California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:24-cv-01583
Nature of Suit362 Torts - Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice
Cause28:1441pi Removal- Personal Injury
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Terminated:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 04, 2025 12:22 AM PST
Defendant
BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P.
Represented By
Probal Gerard Young
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Lindsey Mack Romano
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC
Represented By
Probal Gerard Young
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Lindsey Mack Romano
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Brookdale Senior Living, Inc.
Represented By
Probal Gerard Young
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Lindsey Mack Romano
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc.
Represented By
Probal Gerard Young
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Lindsey Mack Romano
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 200
Defendant
Mario Preston
Plaintiff
Reba Darlene Roudebush
Represented By
Robert Merrill Partain
Valentine Law Group
contact info
Joseph F. Fighera
Valentine Law Group, Apc
contact info
Kimberly A. Valentine
Valentine Law Group, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 4 pgs order Order Remanding Case Tue 09/10 3:35 PM
ORDER Remanding Action to State Court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/10/2024. (Certified Copy Mailed to State Court)(dim)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
5 5 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 11:28 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties (axc1)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 11:26 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Chad C. White, Corporate Parent Lucinda Baier, Corporate Parent Kevin W. Bowlan for BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc. (axc1)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 11:19 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC for BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc.(axc1)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 11:15 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC, Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties.(axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 09/06 11:09 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19160797.), filed by Brookedale Senior Living Communities, Inc., Brookdale Senior Living, Inc., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, L.P., BLC-Brookdale Place of San Marcos, LLC, Mario Preston. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1583-L-KSC. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Lindsey M. Romano