New Mexico District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-01244
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 1:36 AM MDT
Defendant
Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo (1)
Represented By
Chaz Rotenberg
Federal Public Defenders
contact info
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
Represented By
Monica J Hoyle
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Silvia Teresa Delgado
Doj-Usao
contact info
Matthew Ramirez
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/08/2024 3:14 AM MDT
Thursday, August 08, 2024
Arrest of Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo (rh) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
Sunday, August 11, 2024
Hearing as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo: Initial Appearance set for 8/12/2024 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. (rh) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo. Attorney Matthew Ramirez for USA added. (ac) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo. (ac) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Chaz Rotenberg for Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter: Initial Appearance as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo held on 8/12/2024. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: Patience Adzo Mohan; AFPD: Victoria Trull; FPD Standing In; Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 9:15 AM - 9:19 AM. Time In Session: 9:51 AM - 9:56 AM.Courtroom Deputy: Rebecca Helmick. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter for 8/15/2024, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (ac) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
4 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Hoyle, Monica) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Hearings by Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo (Rotenberg, Chaz) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (1) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ac) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo by Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter (ac) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
9 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo: Change of Plea Hearing set for 9/5/2024 at 09:10 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea. (rh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
Attorney update in case as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo. Attorney Silvia Teresa Delgado for USA added. Attorney Matthew Ramirez terminated. (vh) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
10 10 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution: Silvia Teresa Delgado substituted for Matthew R. Ramirez (Delgado, Silvia) [2:24-mj-01156-JHR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
11 11 INFORMATION as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo (1) count(s) 1. (gr)
Related: [-]
12 12 CONSENT TO PLEA BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo (gr)
Related: [-]
13 13 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo (gr)
Related: [-]
14 14 Clerk's Minutes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kevin R. Sweazea: Plea Hearing as to Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo held on 9/5/2024, Plea entered by Christian Uriel Catemaxca-Trujillo (1) Guilty Count 1. Related [+] (gr)
Related: [-] cording Info: LCR-Sierra Blanca