California Eastern District Court
Judge:Dena M Coggins
Referred: Jeremy D Peterson
Case #: 2:24-cv-02430
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Case in other court:Sacramento Superior Court, 23CV010598
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 1:32 AM PST
Defendant
Triple Canopy, Inc.
Represented By
Andrew W. Russell
Mcguirewoods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Daryl Brooks
Represented By
Gregory A. Douglas
Law Offices Of Gregory A. Douglas, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Fareed Dhanoya
Represented By
Gregory A. Douglas
Law Offices Of Gregory A. Douglas, Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Douglas Price
Represented By
Gregory A. Douglas
Law Offices Of Gregory A. Douglas, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
9 9 3 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 04/15 8:35 AM
ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 4/14/2025 GRANTING8 Motion to Substitute Party and DIRECTING the Clerk of the Court to update the docket to reflect that Alfred Leon Brooks, Administrator of the Estate of Daryl Brooks, Deceased, is substituted in place of Daryl Brooks as named plaintiff in this action. (Deputy Clerk OML)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
8 8 misc Suggestion of Death Wed 04/02 4:53 PM
SUGGESTION of DEATH Upon the Record as to Daryl Brooks by Daryl Brooks. (Douglas, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 order Scheduling Order Fri 02/21 1:50 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins on 2/20/2025 ORDERING the Plaintiffs' anticipated suggestion of death due by 4/4/2025; Any motions or stipulations to amend the pleadings due by 7/3/2025; Initial Disclosures due by 3/7/2025; Fact Discovery due by 10/3/2025; Expert discovery due by 12/5/2025; Disclosures of Expert Witnesses due by 10/17/2025; and Dispositive Motions filed by 1/16/2026. Objections due within 14 days of the date of this order. (Deputy Clerk RRB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
6 6 misc Scheduling Report Wed 02/12 11:50 AM
JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT filed by Triple Canopy, Inc.. (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
5 5 misc Civil New Case Documents for DC Fri 10/18 10:59 AM
AMENDED INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins. Joint Status Report to be filed no later than 2/14/2025. (Schultz, C) (Docket Text Modified on 10/18/2024 by C. Schultz: "Amended" added.)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil New Case Documents for DC Fri 10/18 10:58 AM
(DISREGARD; REFER TO AMENDED FILING AT ECF NO.5 ) INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER signed by District Judge Dena M. Coggins. Joint Status Report to be filed no later than 2/14/2024. (Schultz, C) (Docket Modified on 10/18/2024 by C. Schultz: Disregard Language Added; Filing Date should be 2025.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
3 3 2 pgs misc Order Reassigning Newly Appointed District Judge Thu 10/10 11:34 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Troy L. Nunley: Due to the appointment of District Judge Dena M. Coggins to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from District Judge *Troy L. Nunley* to District Judge Dena M. Coggins for all further proceedings. All hearings currently set before the District Judge in this reassigned action are VACATED. (Kyono, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order
Friday, September 06, 2024
2 2 misc Civil New Case Documents for TLN Fri 09/06 12:23 PM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Licea Chavez, V)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form,
Att: 2 VDRP
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 09/06 11:56 AM
NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento Superior Court, case number 23CV010598 by Triple Canopy, Inc. . (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-11734053) (Russell, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits to Removal,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Notice of Interested Parties