Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Rossie D Alston, Jr
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:24-cv-01579
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Terminated:Dec 19, 2024
Case in other court:Circuit Court for Fairfax County, 24-12750
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 5:03 AM EST
Defendant
The National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Represented By
Jeremy Steven Schneider
Jackson Lewis Pc (reston)
contact info
Plaintiff
Apryl Marie Fogel
Represented By
Jane E. Lemley
Harrison & Johnston, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, December 19, 2024
8 8 1 pgs order Order Thu 12/19 10:59 AM
ORDERED that the Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, and the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to place this action among the ended causes. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/19/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 12/19 9:14 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by The National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. (Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 11/25 11:25 AM
ORDERED that Defendant is granted leave to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before December 6, 2024. No further continuances will be granted re5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter on 11/25/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 11/22 5:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by The National Rifle Association of America, Inc..(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, November 08, 2024
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Tue 11/12 7:19 AM
ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED; and it is further ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to Friday, November 22, 2024 in re3 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Settlement. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/8/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Extension of Fri 11/08 4:03 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Settlement by The National Rifle Association of America, Inc..(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 04, 2024
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 10/04 11:44 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by The National Rifle Association of America, Inc.. The National Rifle Association of America, Inc. waiver sent on 9/9/2024, answer due 11/8/2024. (Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 09/09 4:57 PM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9729842.), filed by The National Rifle Association of America, Inc..(Schneider, Jeremy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 52 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 09/10 12:41 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and US Magistrate Judge William B. Porter. (Cwel)
Related: [-]