New York Southern District Court
Judge:Cathy Seibel
Case #: 7:24-cv-06818
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause28:1331sv Fed. Question: Securities Violation
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 4:43 AM EST
Defendant
Uday Baldota
Represented By
Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Katherine Mallory Tosch Hoggatt
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Samuel Stuckey
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Linda Benshoshan
Defendant
Abhay Gandhi
Represented By
Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Katherine Mallory Tosch Hoggatt
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Samuel Stuckey
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
James Kedrowski
Represented By
Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Katherine Mallory Tosch Hoggatt
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Samuel Stuckey
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Oded Sarig
Defendant
Dilip Shanghvi
Defendant
Robert Stein
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd
Represented By
Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Katherine Mallory Tosch Hoggatt
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Samuel Stuckey
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
Represented By
Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Katherine Mallory Tosch Hoggatt
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Jeffrey D. Hoschander
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Samuel Stuckey
Allen Overy Shearman Sterling Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Sudhir Valia
Lead Plaintiff
Neal A. Mitchell
Represented By
Arthur M Stock
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info
Mitchell Mark Breit
Milberg Coleman Bryson Phillips Grossman, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/28 2:10 PM
NOTICE of Notification to Court. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Stock, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
40 40 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 04/18 6:54 PM
DECLARATION of Samuel A. Stuckey in Support re:38 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint .. Document filed by Uday Baldota, Abhay Gandhi, James Kedrowski, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd...(Stuckey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A: Apr. 15, 2024 Taro Proxy Statement (Excerpted),
Att: 2 Exhibit B: FY2023 Taro Form 20-F (Excerpted),
Att: 3 Exhibit C: Jan. 17, 2024 BofA Presentation,
Att: 4 Exhibit D: Oct. 23, 2023 BofA Presentation (Excerpted),
Att: 5 Exhibit E: Dec. 2023 BofA Presentation,
Att: 6 Exhibit F: May 8, 2024 Press Release,
Att: 7 Exhibit G: May 14, 2024 Amendment 5 to Taro Schedule 13E-3
39 39 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 04/18 6:36 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:38 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint . . Document filed by Uday Baldota, Abhay Gandhi, James Kedrowski, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd...(Hoschander, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Dismiss Fri 04/18 6:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint . Document filed by Uday Baldota, Abhay Gandhi, James Kedrowski, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd...(Hoschander, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
37 37 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 02/17 5:25 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint, against Uday Baldota, Linda Benshoshan, Abhay Gandhi, James Kedrowski, Oded Sarig, Dilip Shanghvi, Robert Stein, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sudhir Valia with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell. Related document:1 Complaint,..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
36 36 order Stipulation and Order Tue 12/17 12:55 PM
STIPULATION AND SCHEDULING ORDER: NOW, THEREFORE, IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, and respectfully requested by and among the undersigned attorneys for the respective parties, subject to approval of the Court, as follows: 1. Within 60 days after the Court's approval of this Stipulation, Lead Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint or designate the Initial Complaint the operative complaint. 2. Within 60 days after the filing of an amended complaint (or designation of the Initial Complaint as the operative complaint), the Stipulating Defendants shall answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond thereto. Should the Stipulating Defendants elect to move to dismiss, they need not seek a pre-motion conference or file a pre-motion letter, and briefing on such motion to dismiss will proceed on the schedule set forth herein, except as set forth in the note on the following page. 3. Lead Plaintiff's brief in opposition to such motion to dismiss shall be filed within 60 days after the filing of such motion. 4. The Stipulating Defendants may file a reply brief in further support of any motion to dismiss within 30 days after the filing of Lead Plaintiff's opposition brief. Unless the parties opt to bundle the motion papers (meaning they serve each other but do not file until the motion is fully briefed, extensions of the briefing schedule are unlikely. 5. If a deadline herein falls on a weekend or federal holiday, the deadline will move to the next business day. 6. The parties expressly preserve all other rights, defenses, and arguments, including without limitation as to jurisdiction. NOTE: If Defendants move to dismiss, Plaintiff shall, within 10 days, to notify the Court whether he intends to file an amended pleading, or will rely on the pleading being attacked. If he elects not to amend, the motion will proceed in the regular course, and the Court is unlikely to grant a further opportunity to amend to address the issues raised by the motion. If Plaintiff amends, within 21 days of such amendment Defendants may answer, file a new motion to dismiss, or notify the Court that it will rely on the initially filed motion. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 12/16/2024) (mml)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
35 35 misc Letter Mon 12/16 6:22 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from Jeffrey D. Hoschander dated December 16, 2024 re: Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order. Document filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Abhay Gandhi, Uday Baldota, James Kedrowski..(Hoschander, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order : Stipulation and Proposed Scheduling Order
Monday, December 02, 2024
34 34 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Mon 12/02 7:34 PM
ORDER GRANTING NEAL A. MITCHELL'S MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT AS LEAD PLAINTIFF AND APPROVAL OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL granting31 Motion to Appoint. AND NOW THIS 2nd day of December 2024, the Court having considered Mitchell's Motion for (1) Appointment as Lead Plaintiff, and (3) Approval of Co-Lead Counsel and all supporting documents, it is hereby ORDERED as follows: LEAD PLAINTIFFS: 1. Mitchell's motion to serve as Lead Plaintiff in the Consolidation Action is GRANTED. CO-LEAD COUNSEL: 2. Mitchell's motion for approval of his counsel, Milberg and Ademi as Co-Lead Counsel is GRANTED. 3. Co-Lead Counsel shall manage the prosecution of the Action to avoid duplicative or unproductive activities. Co-Lead Counsel shall be responsible for coordination of all activities and appearances on behalf of Lead Plaintiff and the Class and for dissemination of all notices and orders. Co-Lead Counsel alone shall speak for Lead Plaintiff and the Class and Co-Lead Counsel are solely responsible for communications between Lead Plaintiff and the Class and the Court. 4. Co-Lead Counsel shall have the following duties and responsibilities to perform or delegate as appropriate, as further set forth herein. 5. Service of pleadings and other papers by Defendants shall be made upon Co-Lead Counsel, who are authorized and directed to accept service of such pleadings and other papers on behalf of all plaintiffs in the Action. 6. Defendants and their counsel may rely upon agreements made with Co-Lead Counsel. Such agreements are binding on all plaintiffs in the Action and the Class. 7. Pursuant to Section 21D of the Exchange Act, all parties shall treat all documents, data compilations, and tangible objects that are in his, hers, or its custody or control and that are relevant to the allegations of any related actions as if they were the subject of a continuing request for production of documents from an opposing party under the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. SO ORDERED. The Clerk shall terminate ECF No. 31. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 12/2/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
33 33 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 11/12 4:29 PM
DECLARATION of Arthur Stock in Support re:31 MOTION to Appoint Neal A. Mitchell to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion of Neal A. Mitchell for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of His Counsel as Lead Counsel .. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Stock, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Press Release,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Milberg firm Resume,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Ademi LLP Firm Resume,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Plaintiff Certificate
32 32 15 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Tue 11/12 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:31 MOTION to Appoint Neal A. Mitchell to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion of Neal A. Mitchell for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of His Counsel as Lead Counsel . . Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Stock, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Neal A. Mitchell's Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Co-Lead Counsel
31 31 motion Appoint Lead Plaintiff(s) Tue 11/12 4:25 PM
MOTION to Appoint Neal A. Mitchell to serve as lead plaintiff(s) Notice of Motion of Neal A. Mitchell for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Appointment of His Counsel as Lead Counsel . Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Stock, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
30 30 order Stipulation and Order Thu 10/24 9:57 AM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, and respectfully requested by and among the undersigned attorneys for the respective parties, subject to approval of the Court, as follows: The Stipulating Defendants waive service of the Initial Complaint, without prejudice and without waiver of any defenses, objections, or arguments, in this matter or any other matter, except as to the sufficiency of service of process of the Initial Complaint in this action; Defendants shall have no obligation to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to any complaint until a schedule for such response is ordered by the Court; Within fourteen (14) days of the Courts entry of an order pursuant to the PSLRA appointing a lead plaintiff, counsel shall meet and confer and submit for the Court's approval a proposed schedule for the filing by the lead plaintiff of an amended complaint (or the designation of the Initial Complaint as the operative complaint), defendants' response thereto, and briefing or other submissions associated with any motion(s) to dismiss; and The parties expressly preserve all other rights, defenses, and arguments, including without limitation as to jurisdiction. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Cathy Seibel on 10/23/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
29 29 misc Letter Wed 10/23 8:35 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Cathy Seibel from K. Mallory Brennan dated October 23, 2024 re: Scheduling Deadlines. Document filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Abhay Gandhi, Uday Baldota, James Kedrowski..(Tosch Brennan, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order JOINT STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER
28 28 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/23 8:13 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.. Document filed by Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd...(Tosch Brennan, Katherine)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 7:45 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Stuckey on behalf of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Abhay Gandhi, Uday Baldota, James Kedrowski..(Stuckey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 7:40 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey D. Hoschander on behalf of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Abhay Gandhi, Uday Baldota, James Kedrowski..(Hoschander, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 10/23 7:33 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Mallory Tosch Brennan on behalf of Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Abhay Gandhi, Uday Baldota, James Kedrowski..(Tosch Brennan, Katherine)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
24 24 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 9:04 PM
ORDER granting23 Motion for Arthur M. Stock to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Cathy Seibel)(Text Only Order) (Seibel, Cathy)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 10/16 12:52 PM
MOTION for Arthur M. Stock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30048656. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Stock, Arthur)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Arthur M Stock ISO Motion for Admission PHV,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - 2024-09-23 New Jersey COGS,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - 2024-10-04 North Carolina COGS,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - 2024-09-19 Pennsylvania COGS,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - 2024-09-19 Tennessee COGS,
Att: 6 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Wed 10/16 3:17 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 23 MOTION for Arthur M. Stock to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-30048656. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
22 22 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd..(pc)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:10 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd...(pc)
Related: [-]
20 20 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:09 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Dilip Shanghvi..(pc)
Related: [-]
19 19 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Stein..(pc)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:08 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sudhir Valia..(pc)
Related: [-]
17 17 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:07 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to James Kedrowski..(pc)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:07 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Abhay Gandhi..(pc)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:05 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Linda Benshoshan..(pc)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Uday Baldota..(pc)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 1:04 PM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Oded Sarig..(pc)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 09/10 11:21 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Cathy Seibel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Tue 09/10 11:24 AM
Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (pc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 09/10 11:24 AM
Case Designated ECF. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Tue 09/10 11:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Mitchell Mark Breit. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Neal A. Mitchell. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (pc)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Tue 09/10 11:24 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Mitchell Mark Breit. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sudhir Valia, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:20 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:19 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Stein, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:18 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dilip Shangvi, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:17 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Oded Sadig, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:16 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to James Kedrowski, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:15 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Abhay Gandhi, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:14 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Linda Benshohan, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Mon 09/09 5:13 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Uday Baldota, re:1 Complaint,. Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 09/09 5:05 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/09 5:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Uday Baldota, Linda Benshoshan, Abhay Gandhi, James Kedrowski, Oded Sarig, Dilip Shanghvi, Robert Stein, Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd, Taro Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Sudhir Valia. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29866679)Document filed by Neal A. Mitchell..(Breit, Mitchell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Plaintiff's Certificate