Vermont District Court
Judge:William K Sessions III
Case #: 2:24-cv-00965
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Terminated:May 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 4:48 AM EST
Defendant
WDT Construction LLC
Represented By
Alexander L Stabinski, Esq.
O'Connor, O'Connor, Breese & First, PC
contact info
ENE Evaluator
ENE Evaluator
Represented By
Christopher L. Davis, Esq.
Langrock Sperry & Wool, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Britton Lumber Company, LLC
Represented By
Stephen D. Ellis, Esq.
Paul Frank + Collins PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Monday, May 12, 2025
41 41 ene ENE Letter Mon 05/12 3:31 PM
ENE LETTER re: Evaluator's Report. (law)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 05/12 2:49 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Without Prejudice by Britton Lumber Company, LLC (Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
39 39 discov Discovery Certificate Wed 05/07 1:55 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Objection to Defendant's "Notices of Deposition Duces Tecum" (Doc. 35) by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
38 38 discov Discovery Certificate Wed 05/07 1:04 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE (Certificate of Service) re:37 Motion to Amend Answer by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander) Text clarified, link added on 5/7/2025 (law)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Amend/Correct Wed 05/07 12:43 PM
MOTION to Amend Answer filed by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F
Friday, May 02, 2025
36 36 discov Discovery Certificate - Notice of Deposition Fri 05/02 3:58 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of WTD Construction, LLC (Amended) and Norman E. Church (Amended) by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
35 35 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Fri 04/25 3:17 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:34 Discovery Certificate filed by WDT Construction LLC. The document has been replaced to remove erroneous pages uploaded. The corrected document is now attached to34 and this entry. (law)
Related: [-]
34 34 discov Discovery Certificate Fri 04/25 2:38 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Notice of Deposition of Jack DeWolfe, Richard W. McLain and Dean Ritner by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander) (Text clarified and Main Document 34 replaced on 4/25/2025) (law)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
33 33 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/17 2:18 PM
REPLY to Response to24 MOTION to Continue the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
32 32 notice Notice (Other) Thu 04/17 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Withdrawal of Opposition re28 WITHDRAWAL of23 MOTION to Amend Answer by Britton Lumber Company, LLC. (Ellis, Stephen) Text/links clarified on 4/17/2025 (law)
Related: [-]
31 31 discov Discovery Certificate - Expert Disclosure Thu 04/17 10:57 AM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Expert Disclosure by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/15 2:18 PM
REPLY to Response to28 MOTION to Withdraw filed by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, April 14, 2025
29 29 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/14 1:48 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION to Withdraw Notice of Voluntary Withdrawal of Motion for Leave to Amend Answer filed by Britton Lumber Company, LLC. (Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
28 28 motion Withdraw Fri 04/11 12:06 PM
MOTION to Withdraw filed by WDT Construction LLC(Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
27 27 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/03 1:13 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Continue the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 04/03 1:04 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re23 MOTION to Amend Answer filed by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Monday, March 31, 2025
25 25 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Mon 03/31 3:09 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:24 MOTION to Continue the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by WDT Construction LLC. Exhibit A has been replaced to remove the illegible duplicate pdf header(s). The corrected document is now attached to24 and this entry. (law)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Amend/Modify the Discovery Schedule/Order Mon 03/31 2:53 PM
MOTION to Continue the Discovery Schedule/Order filed by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander) Event/text clarified on 3/31/2025 (law). (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/31/2025) (law)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 motion Amend/Correct Wed 03/26 9:36 AM
MOTION to Amend Answer filed by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander) Attachment descriptions clarified on 3/26/2025 (law)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 discov Discovery Certificate - Notice of Deposition Thu 03/13 5:12 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of WDT Construction LLC and Norman E. Church by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
21 21 discov Discovery Certificate - Notice of Deposition Wed 03/12 11:16 AM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Notice of Deposition of Robert Moses, Brian Moses, Charles Bullard, and Richard Adams by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander) Text clarified on 3/12/2025 (law)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
20 20 discov Discovery Certificate Tue 03/04 3:53 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Responses to First Set of Interrogatories by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
19 19 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 02/18 12:40 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(a) by WDT Construction LLC. (Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 discov Discovery Certificate - Interrogatories and Request to Produce Mon 02/10 1:12 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Interrogatories and Request to Produce to Defendant by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
17 17 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Fri 02/07 3:57 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:16 Discovery Certificate - Initial Disclosures filed by WDT Construction LLC. The document has been replaced to removed extra pages. The corrected document is now attached to16 and this entry. (law)
Related: [-]
16 16 discov Discovery Certificate - Initial Disclosures Fri 02/07 3:29 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander) (Main Document 16 replaced on 2/7/2025) (law)
Related: [-]
15 15 discov Discovery Certificate - Initial Disclosures Fri 02/07 1:14 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE - Initial Disclosures by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
14 14 discov Discovery Certificate Tue 02/04 2:59 PM
DISCOVERY CERTIFICATE re: Plaintiff's Objection to Defendant's Notice of Deposition by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
13 13 order Stipulated Discovery Schedule / Order Wed 01/29 8:23 AM
STIPULATED DISCOVERY SCHEDULE/ORDER: Discovery due by 7/1/2025; Motions due by 7/1/2025; Early Neutral Evaluation set for 3/25/2025 at 10:00 AM; Ready for Trial by 8/1/2025. Signed by Judge William K. Sessions III on 1/28/2025. (law)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
12 12 discov Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order (Proposed) Fri 01/24 3:02 PM
PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by Britton Lumber Company, LLC.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
11 11 ene Evaluator Assigned Wed 12/11 12:57 PM
ASSIGNED Early Neutral Evaluator: Christopher L. Davis, Esq. (law)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent Wed 12/11 12:53 PM
LETTER SENT re:9 proposed stipulated discovery schedule/order non-compliance with LR 26(a)(4); case will be set for a scheduling conference unless compliant schedule is filed. (law)
Related: [-]
9 9 discov Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order (Proposed) Wed 12/11 11:15 AM
PROPOSED Stipulated Discovery Schedule/Order by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
8 8 misc Stipulated Discovery Letter Sent Fri 12/06 12:03 PM
STIPULATED DISCOVERY LETTER SENT re: no stipulated discovery schedule filed; case will be set for a scheduling conference unless stipulated schedule is filed. (law)
Related: [-]
7 7 ene ENE Letter Fri 12/06 12:01 PM
ENE LETTER re: past due of selecting ENE Evaluator; responses due by 12/11/2024. (law)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
6 6 ene Potential Evaluators Letter Sent Fri 11/01 1:56 PM
ENE LETTER re: Potential Evaluators sent; responses due by 11/18/2024. (law)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/01 1:48 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by WDT Construction LLC re4 Answer to Complaint.(Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 11/01 1:43 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by WDT Construction LLC.(Stabinski, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
3 3 service Waiver of Service Returned Executed Thu 10/17 10:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: WDT Construction LLC waiver sent on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024.(Ellis, Stephen)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
2 2 utility Notice of Docket Entry Correction (PDF) Mon 09/09 12:07 PM
NOTICE OF DOCKET ENTRY CORRECTION re:1 Complaint filed by Britton Lumber Company, LLC. The JS 44 Civil Cover Sheet has been replaced to remove the instructional page. The corrected document is now attached to1 and this entry. (law)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/09 9:20 AM
COMPLAINT against WDT Construction LLC filed by Britton Lumber Company, LLC. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AVTDC-1969178)(Ellis, Stephen) (Attachment 1 replaced on 9/9/2024) (law)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 09/09 9:37 AM
Case assigned to Judge William K. Sessions III. (kac)
Related: [-]