New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 1:24-cv-06632
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Other
Case Filed:Aug 26, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Feb 22, 2025 5:54 AM EST
Defendant
East Ramapo Central School District
Represented By
Michael F. Perley
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Louis Fatta
Represented By
Michael F. Perley
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Karen J. Pinel
Represented By
Michael F. Perley
Hurwitz Fine P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Katherine Hurtado-Cassone
120 North Pearl Street Apt. 201
Port Chester, NY 10573
Represented By
Bryan Glass
Glass & Hogrogian LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, September 13, 2024
misc Mailing Receipt Fri 09/13 4:16 PM
MAILING RECEIPT: Document No: 3. Mailed to: Katherine Hurtado-Cassone 120 North Pearl Street Apt. 201 Port Chester, NY 10573. (nb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
3 3 1 pgs order Order Granting IFP Application Thu 09/12 4:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. § 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 9/10/2024) (vn)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
2 2 misc Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Sat 09/07 1:58 PM
REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Katherine Hurtado-Cassone.(laq)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Sat 09/07 1:52 PM
COMPLAINT against East Ramapo Central School District, Louis Fatta, Karen J. Pinel. Document filed by Katherine Hurtado-Cassone.(laq)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Sat 09/07 2:00 PM
Case Designated ECF. (laq)
Related: [-]
service Note Regarding Service on Self-Represented Party Sat 09/07 2:02 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT NOTE: For each electronic filing made in a case involving a self-represented party who has not consented to electronic service, the filing party must serve the document on such self-represented party in a manner permitted by Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(b)(2) (other than through the ECF system) and file proof of service for each document so served. Please see[LINK:Rule 9.2] of the courts ECF Rules & Instructions for further information..(laq)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order re Cases Filed By Pro Se Plaintiffs Sat 09/07 2:03 PM
STANDING ORDER IN RE CASES FILED BY PRO SE PLAINTIFFS (See 24-MISC-127 Standing Order filed March 18, 2024). To ensure that all cases heard in the Southern District of New York are handled promptly and efficiently, all parties must keep the court apprised of any new contact information. It is a party's obligation to provide an address for service; service of court orders cannot be accomplished if a party does not update the court when a change of address occurs. Accordingly, all self-represented litigants are hereby ORDERED to inform the court of each change in their address or electronic contact information. Parties may[LINK:consent to electronic service] to receive notifications of court filings by email, rather than relying on regular mail delivery. Parties may also ask the court for[LINK:permission to file documents electronically] . Forms, including instructions for consenting to electronic service and requesting permission to file documents electronically, may be found by clicking on the hyperlinks in this order, or by accessing the forms on the courts website, nysd.uscourts.gov/forms. The procedures that follow apply only to cases filed by pro se plaintiffs. If the court receives notice from the United States Postal Service that an order has been returned to the court, or otherwise receives information that the address of record for a self-represented plaintiff is no longer valid, the court may issue an Order to Show Cause why the case should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to comply with this order. Such order will be sent to the plaintiffs last known address and will also be viewable on the court's electronic docket. A notice directing the parties' attention to this order shall be docketed (and mailed to any self-represented party that has appeared and has not consented to electronic service) upon the opening of each case or miscellaneous matter that is classified as pro se in the court's records. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 3/18/2024) (laq)
Related: [-]