Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Deborah L Thorne
Case #: 1:24-bk-13265
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Northpoint Development Holdings, LLC
5360 Kemkerry Road
Wesley Chapel, FL 33543
Represented By
Gregory K Stern
Gregory K. Stern, P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
68 68 notice 1-Amended Notice of Motion / Hearing Wed 05/14 4:51 PM
Amended Notice of Motion Filed by Gregory K Stern on behalf of Northpoint Development Holdings, LLC Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 01:00 PM at Appear In Courtroom 682, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Thorne. (Stern, Gregory)
Related: [-] 66 Obtain Credit/Incur Debt
67 67 motion Set Hearing Wed 05/14 4:49 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Set Hearing First National Bank Ottawa's Motion to Dismiss. Filed by Gregory K Stern on behalf of Northpoint Development Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 01:00 PM at Appear In Courtroom 682, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Thorne. (Stern, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
66 66 motion Obtain Credit/Incur Debt Wed 05/14 4:23 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Incur Debt and Shorten Notice Filed by Gregory K Stern on behalf of Northpoint Development Holdings, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 5/21/2025 at 01:00 PM at Appear In Courtroom 682, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Thorne. (Stern, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
65 65 notice 4-Notice of Filing Wed 05/14 3:40 PM
Notice of Filing Filed by Gregory K Stern on behalf of Northpoint Development Holdings, LLC Related [+]. (Stern, Gregory)
Related: [-] 64 Response
64 64 answer Response Wed 05/14 3:39 PM
Response in Opposition to Related [+] Filed by Gregory K Stern on behalf of Northpoint Development Holdings, LLC (Stern, Gregory)
Related: [-] 54 Motion to Dismiss
Att: 1 Exhibit LaSalle County Tax Records
Att: 2 Exhibit LaSalle County Tax Records (prior year)
Thursday, May 08, 2025
63 63 order Scheduling Thu 05/08 1:02 PM
Order Scheduling Related [+]. Response due by 5/14/2025. Status hearing to be held on 5/21/2025 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 682, 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 5/8/2025 (Hamilton, Annette)
Related: [-] 54 Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
62 62 court Hearing Continued (Status) Wed 05/07 3:26 PM
(E)Hearing Continued. Status hearing to be held on 05/28/2025 at 01:15 PM at Appear in Courtroom 682, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604, or Using Zoom - Judge Thorne. (Utter, Matthew)
Related: [-]
61 61 court Hearing Continued (Motion) Wed 05/07 3:26 PM
(E)Response due 05/14/2025. Hearing Continued Related [+]. In-person hearing scheduled for 05/21/2025 at 03:00 PM at Courtroom 682 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604. (Utter, Matthew)
Related: [-] 54 Dismiss for Other Reasons
60 60 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 05/07 12:44 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending 03/31/2025 Filed by Gregory K Stern on behalf of Northpoint Development Holdings, LLC. (Stern, Gregory)
Related: [-]