Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Cynthia M Rufe
Case #: 2:24-cv-04720
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause29:621 Job Discrimination (Age)
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 4:45 AM EST
Defendant
CROSS COUNTRY MORTGAGE OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
Defendant
CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC
Represented By
TOVA Lyndley RABIN
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
ADAM E. COLLYER
Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
PENNY SMITH
Represented By
JEREMY M. CERUTTI
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, PC
contact info
ARI RISSON KARPF
Karpf, Karpf & Cerutti, P.C.
contact info
Unrepresented Party
CROSS COUNTRY MORTGAGE OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC
6 DICKENSON DRIVE UNIT 213-215
CHADDS FORD, PA 19317


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
12 12 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/11 3:51 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by PENNY SMITH. (CERUTTI, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 12/04 10:26 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC. (RABIN, TOVA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
10 10 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 11/27 2:49 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 First MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by PENNY SMITH.(CERUTTI, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC RTS Letters,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Penny Smith,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - EEOC Charge,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - November 1, 2024 Email,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - November 11, 2024 Email,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - November 14, 2024 Email,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - November 14, 2024 Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - November 14, 2024 Email,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - November 14, 2024 Email,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - Employment Agreement
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
misc Returned Mail Tue 11/26 8:36 AM
Copy of Order/Notice dated 11/6/24 (Document # 7) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to CROSS COUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC for the following reason: RETURN TO SENDER; UNABLE TO FORWARD. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
9 9 motion Compel Fri 11/15 9:52 PM
First MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC.Memorandum.(RABIN, TOVA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Memorandum,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit
Friday, November 08, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/08 8:10 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by ADAM E. COLLYER on behalf of CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC with Certificate of Service(COLLYER, ADAM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Wed 11/06 10:52 AM
ORDER THAT CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC SHALL FILE ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE 11/15/24; ETC.. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/6/24. 11/6/24 ENTERED AND MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(JL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 11/05 6:53 PM
STIPULATION to Enlarge Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC.(RABIN, TOVA)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/05 3:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by TOVA Lyndley RABIN on behalf of CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC with Certificate of Service(RABIN, TOVA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/02 11:36 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by JEREMY M. CERUTTI on behalf of PENNY SMITH (CERUTTI, JEREMY)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 29, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Sun 09/29 3:15 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by PENNY SMITH. CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC waiver sent on 9/6/2024, answer due 11/5/2024. (KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Mon 09/09 8:23 AM
Summons Issued as to CROSS COUNTRY MORTGAGE OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 9/9/24 (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 09/06 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against CROSS COUNTRY MORTGAGE OF PENNSYLVANIA, LLC, CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17725780.), filed by PENNY SMITH.(KARPF, ARI)
Related: [-]