California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01783
Case Filed:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 06, 2024 1:13 AM PDT
Defendant
Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1)
Represented By
Samuel J. Pope
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Material Witness
Celia Gonzalez-Puga
Represented By
Michael S Pedretti
Law Offices Of Michael S. Pedretti
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Kelvin T. Chew
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 26 2024
JUDGMENT as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1), Count(s) 1, Dft sentenced to the custody of the Bureau of Prisons for time served; Supervised Release 1 year; $100 assessment imposed, $5,000 JVTA waived; No Fine. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie. (lao)

Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 3:08 AM PDT
Sunday, August 04, 2024
Arrest of Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (no document attached) (fjp) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand.(fjp) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Michael S Pedretti for Celia Gonzalez-Puga appointed. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand: Initial Appearance set for 8/5/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
3 3 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand: Arraignment of MW Celia Gonzalez-Puga set for 8/6/2024 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
6 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Initial Appearance as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand held on 8/5/2024. Appointed Federal Defenders for Yvette Virginia Hildebrand. Bond set as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1) $15,000 PS secured by 1 FRRA(or close friend). Bond due by 8/12/24 at 12:00pm. Rule 5 advisement provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 8/15/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Arraignment set for 9/3/24 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. ) (CD# 8/5/2024 DEB 24-1:4:12-5:01). (Plaintiff Attorney Allison Rogge AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Remy Bogna, Stephanie Kim FD-S/A). (aje) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
7 7 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release. Bond set for Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1) $15,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/5/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
9 9 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (cxl) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
11 11 ABSTRACT OF ORDER Releasing Yvette Virginia Hildebrand re10 Bond. Complete bond packet due by 8/12/2024 at 12:00pm or defendant must self-surrender to the USMS (cxl) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/5/24. (aje) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 BAIL REVIEW PACKET as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand. Report prepared by: J. Almaraz Hernandez. (Document applicable to USA, Yvette Virginia Hildebrand.) (Almaraz Hernandez, J.) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kelvin T. Chew appearing for USA. (Chew, Kelvin)Attorney Kelvin T. Chew added to party USA(pty:pla) (axi). [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
10 10 P/S Bond Filed as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand in amount of $ 15,000, Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/5/2024. (Document applicable to USA, Yvette Virginia Hildebrand.) (cxl) (acc). [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/13/2024) Complete Bond submitted 8/13/2024
12 12 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Samuel J. Pope appearing for Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (Pope, Samuel)Attorney Samuel J. Pope added to party Yvette Virginia Hildebrand(pty:dft) (axi). [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
14 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Arraignment of Material Witness Celia Gonzalez-Puga held on 8/6/2024. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Michael Pedretti(n/a). Material Witness bail set at $5,000 PS w/10% percent cash deposit with 1 FRRA. (Interpreter Indra Zuno-Pantoja). (CD# 8/6/2024 DEB 24-1:1:55-1:59). (Plaintiff Attorney Allison Rogge AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Celia Gonzalez-Puga. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 PS w/ $500 cash deposit and 1 FRRA,. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/6/2024. (cxl) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
16 16 MINUTE ORDER as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand. The Court orders extension of time to submit complete bond packet to 8/13/2024 at 12:00pm. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 8/12/2024. (no document attached) (acc) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
17 17 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand. Preliminary Hearing set for 9/3/2024 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 09/03/2024. (ggv) (jms). [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
18 18 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Chew, Kelvin) (axi). [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
19 19 STIPULATION OF FACT AND JOINT MOTION FOR RELEASE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Celia Gonzalez-Puga as to defendant Yvette Virginia Hildebrand and Order Thereon. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 09/03/2024. (ggv) [3:24-mj-02983-DEB]
Related: [-]
20 20 2 pgs INFORMATION as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1) count(s) 1, 2. (tlw)
Related: [-]
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Arraignment on Information as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand (1) Count 1,2 held on 9/3/2024. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 9/27/2024 01:30 PM before District Judge Robert S. Huie. Material Witness Hearing in case as to Yvette Virginia Hildebrand held on 9/3/2024. Defendant stipulates to the release of the material witness. Court orders release of material witness and abstract issued. (CD# 9/3/2024 DEB 24: 2:11-2:26). (Plaintiff Attorney Sarah Goldwasser, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Carmel Abuzaid, FD S/A). (Material Witness Attorney Christopher Monelt, CJA). (dxj)
Related: [-]