Nevada District Court
Judge:Andrew P Gordon
Referred: Nancy J Koppe
Case #: 2:24-cv-01660
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Terminated:Oct 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 1:51 AM PST
Defendant
Campos EPC, LLC
1401 Blake Street
Denver, CO 80202
Plaintiff
Purely Cloud, LLC
8831 W. Sahara Ave
Las Vegas, NV 89117
Represented By
Russell G Gubler
Matthew L. Johnson & Associates, P.C.
contact info
Matthew L. Johnson
Matthew L. Johnson & Associates, P.C.
contact info
James Swiderski
Law Offices Of James Swiderski
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
13 13 2 pgs notice Notice Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/01 9:00 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff Purely Cloud, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs respm Response Tue 10/01 8:43 AM
RESPONSE to9 Order to Show Cause,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Plaintiff Purely Cloud, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
11 11 3 pgs respm Response Tue 10/01 8:39 AM
RESPONSE to9 Order to Show Cause,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Plaintiff Purely Cloud, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
10 10 6 pgs order Order on Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Wed 09/11 1:24 PM
ORDER granting5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to James Swiderski for Purely Cloud, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel as to Matthew L. Johnson. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/11/2024. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's e-filng system shall register on the PACER website[LINK:www.pacer.gov] (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order Show Cause ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings (non motion deadlines) Tue 09/10 5:58 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 10/10/2024. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff Purely Cloud, LLC's certificate of interested parties ECF No.4 is STRICKEN for failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2). Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/10/2024. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CT)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Errata Tue 09/10 11:30 AM
ERRATA to5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Purely Cloud, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
minord Minute Order Tue 09/10 11:00 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2024. Re:5 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, Verified Petition does not comply with LR IA 11-2(a). The client signed designating Russell Gubler as local counsel, but the petition identifies Matthew Johnson as local counsel and it is signed by Matthew Johnson. Counsel is advised to remedy the deficiencies and refile Petition under event Notice of Corrected Image linking to5 by by 10/10/2024. Failure to comply will result in denial of the Petition. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KSR)
Related: [-]
order Standing Order Tue 09/10 4:43 PM
STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink:[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
5 5 motion Motion Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition Mon 09/09 1:52 PM
MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by James Swiderski and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Matthew L. Johnson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number ANVDC-7803089) by Plaintiff Purely Cloud, LLC. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate Interested Parties Mon 09/09 1:47 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Purely Cloud, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Christopher Wing for Purely Cloud, LLC added. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Mon 09/09 1:24 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Campos EPC, LLC re1 Complaint. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
2 2 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James Swiderski to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/23/2024. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/09 11:54 AM
COMPLAINT against Campos EPC, LLC (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7802841) by Purely Cloud, LLC. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 9/19/2024. Proof of service due by 12/8/2024. (Johnson, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Mon 09/09 1:19 PM
Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (AMMi)
Related: [-]
notice Notice Desig of Local Counsel & VP Mon 09/09 1:20 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel James Swiderski to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. The form is available on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . Counsel is required to register for the court's electronic filing system at PACER[LINK:www.pacer.gov] to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 9/23/2024. (no image attached) (AMMi)
Related: [-]