Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Judge:Yvette Kane
Case #: 1:24-cv-01513
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Terminated:Mar 12, 2025
Case in other court:Adams County, Court of Common Pleas, 2024-SU-0812
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 4:58 AM EST
Defendant
Oliphant Haltom Golf, LLC
Represented By
Robert S. Stickley
Stickley Law, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Golf Cart Services, Inc.
Represented By
Nicole T. DuGan
Freeman Mathis & Gary LLP
contact info
Sean R. Riley
Freeman Mathis & Gary
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
misc Docket Annotation Wed 03/12 9:05 AM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Civil Case Terminated with Prejudice under FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(i) pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Dismissal with Prejudice. See (Doc. No.10 ). (dmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 03/10 1:31 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Golf Cart Services, Inc. (Riley, Sean)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
9 9 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Tue 12/03 8:47 AM
Order approving re8 Stipulation - It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by counsel for plaintiff and defendant that defendant shall have until January 3, 2024 to file an Answer to the Complaint. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 12/3/24. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulation Mon 12/02 4:49 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Third) by Oliphant Haltom Golf, LLC. (Stickley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Mon 11/04 1:50 PM
Order approving re6 Stipulation - It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by counsel for plaintiff and defendant that defendant shall have until December 2, 2024 to file an Answer to the Complaint. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/4/24. (dmn)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Mon 11/04 1:11 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (Second) by Oliphant Haltom Golf, LLC. (Stickley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Wed 10/30 10:56 AM
Order approving re4 Stipulation - It is hereby Stipulated and Agreed by counsel for plaintiff and defendant that defendant shall have until November 2, 2024 to file an Answer to the Complaint. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 10/30/24. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
4 4 misc Stipulation Wed 10/02 1:04 PM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT by Oliphant Haltom Golf, LLC. (Stickley, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
3 3 misc Letter Tue 09/10 11:16 AM
Letter to Counsel re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/10/24. (dmn)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Pursuant To FRCP 7.1 (Parent Corporations) Fri 09/06 3:43 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Oliphant Haltom Golf, LLC. (ll)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice for Removal Fri 09/06 3:42 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Oliphant Haltom Golf, LLC from Adams County, Court of Common Pleas, case number 2024-SU-0812. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAMDC-6749809), filed by Oliphant Haltom Golf, LLC.(ll)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Ex A Underlying Complaint
misc Docket Annotation Fri 09/06 3:44 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Riley is required to update their contact information through PACER. (ll)
Related: [-]