Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:24-bk-30162

Kentucky Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Douglas L Lutz
Case #: 3:24-ap-03006
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scott M. Bruggeworth
241 East Woodford St.
Lawrenceburg, KY 40342
Represented By
Scott M. Bruggeworth
contact info
Defendant
Annika M. Bruggeworth
241 East Woodford St.
Lawrenceburg, KY 40342
Represented By
Annika M. Bruggeworth
contact info
Plaintiff
Tracy Zisa
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giodano, Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Dean A. Langdon
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kristine Costello
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giodano, Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Dean A. Langdon
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Gina Bennett
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giodano, Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Dean A. Langdon
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Josehlyn Oyola
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giodano, Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Dean A. Langdon
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Autumn Goldbeck
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giodano, Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Dean A. Langdon
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaitlyn Gatens
Represented By
Donald F. Campbell, Jr.
Giodano, Halleran & Ciesla, P.C.
contact info
Dean A. Langdon
Delcotto Law Group PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
24 24 order Remanding Mon 04/21 2:46 PM
Order Striking Hearing Related [+] (gsc)
Related: [-] 21 Renewed Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Discovery Responses, filed by Defendant Scott M. Bruggeworth and Defendant Annika M. Bruggeworth
23 23 notice Notice of Withdrawal of Document Mon 04/21 2:13 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Document Filed by Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth Related [+]. (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-] 21 Motion to Compel filed by Defendant Scott M. Bruggeworth, Defendant Annika M. Bruggeworth
Thursday, April 10, 2025
22 22 order Compel(O) Thu 04/10 3:24 PM
Order GRANTING IN PART Motion to Shorten Notice of Hearing Related [+] and STRIKING April 18, 2025 hearing date. (gsc)
Related: [-] 21 Renewed Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Discovery Responses and Shorten Notice of Hearing
court Hearing Set/Cont Thu 04/10 3:26 PM
Hearing set on Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 4/22/2025 at 10:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (gsc)
Related: [-] 21 Renewed Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Discovery Responses, filed by Defendant Scott M. Bruggeworth and Defendant Annika M. Bruggeworth
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
21 21 motion Compel Wed 04/09 4:57 PM
Renewed Motion to Compel Plaintiffs to Provide Discovery Responses and Shorten Notice of Hearing, filed by Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth. Hearing scheduled for 4/18/2025 at 10:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (McClain, Michael) Modified on 4/10/2025 (gsc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Att: 2 Exhibit
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Compel
Att: 4 Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion to Shorten Notice
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
20 20 order Compel(O) Tue 02/18 7:40 AM
Order OVERRULING Motion to Compel Related [+] (gsc)
Related: [-] 18
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
19 19 epo Deficiency re Noticing Tue 02/11 10:14 AM
Deficiency - Action Required The Court having considered Defendants' Motion to Compel [ECF No. 18 ] and finding that the pleading does not meet the requirements as set forth by the Local Rules of the Court, specifically, The pleading does not meet notice requirements. It is ORDERED that, within 3 working days from the entry of this Order, the pleading shall be properly noticed in compliance with KYEB LBR 9013-1 and/or 9014-1, or the pleading may be overruled. /s/ Judge Douglas L. Lutz Document Due: 2/14/2025 (gsc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
18 18 motion Compel Mon 02/10 5:30 PM
Motion to Compel, filed by Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
Att: 4 Proposed Order
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 crtrptr Transcript Fri 01/31 3:07 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 01/16/25. Remote Electronic Access to the transcript is restricted until 05/1/2025. Until that time the transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office or a copy may be obtained from the Court Reporter. Contact: Tracy Gribben, Telephone number 800-603-6212. (Tracy Gribben's Transcription Service)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
16 16 order Continue Trial(O) Fri 12/13 6:43 AM
Order GRANTING IN PART Motion to Extend Trial Order Deadlines and Continue Trial Date, and GRANTING Motion to Shorten Notice of Hearing Related [+] (gsc)
Related: [-] 12
15 15 court Hearing Held Thu 12/12 12:39 PM
Judge's Minutes of Hearing Held Related [+]. (gsc)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Extend Trial Order Deadlines, Continue Trial Date, and Shorten Notice of Hearing, filed by Plaintiff Tracy Zisa, Plaintiff Diana Gonzalez, Plaintiff Jessica Suarez, Plaintiff Josehlyn Oyola, Plaintiff Autumn Goldbeck, Plaintiff Kaitlyn Gatens, Plaintiff Kristine Costello, and Plaintiff Gina Bennett
14 14 audio Audio File Thu 12/12 11:15 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 12/12/2024 10:08:02 AM ]. File Size [ 460 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:01:55 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
13 13 answer Response/Reply Wed 12/11 7:09 PM
Response Filed by Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth Related [+]. (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Continue Trial filed by Plaintiff Tracy Zisa, Plaintiff Diana Gonzalez, Plaintiff Jessica Suarez, Plaintiff Josehlyn Oyola, Plaintiff Autumn Goldbeck, Plaintiff Kaitlyn Gatens, Plaintiff Kristine Costello, Plaintiff Gina Bennett
Thursday, December 05, 2024
12 12 motion Continue Trial Thu 12/05 3:48 PM
Motion to Continue Trial, filed by Tracy Zisa, et al. Hearing scheduled for 12/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (Langdon, Dean)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 14, 2024
11 11 notice Notice Thu 11/14 12:17 PM
Notice of Service of Discovery Requests Filed by Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth. (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
10 10 notice Notice Thu 11/07 7:22 AM
Notice of Consent to Entry of Final Orders and Judgments Under Bankruptcy Rule 7012 Filed by Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth. (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-]
9 9 epo File Statement re Consent Thu 11/07 7:04 AM
Deficiency - Action Required Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7012(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure, a responsive pleading shall include a statement that the party does or does not consent to entry of final orders or judgment by the bankruptcy court. It appearing to the Court that the Answer, [ECF No. 8 ], do(es) not contain such a statement, It is ORDERED that, within 7 days from the entry of this Order, Michael W. McClain, Esq. shall file a notice regarding consent in conformity with the above-mentioned rule(s). /s/ Judge Douglas L. Lutz Date due: 11/14/2024. (gsc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
8 8 utility Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 11/06 5:01 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint, filed by Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth Related [+]. (McClain, Michael)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tracy Zisa, Plaintiff Diana Gonzalez, Plaintiff Jessica Suarez, Plaintiff Josehlyn Oyola, Plaintiff Autumn Goldbeck, Plaintiff Kaitlyn Gatens, Plaintiff Kristine Costello, Plaintiff Gina Bennett
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 cmp Alias Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Tue 09/10 5:09 PM
Summons Re-Issued to Plaintiffs for Service. (gsc)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Alias Summons Request Tue 09/10 10:21 AM
Request for Summons to be Re-Issued for Service on Diana Gonzalez, Jessica Suarez. Reason new summons is needed: Gonzalez and Suarez were added as plaintiffs in amended complaint. Request filed by Gina Bennett, Kristine Costello, Kaitlyn Gatens, Autumn Goldbeck, Diana Gonzalez, Josehlyn Oyola, Jessica Suarez, Tracy Zisa. (Langdon, Dean)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/10 10:16 AM
Amended Complaint by Jessica Suarez, Diana Gonzalez, Gina Bennett, Kristine Costello, Kaitlyn Gatens, Autumn Goldbeck, Josehlyn Oyola, Tracy Zisa against Annika M. Bruggeworth, Scott M. Bruggeworth Related [+] (Langdon, Dean)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Tracy Zisa, Plaintiff Josehlyn Oyola, Plaintiff Autumn Goldbeck, Plaintiff Kaitlyn Gatens, Plaintiff Kristine Costello, Plaintiff Gina Bennett
4 4 order Trial Tue 09/10 10:06 AM
Order for Trial. Trial set for 1/28/2025 at 09:30 AM at Lexington Courtroom, 3rd Floor. (gsc) Attorney for Plaintiff(s)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
3 3 court Summons Issued (Court Staff only) Mon 09/09 11:44 AM
Summons Issued to Plaintiffs for Service. (gsc)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
2 2 epo Discrepancy re Complaint Fri 09/06 8:30 PM
Deficiency - Action Required It appearing to the Court that the Electronic Case Filing (ECF) record and the Complaint [ECF No. 1 ], contain(s) the following discrepancy(ies): Paras. 6 through 12 identify a total of 7 plaintiffs but PDF caption and ECF identify only 6 plaintiffs. It is ORDERED that, within 7 days from the entry of this Order, the above-listed discrepancy(ies) shall be corrected by filing: An amended PDF document if the error was contained within the Complaint. OR An affidavit stating what the correct information should be if the error was made by failing to enter, or incorrectly entering, the information into the ECF system. /s/ Judge Douglas L. Lutz Date due: 9/13/2024. (gsc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 09/06 4:07 PM
Adversary case 24-03006 Complaint, filed by Tracy Zisa, Kristine Costello, Gina Bennett, Josehlyn Oyola, Autumn Goldbeck, Kaitlyn Gatens against Scott M. Bruggeworth, Annika M. Bruggeworth Fee Amount 350. (41 (Objection / revocation of discharge - 727(c),(d),(e)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)),(62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) (Langdon, Dean) Modified on 9/6/2024 (gsc). Court Note: Docket text was modified to add nature of suit. View the Notice of Electronic Filing for original docket text.
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Third Amended Complaint