West Virginia Southern District Court
Judge:Joseph R Goodwin
Case #: 2:24-cv-00489
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Terminated:Oct 08, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 4:46 AM EST
Defendant
Platinum Recovery, LLC
and 2019 State Route 821 Building 25
Marietta, OH 45750
Defendant
Theisen Brock
a Legal Professional Association c/o Jerry A. Brock 424 Second Street
Marietta, OH 45750
Plaintiff
Candi Kaufman
Represented By
Jeffrey V. Mehalic
Law Offices Of Jeffrey V. Mehalic
contact info
Plaintiff
Christopher Kaufman
Represented By
Jeffrey V. Mehalic
Law Offices Of Jeffrey V. Mehalic
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
11 11 notice Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal - Rule 41 Wed 10/09 2:17 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL With Prejudice by Candi Kaufman, Christopher Kaufman pursuant to Rule 41, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order Placing Case On Inactive Docket Tue 10/08 2:04 PM
ORDER Having been advised by the parties of the settlement of this action, directing that this case be placed on the inactive docket; the parties may submit an agreed order of dismissal within 30 days of the entry of this order; otherwise, dismissal will be without prejudice; the court will reinstate this case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause within 30 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/8/2024. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (lca)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice Of Settlement Tue 10/08 11:07 AM
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Candi Kaufman, Christopher Kaufman (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 10/08 10:22 AM
CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Platinum Recovery, LLC, Theisen Brock pursuant to Rule 55(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (cc: counsel of record; defendants via certified mail) (lca)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Theisen Brock Certified Label,
Att: 2 Platinum Recovery, LLC Certified Label
7 7 misc Transmitted Certified Copy Tue 10/08 9:49 AM
TRANSMITTED CERTIFIED COPY of6 Order, to counsel of record and defendants. (lca)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 10/08 9:45 AM
ORDER directing the Clerk to enter a default, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a), against the defendants Platinum Recovery, LLC, and Theisen Brock; further directing counsel for the plaintiffs to file the appropriate motion and affidavits, or to arrange for the necessary evidentiary hearing, to facilitate the entry of default judgment, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(b), within twenty days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/8/2024. (cc: counsel of record; defendants) (lca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service Wed 09/18 11:28 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Theisen Brock. Theisen Brock served on 9/12/2024, answer due 10/3/2024. Summons served on Theisen Brock. (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed By Personal Service Wed 09/18 11:26 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Personal Service for Platinum Recovery, LLC. Platinum Recovery, LLC served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. Summons served on Platinum Recovery, LLC. (Mehalic, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
3 3 order Mag. Judge Tinsley - Standing Order For Assignment And Referral of Civil Actions And Matters Mon 09/09 11:15 AM
STANDING ORDER IN RE: ASSIGNMENT AND REFERRAL OF CIVIL ACTIONS AND MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGES ENTERED SEPTEMBER 1, 2024. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Dwane L. Tinsley. (cc: counsel of record and any pro se party) (klc)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 09/09 10:29 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Platinum Recovery, LLC, Theisen Brock, re:1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (Attachment: #1 Electronic Summons as to Theisen Brock) (mfo)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/09 10:26 AM
COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $405.00. Receipt # AWVSDC-8727714. (mfo)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons as to Platinum Recovery, LLC,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons as to Theisen Brock,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned Mon 09/09 11:15 AM
CASE assigned to Judge Joseph R. Goodwin. (klc)
Related: [-]