Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Sim Lake
Case #: 4:24-cv-03353
Nature of Suit899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 4:08 AM CST
Conflict Check Party
ABM Industries Incorporated
Conflict Check Party
BlackRock, Inc.
Defendant
Willow Eden Fort (in her official capacity as an Administrative Law Judge of the U.S. Dept.of Labor)
Represented By
Lisa Luz Parker
Doj-Usao
contact info
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Michele Hodge (in official capacity as Acting Director of the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs, U.S. Dept of Labor)
Represented By
Lisa Luz Parker
Doj-Usao
contact info
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs (an administrative subdivision of the U.S. Dept. of Labor)
Represented By
Lisa Luz Parker
Doj-Usao
contact info
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
Julie Su (in Official Capacity as Acting Secretary of Labor)
Represented By
Lisa Luz Parker
Doj-Usao
contact info
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Defendant
United States Department of Labor
Represented By
Lisa Luz Parker
Doj-Usao
contact info
Shawn David Ren
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Plaintiff
ABM Industry Groups, LLC
Represented By
Alexa L Morgan
Fox Wang Morgan P.C.
contact info
Michael E Kenneally
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius Llp - Dc Office
contact info
John C. Fox
Fox Wang Morgan P.C.
contact info
Catherine Lynn Eschbach
Morgan Lewis Bockius LLP
contact info
Jay J Wang
Fox Wang Morgan P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/28/2024 2:38 PM CST
Monday, September 09, 2024
Referral Judge Selected: Magistrate Judge Christina A. Bryan randomly selected to receive referrals. The selected Magistrate Judge is not assigned to this case until a District Judge refers the case or a motion or the parties consent to jurisdiction of the Magistrate Judge. Once a referral has been made, the name of the referral judge will appear at the top of the docket sheet. (hlc4)
Related: [-]
1 1 18 pgs COMPLAINT against Willow Eden Fort (in her official capacity as an Administrative Law Judge of the U.S. Dept.of Labor), Michele Hodge (in official capacity as Acting Director of the Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs, U.S. Dept of Labor), Office of Federal Contract Compliance Programs (an administrative subdivision of the U.S. Dept. of Labor), Julie Su (in Official Capacity as Acting Secretary of Labor), United States Department of Labor (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXSDC-32157540) filed by ABM Industry Groups, LLC. (Eschbach, Catherine)
Related: [-]
2 2 Civil Cover Sheet for Complaint by ABM Industry Groups, LLC, filed. (Eschbach, Catherine)
Related: [-]
3 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABM Industry Groups, LLC identifying ABM Industries Incorporated; BlackRock, Inc. owning 10% or more of ABM Industries Incorporated stock as Corporate Parent, filed. (Eschbach, Catherine)
Related: [-]
4 4 Request for Issuance of Summons as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney - Southern District of Texas, filed. (Eschbach, Catherine)
Related: [-]
5 5 CLERKS NOTICE Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Parties notified, filed. (hlc4)
Related: [-]