California Northern District Court
Judge:Susan Illston
Case #: 3:24-cv-06336
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 2:44 AM PST
Defendant
Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Jasmine Jane Stanzick
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Austin Hickle
Represented By
Andrew Joseph Gramajo
Ajg Law Group, PC
contact info
Heather Bryn Hersh
Jaffer Law Firm
contact info
Shawn Jaffer
Jaffer & Associates PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, February 10, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 02/10 10:47 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 19 Stipulation.Joint Status Report due by 6/6/2025. Status Conference CONTINUED TO 6/13/2025 at 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
19 19 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 02/07 2:59 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceeding Pending Completion of Arbitration and Joint Report filed by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC.(Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, January 13, 2025
18 18 minutes Case Management Conference - Initial ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Teleconference Zoom Mon 01/13 12:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held via Zoom webinar before Judge Susan Illston: Initial Case Management Conference held on 1/10/2025. Joint Status Report due by 2/7/2025. Status Conference set for 2/14/2025 at 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si MANDATORY ZOOM REGISTRATION: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argument at the hearing. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 2/5/2025 at noon. General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. Status Report due by 2/7/2025. Status Conference set for 2/14/2025 03:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only before Judge Susan Illston. Total Time in Court: 5 Minutes. Court Reporter: Zoom Recording. Plaintiff Attorney: Heather Hersh. Defendant Attorney: Jasmine Stanzick. (ec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/13/2025)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
17 17 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Wed 01/08 2:31 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING HEARING TIME: The Due to a change in the Court's Schedule the Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2025 is ADVANCED TO 12:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Counsel are to email sicrd@cand.uscourts to confirm receipt of this time change. No further Zoom registration is needed. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/si] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2025 12:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (ec, COURT STAFF). (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Fri 01/03 12:58 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE RE: ZOOM REGISTRATION: Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2025. A list of names and emails must be sent to the CRD at sicrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than 1/6/2025 at 2 pm. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Joint Case Management Statement Fri 01/03 10:39 AM
JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Austin Hickle. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 24, 2024
14 14 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Tue 12/24 10:47 AM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Inflection.com, Inc. for Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. and Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement (Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/24 10:41 AM
ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (Stanzick, Jasmine)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 10/28 6:24 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Austin Hickle. Service waived by Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC waiver sent on 10/25/2024, answer due 12/24/2024. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
11 11 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 8:57 AM
Summons Issued as to Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
10 10 misc Proposed Summons Tue 10/08 10:45 AM
Proposed Summons. (Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 1:22 PM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Heather Hersh.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 12:42 PM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19829128.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/27/2024 filed by Austin Hickle.(Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Texas Bar letter of good standing
Friday, September 27, 2024
7 7 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 9:55 AM
Order by Judge Susan Illston granting 6 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Heather Hersh.(ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Fri 09/27 9:24 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19829128.) Filing fee previously paid on 09/10/2024 filed by Austin Hickle.(Hersh, Heather)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Texas Bar letter of good standing
utility Electronic Filing Error Fri 09/27 9:50 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. [err201]This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re:5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19829128.) filed by Austin Hickle. Counsel failed to attach the Certificate of Good Standing. Please refile in its entirety. Reference receipt number when refiling. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/10 11:37 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19829128.) filed by Austin Hickle. (Jaffer, Shawn)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Tue 09/10 10:58 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Case Management Statement due by 1/3/2025. Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/10/2025 02:30 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only.(far, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording
utility Electronic Filing Error Tue 09/10 12:04 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect PDF attached. [err201] No Certificate of Good Standing was submitted with the Application. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office.Please re-file in its entirety. Re: 5 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 328, receipt number ACANDC-19829128.) filed by Austin Hickle. Please reference receipt number when refiling. (ec, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 09/09 4:12 PM
Case assigned to Judge Susan Illston. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (ark, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 09/09 4:03 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Austin Hickle (Gramajo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 09/09 4:02 PM
COMPLAINT against Inflection Risk Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19826268.). Filed by Austin Hickle.(Gramajo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet