Oregon District Court
Judge:Jeff Armistead
Case #: 3:24-cv-01497
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 2:27 AM PST
Defendant
Washington County / Washington County District Attorney's Office
Represented By
John Mansfield
Washington County Counsel
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristen McEvoy
Represented By
Jose A. Klein
Klein Munsinger LLC
contact info
Damien T. Munsinger
Klein Munsinger LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
14 14 notice Attorney Substitution Fri 04/11 10:14 AM
Notice of Attorney Substitution: Karen M. Vickers is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney John Mansfield . Filed by on behalf of Washington County / Washington County District Attorney's Office. (Vickers, Karen)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 31, 2025
13 13 oth_sup Declaration Fri 01/31 4:09 PM
Declaration of D. Munsinger Regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint . Filed by Kristen McEvoy. Related [+] (Munsinger, Damien)
Related: [-] Amended Complaint12 .
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint (ALL CASE TYPES) Fri 01/31 4:07 PM
First Amended Complaint . Filed by Kristen McEvoy against Washington County / Washington County District Attorney's Office. (Munsinger, Damien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
11 11 7 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Wed 01/08 8:22 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed on 1/8/2025 by United States Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (pjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
10 10 motion Protective Order Mon 01/06 4:30 PM
Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Kristen McEvoy. (Munsinger, Damien)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 20, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Summons Fri 12/20 2:41 PM
Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Washington County / Washington County District Attorney's Office waiver sent on 9/6/2024. Filed by Kristen McEvoy. (Munsinger, Damien)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
8 8 order 1 - Scheduling Wed 11/20 8:11 AM
ORDER: by Judge Armistead: The court acknowledges receipt of the parties' Joint Report of FRCP 26(f) Discovery Planning Conference and FRCP 16(b) Proposed Case Management Schedule7 and sets the following schedule: (1) Initial Discovery shall be exchanged on or before 12/20/2024. (2) Amendments to the pleadings or adding of any additional parties is to be filed by 2/3/2025. (3) Fact Discovery is to be completed by 7/7/2025. (4) Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 8/6/2025. (5) Dispositive motions are to be filed by 8/6/2025. (6) Expert Disclosures are to be submitted with 45 days of the court's ruling on any dispositive motions or, if no dispositive motions are filed, on or before 9/26/2025. (7) Expert Discovery to be completed by 11/10/2025. The court DEFERS scheduling a trial date as full consent to the magistrate judge has not been reached. The Rule 16 Conference set for 11/20/2024 is no longer necessary and is STRICKEN. (pjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
7 7 discov Fed R Civ P 26 Agreement Mon 11/18 10:44 AM
Joint Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement and Proposed Case Management Schedule . Filed by Kristen McEvoy. (Munsinger, Damien)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
6 6 order 1 - Scheduling Wed 10/09 1:51 PM
ORDER issued by Judge Armistead: Setting a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, November 20, 2024 at 11:00 AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. The court's conference call information will be provided to the parties by separate sealed entry. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. Rule 16 Conferences are ordinarily held telephonically. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to pam_geringer@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon on November 18, 2024. Alternatively, the parties may file a Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan by noon on November 18, 2024. If the proposed schedule is acceptable to the court and no significant issues need to be discussed, the court may decide that the Rule 16 Conference is unnecessary and strike it. The parties may file written consents to magistrate judge jurisdiction at any time, but the court recommends that consent forms be filed before a dispositive motion (i.e., motion to dismiss, motion for summary judgment) is heard. (The consent form is attached.) For more information regarding the role of magistrate judges and consenting to magistrate judge jurisdiction, see ord.uscourts.gov/consent. If the parties have a discovery dispute, they should jointly e-mail Courtroom Deputy Pam Geringer at the e-mail address above, and the court will promptly schedule a telephonic hearing to discuss the matter. (pjg)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/07 3:22 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, . Filed by Washington County / Washington County District Attorney's Office. (Mansfield, John)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 21, 2024
4 4 limited Consent to Jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge - by Party Sat 09/21 8:11 AM
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 09/06 2:44 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Washington County / Washington County District Attorney's Office. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (gd)
Related: [-]
2 2 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Fri 09/06 2:43 PM
Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5 . Discovery is to be completed by 1/6/2025. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 2/3/2025. Pretrial Order is due by 2/3/2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jeff Armistead. (gd)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/06 12:08 PM
Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $405 collected. Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9566330 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Kristen McEvoy against Washington County. (Munsinger, Damien)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons