Nebraska District Court
Judge:Brian C Buescher
Referred: Michael D Nelson
Case #: 8:24-cv-00351
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 3:41 AM CST
Defendant
GS Labs, LLC
17650 Wright Street Suite 5
Omaha, NE 68130
Represented By
Sarah M. Dempsey
Fraser, Stryker Law Firm
contact info
Jordan W. Adam
Fraser, Stryker Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Savista, LLC
Represented By
Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr.
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Andrew Callas
Fox, Rothschild Law Firm
contact info
Matthew G. Munro
Mcgrath, North Law Firm
contact info
Martin R. Martos, II
Fox, Rothschild Law Firm
contact info

GPO Nov 25 2024
PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in their Rule 26(f) Report, (Filing No. 16), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
GPO May 05 2025
ORDER - that the motion to withdraw as counsel of record (Filing No. 28) is granted and Sarah M. Dempsey is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant in this case. The Clerk of Court shall terminate electronic notice to Sarah M. Dempsey in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 05/05 10:03 AM
ORDER - that the motion to withdraw as counsel of record (Filing No.28 ) is granted and Sarah M. Dempsey is deemed withdrawn as counsel of record for Defendant in this case. The Clerk of Court shall terminate electronic notice to Sarah M. Dempsey in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 motion Withdraw as Attorney Fri 05/02 4:35 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Attorney Sarah M. Dempsey on behalf of Defendant GS Labs, LLC.(Dempsey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
27 27 minutes Status Conference Wed 03/19 10:50 AM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for status conference held on March 19, 2025, before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Jordan Adam and Sarah Dempsey appeared on behalf of Defendant. Counsel for Plaintiff did not appear. Discussion held regarding case status. The parties may reschedule the status conference, if necessary, by contacting chambers. (JLK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/06 3:09 PM
NOTICE of SERVICE by Attorney Sarah M. Dempsey on behalf of Defendant GS Labs, LLC (Dempsey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
25 25 oth_doc Certificate Thu 02/06 7:57 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's First Interrogatory Requests to Defendant by Attorney Martin R. Martos, II on behalf of Plaintiff Savista, LLC.(Martos, Martin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
24 24 oth_doc Certificate Thu 01/09 2:37 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Andrew Callas on behalf of Plaintiff Savista, LLC.(Callas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
23 23 oth_doc Certificate Fri 12/06 2:26 PM
Certificate of Service of Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Attorney Andrew Callas on behalf of Plaintiff Savista, LLC.(Callas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/25 3:26 PM
NOTICE of SERVING DEFENDANTS RULE 26(a)(1) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Attorney Sarah M. Dempsey on behalf of Defendant GS Labs, LLC (Dempsey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
21 21 audio Audio File Mon 11/25 2:25 PM
AUDIO FILE. Court Date & Time [ 11/25/2024 10:03:28 AM ]. File Size [ 5080 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:21:10 ]. (Telephone Conference). (auto-docket)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Protective Order Mon 11/25 2:24 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER Upon consideration of the parties' joint request for entry of a Protective Order in their Rule 26(f) Report, (Filing No.16 ), the Court enters the following Protective Order governing the disclosure of confidential Discovery Material by a Producing Party to a Receiving Party in this Action. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs order Order Setting Final Schedule for Progression of a Civil Case (NEW) Mon 11/25 2:23 PM
CASE PROGRESSION ORDER - Depositions due 10/15/2025. A status conference to discuss case progression and the parties' interest in settlement will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on March 19, 2025 , at 10:30 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. The trial and pretrial conference will not be set at this time. A planning conference to discuss case progression, dispositive motions, the parties' interest in settlement, and the trial and pretrial conference settings will be held with the undersigned magistrate judge on October 15, 2025 , at 11:00 a.m. by telephone. Counsel shall use the conferencing instructions assigned to this case to participate in the conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LRM)
Related: [-]
18 18 minutes Telephone Conference Mon 11/25 1:35 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for telephone conference held with counsel for the parties on November 25, 2024, by telephone before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson.Discussion regarding the parties competing case progression deadlines and entry of a protective order. Separate orders to be entered. Time Start: 10:06 AM; Time Stop: 10:26 AM; Time in Court: 20 Minutes. (JLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
17 17 order Order Setting Hearing or Trial Tue 11/19 10:32 AM
TEXT ORDER SETTING HEARING: A telephone conference to discuss case progression is set for November 25, 2024, at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. Counsel shall use the case conference instructions at Filing No.9 to participate in the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
16 16 oth_doc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Mon 11/18 10:04 PM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Attorney Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiff Savista, LLC.(Brookhouser, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
15 15 order Order on Email Motion Thu 11/14 8:28 AM
Text Email Motion. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to file their Rule 26 Meeting Report is extended to November 18, 2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
14 14 motion Email Thu 11/14 8:27 AM
TEXT EMAIL MOTION by counsel for defendant requesting an extension of the deadline to file the parties Rule 26 Meeting Report. (JLK)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/04 9:58 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Co-Counsel by Attorney Jordan W. Adam on behalf of Defendant GS Labs, LLC (Adam, Jordan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
12 12 order Order on Email Motion Fri 11/01 12:50 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 11 Text Email Motion. For good cause shown, the deadline for the parties to file their Rule 26 Meeting Report is extended to November 13, 2024 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (JLK)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Email Fri 11/01 12:47 PM
TEXT EMAIL MOTION by counsel for defendant requesting an extension of the deadline to file the parties Rule 26 Meeting Report. (JLK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Wed 10/02 3:25 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 by Attorney Sarah M. Dempsey on behalf of Defendant GS Labs, LLC.(Dempsey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
9 9 oth_evt Restricted Case Conference Instructions - WebEx Wed 10/02 8:59 AM
RESTRICTED CASE CONFERENCE INSTRUCTIONS - WebEx. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(e). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Scheduling Order Wed 10/02 8:57 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER - Rule 26 Meeting Report Deadline set for 11/1/2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson. (LKO)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/01 2:37 PM
DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint with with jury demand by GS Labs, LLC (Dempsey, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/10 4:32 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed upon GS Labs, LLC defendant Savista, LLC on 9/10/2024. (Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 11:21 AM
Summons Issued as to defendant GS Labs, LLC. YOU MUST PRINT YOUR ISSUED SUMMONS, WHICH ARE ATTACHED TO THIS DOCUMENT. PAPER COPIES WILL NOT BE MAILED. (LRM)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Requested Tue 09/10 10:54 AM
Summons Requested as to GS Labs, LLC regarding Complaint1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement,2 , Assignment of Judges, 3 . (Munro, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
3 3 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Mon 09/09 10:31 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Michael D. Nelson assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
2 2 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Fri 09/06 10:55 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Savista Holdco II, Inc., Other Affiliate Savista Holdco, LLC for Savista, LLC. by Attorney Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. on behalf of Plaintiffs Savista, LLC, Savista Holdco, LLC, Savista Holdco II, Inc..(Brookhouser, Patrick)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 09/06 10:32 PM
COMPLAINT against GS Labs, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5158699), by Attorney Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. on behalf of Savista, LLC(Brookhouser, Patrick)
Related: [-]