Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Donald R Cassling
Case #: 1:24-bk-13266
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Mar 12, 2025

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Miracare Neuro Behavioral Health, P.C.
11800 S. 75th Ave. Suite 300
Palos Heights, IL 60463
Represented By
David R Herzog
Law Offices Of David R Herzog
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Patrick S Layng
Office of the U.S. Trustee, Region 11 219 S Dearborn St Room 873
Chicago, IL 60604


Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
158 158 order Authorize Wed 05/21 9:59 AM
Order Denying for the Reasons Stated on the Record Motion to Authorize Related [+]. Signed on 5/20/2025. (Chavez, Baldo)
Related: [-] 138
157 157 court Confirmation Hearing Continued Tue 05/20 10:40 AM
POST Confirmation Hearing Continued . Post-Confirmation hearing to be held on 6/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Appear In Courtroom 619, 219 S. Dearborn St, Chicago, IL 60604 or Using Zoom- Judge Cassling. (Winston, Shurray)
Related: [-]