce Jr. (Unopposed) by Trans-West Incorporated.(Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically
Friday, November 22, 2024
21 21 misc Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan) Fri 11/22 5:34 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Trans-West Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
20 20 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information Fri 11/08 7:50 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading19 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document. If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
19 19 answer Answer to Counterclaim Thu 11/07 10:39 AM
Plaintiff's ANSWER to14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Trans-West Incorporated.(Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 10/24 10:22 AM
Disclosure Statement by Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. (Burton, James)
Related: [-]
17 17 3 pgs notice Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information Thu 10/24 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark filed by Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. (Burton, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Fri 10/18 9:38 AM
NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
15 15 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information Fri 10/18 7:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading14 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document. If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. (DXD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 10/17 4:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Trans-West Incorporated by Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC.(Burton, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 10/03 11:52 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Michael A Eixenberger on behalf of Defendant Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 10/03 12:10 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for James T Burton on behalf of Defendant Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 09/25 3:37 PM
ORDER granting the Joint Motion (Doc.12 ) and an extension until October 17, 2024 for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED resetting the November 12, 2024, Scheduling Conference (Doc.10 ) to December 2, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. The remainder of the Court's Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference (Doc.10 ) is otherwise affirmed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/25/2024. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 09/24 4:50 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re:10 Order, Set/Reset Hearings,1 Complaint First Joint Motion for Extension of Time Re: Answering Complaint and Rule 16 Scheduling Conference by Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC.(Hunt, Travis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
11 11 service Service Executed Wed 09/11 2:05 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Trans-West Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference upon Transwest Mobile Truck Repair, LLC on 09 11-2024 (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 09/09 3:05 PM
ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 11/12/2024 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/9/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Service Executed Mon 09/09 12:14 PM
SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Trans-West Incorporated: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Availability of US Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction, Order, Trans-West Inc's Corporate Disclosure Statement upon Transwest Mobile Truck Repair, LLC on 09 06-2024 (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
8 8 misc Report - Other Fri 09/06 3:43 PM
REPORT of The Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Trans-West Incorporated. (Vasta, Mario)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
7 7 5 pgs order Order re Rule 12(b) Motions ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 09/05 1:17 PM
ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. Unless the Court orders otherwise, on December 4, 2024, the Clerk of Court, without further notice, shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/5/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
6 6 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information Thu 09/05 12:40 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (REK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 09/05 12:37 PM
Summons Issued as to Transwest Mobile Truck Repair LLC. (REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
Related: [-]
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Thu 09/05 1:28 PM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Charles Luce, Jr on behalf of Plaintiff Trans-West Incorporated. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
4 4 misc New Case Opened Thu 09/05 12:35 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23423292. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-02319 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 09/05 12:33 PM
Disclosure Statement by Trans-West Incorporated. (submitted by Mario Vasta) (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Thu 09/05 12:32 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Trans-West Incorporated. (submitted by Mario Vasta) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 09/05 12:30 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23423292 filed by Trans-West Incorporated. (submitted by Mario Vasta)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet