California Southern District Court
Judge:Robert S Huie
Referred: David D Leshner
Case #: 3:24-cv-01575
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332lr Diversity - Labor
Case Filed:Sep 04, 2024
Terminated:Feb 05, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, San Diego, 37-02023-00044631-CU-OE-CTL
Last checked: Monday Mar 03, 2025 12:25 AM PST
Defendant
Does 1 through 25
Defendant
Enterprise Bank & Trust
Represented By
Edward Todd Trumper
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
James Edward Pilley
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Lauren R. Presser
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Maricris Santiago
Represented By
Steven Riznyk
Riznyk & Company, Apc
contact info

GPO Jan 31 2025
Order on Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 01/31/2025.(stn)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Wed 02/05 4:59 PM
Order On Joint Motion To Dismiss [ECF No.14 ]. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 02/05/2025. (stn) (exs)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Dismiss Wed 02/05 1:23 PM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action with Prejudice Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Enterprise Bank & Trust.(Pilley, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
13 13 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/31 2:01 PM
Order on Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Robert S. Huie on 01/31/2025.(stn)
Related: [-]
12 12 minutes ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 01/31 10:42 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner. In light of the filings at Dkt. Nos. 10 and 11, the Court VACATES the Settlement Disposition Conference set for January 31, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. (no document attached) (fxb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
11 11 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 01/30 4:37 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Maricris Santiago (Riznyk, Steven)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Dismiss Thu 01/30 4:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Maricris Santiago. (Riznyk, Steven)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
9 9 minutes ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 11/01 9:40 AM
The Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference scheduled for November 18, 2024 are vacated. (no document attached) (fxb)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 11/01 9:33 AM
In light of the parties' Joint Notice of Settlement (Dkt. No. 7), the Court hereby vacates the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference scheduled for November 18, 2024, and all associated deadlines. Accordingly, the Motion to Continue the deadlines for 90 days is denied as moot. The Court hereby sets a telephonic, counsel-only Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC") for January 31, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel must conference together on a single line, then jointly call chambers (619-837-6526) at the appointed time. If dismissal papers are filed before January 31, the SDC will be vacated. (no document attached) (fxb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
7 7 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 10/31 4:46 PM
NOTICE of Settlement In Principle and Joint Request to Continue All Pending Deadlines and Hearings by Enterprise Bank & Trust (Pilley, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 1:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Todd Trumper on behalf of Enterprise Bank & Trust (Trumper, Edward)Attorney Edward Todd Trumper added to party Enterprise Bank & Trust(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
5 5 order Order of Judge Transfer Tue 09/24 9:12 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Robert S. Huie for all further proceedings. The new case number is 24CV1575-RSH-DDL.(no document attached) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
4 4 7 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 09/05 1:47 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/18/2024 at 2:00pm. Joint Discovery Plan due 11/4/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner on 9/05/2024.(jpp) Modified on 9/5/2024 to edit text, NEF resent to all parties. (jpp).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 09/05 10:46 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enterprise Bank & Trust. Enterprise Financial Services Corp listed as Corporate Parents(axc1).
Related: [-]
2 2 respoth Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Thu 09/05 10:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Enterprise Bank & Trust. (axc1). (sjt).
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 09/05 10:35 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19156937.), filed by Enterprise Bank & Trust. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1575-BEN-DDL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge David D. Leshner are assigned to the case. (axc1).(sjt).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Collen Slocum,
Att: 2 Declaration of James Pilley,
Att: 3 Exhibit A,
Att: 4 Exhibit B,
Att: 5 Exhibit C,
Att: 6 Exhibit D,
Att: 7 Exhibit E,
Att: 8 Exhibit F,
Att: 9 Exhibit G,
Att: 10 Exhibit H,
Att: 11 Exhibit I,
Att: 12 Exhibit J,
Att: 13 Exhibit K,
Att: 14 Exhibit L,
Att: 15 Exhibit M,
Att: 16 Exhibit N,
Att: 17 Exhibit O,
Att: 18 Civil Cover Sheet