Frankfort et al v. Metropolis Technologies Inc
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Sam A Lindsay |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-02283 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Sep 06, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 4:35 AM CST |
Defendant
Metropolis Technologies Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Todd Frankfort
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Curtis Goodban
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarina Gutierrez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 73 minutes ago |
Wednesday, February 19, 2025 | ||
26 | 26
![]() REPLY filed by Metropolis Technologies Inc re:11 MOTION to Dismiss (Agrawal, Suyash) |
|
Monday, February 03, 2025 | ||
25 | 25
![]() ORDER granting20 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to11 Motion to Dismiss,14 Motion to Certify Class filed by Metropolis Technologies Inc. Having considered Defendant's unopposed motion, the Court concludes that it should be GRANTED, and both discovery and Defendants deadline to file a response to Plaintiffs' motion for class certification are STAYED until the Court rules on Defendant's motion to dismiss. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 2/3/2025) (mcrd) |
|
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 02/03 4:29 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting23 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss11 . Reply due by 2/19/2025. (Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Brian McKay on 2/3/2025) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to22 Response/Objection, filed by Metropolis Technologies Inc (Dennis, Edward) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2025 | ||
22 | 22
![]() RESPONSE filed by Sarina Gutierrez, Todd Frankfort, Curtis Goodban re:11 MOTION to Dismiss (Vartabedian, Robert) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Thursday, January 02, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() Order Referring Motion11 MOTION to Dismiss to Magistrate Judge Brian McKay. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 1/2/2025) (agc) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to14 MOTION to Certify Class ,11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Metropolis Technologies Inc (Schwegmann, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, December 10, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() ORDER granting17 Agreed Motion to Extend Deadline to Respond to Motion to Dismiss. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant Metropolis Technologies, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss (Doc.11 ) is 1/22/2025. No further extensions will be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/10/2024) (ykp) |
|
Friday, December 06, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS to17 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiffs Sarina Gutierrez, Todd Frankfort, Curtis Goodban. (Haynes, Craig) |
|
17 | 17
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to11 MOTION to Dismiss ,13 Appendix in Support,12 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion filed by Sarina Gutierrez, Todd Frankfort, Curtis Goodban (Haynes, Craig) |
|
16 | 16
![]() ORDER OF REFERENCE: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 636(b), Plaintiffs'14 Motion for Class Certification ("Motion"), is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Brian McKay for hearing, if necessary, and for the United States Magistrate Judge to submit to the court proposed findings and recommendations for disposition of the Motion. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 12/6/2024) (twd) |
|
Thursday, December 05, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Todd Frankfort, Curtis Goodban re14 MOTION to Certify Class (Lanier, W) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
14 | 14
![]() MOTION to Certify Class filed by Todd Frankfort, Curtis Goodban (Lanier, W) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, December 02, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Appendix in Support filed by Metropolis Technologies Inc re11 MOTION to Dismiss ,12 Brief/Memorandum in Support of Motion (Agrawal, Suyash) |
|
12 | 12
![]() Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Metropolis Technologies Inc re11 MOTION to Dismiss (Agrawal, Suyash) |
|
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Dismiss filed by Metropolis Technologies Inc (Agrawal, Suyash) |
|
10 | 10
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Metropolis Technologies Inc. (Clerk QC note: Affiliate entry indicated). (Agrawal, Suyash) |
|
Monday, November 25, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Suyash Agrawal on behalf of Metropolis Technologies Inc. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Agrawal, Suyash) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ORDER granting the parties'7 Agreed Motion to Extend Response Deadline: Accordingly, the deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is 12/2/2024. No further extensions will be granted. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 10/3/2024) (twd) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Metropolis Technologies IncAttorney Edward Jason Dennis added to party Metropolis Technologies Inc(pty:dft) (Dennis, Edward) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Metropolis Technologies Inc ; served on 9/12/2024. (Lanier, W) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() AMENDED DOCUMENT by Todd Frankfort, Curtis Goodban, Sarina Gutierrez. Amendment to1 Complaint,,,,,. AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET . (Lanier, W) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Summons Issued as to Metropolis Technologies Inc. (kcr) |
|
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (kcr) |
|
2 | 2
![]() CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Todd Frankfort, Curtis Goodban, Sarina Gutierrez. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Lanier, W) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Metropolis Technologies, Inc. filed by Curtis Goodban, Todd Frankfort, Sarina Gutierrez. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14898615) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lanier, W) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges (Public Entry)
Fri 09/06 4:44 PM
Judge Sam A. Lindsay added. Senior Judge A. Joe Fish no longer assigned to case. (twd) |