Texas Western District Court
Judge:Orlando L Garcia
Case #: 5:24-cv-01005
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 4:00 AM CST
Defendant
City of San Antonio
Represented By
Shawn K. Fitzpatrick
Fitzpatrick & Kosanovich, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Andy Segovia
Represented By
Shawn K. Fitzpatrick
Fitzpatrick & Kosanovich, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr.
Represented By
Marion M. Reilly
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
George Louis LeGrand
Legrand And Bernstein
contact info
Michael E. Richardson
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
contact info
Brent De La Paz
Attorney At Law
contact info
Jerry A. Gibson
Law Office Of Jerry Gibson
contact info
Robert A. Schulman
Schulman & Associates
contact info
Arthur Stanley Bernstein
Legrand & Bernstein
contact info
Kyle A. Batson
Martinez Reilly, PLLC
contact info
John B. Martinez
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sylvia Martinez
Represented By
Marion M. Reilly
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
George Louis LeGrand
Legrand And Bernstein
contact info
Michael E. Richardson
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
contact info
Brent De La Paz
Attorney At Law
contact info
Jerry A. Gibson
Law Office Of Jerry Gibson
contact info
Robert A. Schulman
Schulman & Associates
contact info
Arthur Stanley Bernstein
Legrand & Bernstein
contact info
Kyle A. Batson
Martinez Reilly, PLLC
contact info
John B. Martinez
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Juanita Najera
Represented By
Marion M. Reilly
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
George Louis LeGrand
Legrand And Bernstein
contact info
Michael E. Richardson
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
contact info
Brent De La Paz
Attorney At Law
contact info
Jerry A. Gibson
Law Office Of Jerry Gibson
contact info
Robert A. Schulman
Schulman & Associates
contact info
Arthur Stanley Bernstein
Legrand & Bernstein
contact info
Kyle A. Batson
Martinez Reilly, PLLC
contact info
John B. Martinez
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond A. Najera
Represented By
Marion M. Reilly
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
George Louis LeGrand
Legrand And Bernstein
contact info
Michael E. Richardson
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
contact info
Brent De La Paz
Attorney At Law
contact info
Jerry A. Gibson
Law Office Of Jerry Gibson
contact info
Robert A. Schulman
Schulman & Associates
contact info
Arthur Stanley Bernstein
Legrand & Bernstein
contact info
Kyle A. Batson
Martinez Reilly, PLLC
contact info
John B. Martinez
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard G. Najera
Represented By
Marion M. Reilly
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info
George Louis LeGrand
Legrand And Bernstein
contact info
Michael E. Richardson
Hilliard Martinez Gonzales LLP
contact info
Brent De La Paz
Attorney At Law
contact info
Jerry A. Gibson
Law Office Of Jerry Gibson
contact info
Robert A. Schulman
Schulman & Associates
contact info
Arthur Stanley Bernstein
Legrand & Bernstein
contact info
Kyle A. Batson
Martinez Reilly, PLLC
contact info
John B. Martinez
Martinez Reilly PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
32 32 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/10 4:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, re27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of San Antonio (Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
31 31 respm Response to Motion Mon 03/03 11:31 PM
RESPONSE to Motion, filed by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Sylvia Martinez, Juanita Najera, Raymond A. Najera, Richard G. Najera, re27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendant City of San Antonio,25 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Andy Segovia (Martinez, John)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 03/03 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kyle A. Batson on behalf of Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr. (Batson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 27, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 02/27 6:19 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Sylvia Martinez, Juanita Najera, Raymond A. Najera, Richard G. Najera.(Martinez, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 02/11 11:01 AM
Text Order GRANTING28 Motion for Extension of Time to File. The deadline for Plaintiffs to respond to Defendant City of San Antonio's27 Motion to Dismiss is hereby extended to Monday, March 3, 2025. Plaintiffs' counsel is advised to consult the Local Rules for the Western District of Texas regarding response deadlines. See W.D. Tex. R. CV-7(d). Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ROlc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 02/10 7:49 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Juanita Najera, Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Raymond A. Najera, Sylvia Martinez, Richard G. Najera.(Martinez, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 27, 2025
27 27 motion Dismiss Tue 01/28 3:14 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by City of San Antonio. (rqr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Mon 01/27 4:08 PM
Text Order GRANTING26 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Defendant City of San Antonio's Motion to Dismiss [26-1]. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
26 26 motion Leave to Exceed Page Limitation Fri 01/24 2:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limitation by City of San Antonio.(Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Motion Tendered for Filing in Excess of Page Limits
25 25 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 01/24 2:18 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Andy Segovia. (Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
24 24 25 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/10 2:44 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against City of San Antonio amending, filed by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr..(Batson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 01/08 10:41 AM
ORDER GRANTING IN PART21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (vl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
22 22 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 12/10 11:35 AM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia.(Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 05, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 12/05 4:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint and Responsive Answer and/or 12(b)(6) Motion by City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia. (Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 12/04 11:21 AM
Text Order GRANTING19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 notice Notice Tue 12/03 10:12 PM
NOTICE of Intent to file Second Amended Complaint by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr. (Batson, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 12/03 10:56 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Arthur Stanley Bernstein for Juanita Najera, et al.. (bt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
18 18 22 pgs cmp Amended Complaint Tue 11/26 8:50 AM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia amending, filed by Sylvia Martinez, Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Juanita Najera, Richard G. Najera, Raymond A. Najera.(bt)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 11/26 7:02 AM
Text Order GRANTING14 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Pursuant to the Facts Sheet, Question 36, Plaintiffs' amended complaint was due within seven days of their advisory stating their intent to amend their pleading. However, in the interest of justice, the Court will grant leave to amend in this case. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint [14-2]. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Tue 11/26 7:03 AM
Text Order MOOTING9 Motion for Reconsideration. The filing of Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint renders Defendants' motion moot. Defendants may request an extension of time, if needed, to answer or to otherwise respond to the amended complaint in compliance with the Court's pre-filing requirement for motions to dismiss. Entered by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (nm)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 11/15 5:04 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia, re9 MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , For Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion, and for Alternative Relief filed by Defendant Andy Segovia, Defendant City of San Antonio(Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 -- Conference Correspondence Concerning Unfiled Amended Complaint
Thursday, November 14, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 11/14 5:56 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia, re14 MOTION for Clarification of the Courts procedures and in the alternative Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Plaintiff Sylvia Martinez, Plaintiff Richard G. Najera, Plaintiff Juanita Najera, Plaintiff Raymond A. Najera (Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
15 15 9 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/08 10:23 PM
Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, filed by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Sylvia Martinez, Juanita Najera, Raymond A. Najera, Richard G. Najera, re9 MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , For Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion, and for Alternative Relief filed by Defendant Andy Segovia, Defendant City of San Antonio Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 motion Miscellaneous Relief Leave to File Document Thu 11/07 7:44 PM
MOTION for Clarification of the Courts procedures and in the alternative , Opposed MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Sylvia Martinez, Juanita Najera, Raymond A. Najera, Richard G. Najera. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Att: 1 Exhibit "A",
Att: 2 Exhibit "B"
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
13 13 misc Pro Hac Vice Letter Wed 10/30 2:10 PM
Pro Hac Vice Letter mailed to Stanley Bernstein regarding admission in the Western District Court of Texas. (rqr)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
12 12 4 pgs order Order Tue 10/29 11:15 AM
ORDER AND ADVISORY--It is ORDERED that the Plaintiffs confer with the Defendants as required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) andLocal Court Rule CV-16(c) to submit a proposed scheduling order for the Courts consideration within forty-five (45) days of the filing of this Order. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Advisory to the Court Mon 10/28 8:06 PM
ADVISORY TO THE COURT by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Sylvia Martinez, Juanita Najera, Raymond A. Najera, Richard G. Najera . Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Friday, October 25, 2024
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 10/25 6:17 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia.(Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Reconsideration Fri 10/25 11:52 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re8 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , For Leave to File Rule 12(b)(6) Motion, and for Alternative Relief by City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia.(Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Conferral Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Summonses Served on Segovia and the City of San Antonio,
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Proposed Rule 12(b)(6) Motion Presented for Filing With Leave of Court
Thursday, October 17, 2024
8 8 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 10/21 9:54 AM
ORDER STRIKING 7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. It is further ORDERED that Defendants responsive pleading be submitted to the Court on or before Friday, October 25, 2024. Signed by Judge Orlando L. Garcia. (mgr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
7 7 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Tue 10/15 1:24 PM
Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia. (Fitzpatrick, Shawn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/02 2:20 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Martinez, Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Juanita Najera, Richard G. Najera, Raymond A. Najera. City of San Antonio served on 9/24/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 10/02 2:18 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sylvia Martinez, Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Juanita Najera, Richard G. Najera, Raymond A. Najera. Andy Segovia served on 9/24/2024, answer due 10/15/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Wed 09/11 1:27 PM
Summons Issued as to City of San Antonio, Andy Segovia. (rqr)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) Submitted Wed 09/11 11:24 AM
JS44 (Civil Cover Sheet) submitted by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Sylvia Martinez, Juanita Najera, Raymond A. Najera, Richard G. Najera. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Friday, September 06, 2024
2 2 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 09/06 4:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Sylvia Martinez, Juanita Najera, Raymond A. Najera, Richard G. Najera. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Att: 1 Summons
1 1 18 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/06 4:14 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-19197848), filed by Sylvia Martinez, Estate of Ramon Najera, Jr., Juanita Najera, Richard G. Najera, Raymond A. Najera. Related [+]
Related: [-] illy, Marion
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/11 1:22 PM
Case assigned to Judge Orlando L. Garcia. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (rqr)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to SA Mag Judge Wed 09/11 1:22 PM
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Bemporad (rqr)
Related: [-]