Texas Western District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-02246
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Last checked: Friday Sep 06, 2024 2:36 AM CDT
Defendant
Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga (1)
Represented By
Jaime Iran Aldape
Aldape Law Firm, P.L.L.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Izaak Philip Bruce
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Nov 20 2024
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge Matthew H. Watters as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga. Signed by Judge Matthew H. Watters. (dd)
GPO Dec 04 2024
ORDER accepting re 24 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Chief Judge Alia Moses. (dd)

Docket last updated: 09/06/2024 4:18 AM CDT
Saturday, August 10, 2024
Arrest of Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga (drda) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
Warrant Returned Executed as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga. (drda) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga. (drda) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant Issued by Judge Joseph A Cordova as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga. (drda) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
True Name of Defendant as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga. True name of defendant is: Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga. (mgc) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL MOTION to Continue, ORAL MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to USA as to Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga. (drda) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
ORAL ORDER GRANTING ORAL Motion to Continue as to Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga (1); GRANTING ORAL Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond as to Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga (1).By Judge Joseph A Cordova. (drda) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proceedings held before Judge Joseph A Cordova:Initial Appearance as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga held on 8/13/2024 Detention Hearing AND Preliminary Hearing set for 8/16/2024 9:00AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova, SPANISH Language Interpreter required as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga (Court Reporter FTR GOLD-MG CIENEGA.) (drda) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Jaime Iran Aldape for Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga appointed. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
5 5 MOTION to Continue Preliminary/Detention Hearing by Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga. (Aldape, Jaime) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER GRANTING5 Motion to Continue as to Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga (1) Detention Hearing and Preliminary Hearing RESET for 8/22/2024 09:00 AM before Judge Joseph A Cordova. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (ic) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga (Aldape, Jaime) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga. Signed by Judge Joseph A Cordova. (bot1) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
True Name of Defendant as to Alicia Yudith Pena-Zuniga. True name of defendant is: Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga as reflected in the indictment. (ccr) [2:24-mj-02219-JAC]
Related: [-]
9 9 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
11 11 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Yudith Alicia Pena-Zuniga (bot1)
Related: [-]