Indiana Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-00031
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Terminated:Nov 08, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Sep 08, 2024 4:02 AM EDT
Defendant
BRANDON J. ALFORD (1)
Represented By
Barry M. Blackard
Blackard & Brinkmeyer
contact info
James H. Voyles
Voyles Vaiana Lukemeyer Baldwin & Webb
contact info
Dennis Lee Brinkmeyer
contact info
Miscellaneous
USM (Court Use Only)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Matthew Bryce Miller
United States Attorney'S Office (evansville)
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/28/2025 11:58 AM EST
Friday, August 09, 2024
1 1 9 pgs INFORMATION FILED FELONY as to BRANDON J. ALFORD (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3-7. Electronic notice to USM-W. (JRB)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Matthew Bryce Miller appearing for USA. (JRB)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs PENALTY SHEET as to BRANDON J. ALFORD (1). (JRB)
Related: [-]
6 6 23 pgs PETITION TO ENTER PLEA OF GUILTY AND PLEA AGREEMENT as to BRANDON J. ALFORD (1). (JRB)
Related: [-]