New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-mj-01298
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 06, 2024 1:36 AM MDT
Defendant
Maximino Castillo-Marin (1)
Represented By
Darren Robinson
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Richard C Williams
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 3:01 AM MDT
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
Arrest of Maximino Castillo-Marin (bw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
Hearing as to Maximino Castillo-Marin: Initial Appearance set for 9/5/2024 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (bw)
Related: [-]