California Central District Court
Judge:Michelle Williams Court
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:24-cv-07693
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 1:31 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd
Represented By
Elizabeth A. Alquist
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Caitlin M. Barrett
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
William A. White
Hill Farrer And Burrill LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Moose Toys LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth A. Alquist
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Caitlin M. Barrett
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
William A. White
Hill Farrer And Burrill LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Zuru, LLC
Represented By
Rachel Gillespie
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Jean-Paul Ciardullo
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Defendant
Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd
Represented By
Elizabeth A. Alquist
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Caitlin M. Barrett
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
William A. White
Hill Farrer And Burrill LLP
contact info
Defendant
Moose Toys LLC
Represented By
Elizabeth A. Alquist
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
Caitlin M. Barrett
Day Pitney LLP
contact info
William A. White
Hill Farrer And Burrill LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Zuru, LLC
Represented By
Rachel Gillespie
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info
Jean-Paul Ciardullo
Foley And Lardner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, January 27, 2025
39 39 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/27 9:47 AM
ORDER by Judge Michelle Williams Court: finding as moot36 ; granting38 Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Gillespie APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru, LLC, designating Jean-Paul Ciardullo as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
38 38 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Fri 01/24 11:51 AM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Gillespie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 10/23/2024, Receipt No. ACACDC-38968440) filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
37 37 notice Notice of Deficiency in Electronically filed Pro Hac Vice Application (G-112C) - optional html form Fri 01/24 11:19 AM
NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Gillespie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38968440)36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. (sbou)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
36 36 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Thu 01/23 3:56 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Rachel Gillespie to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Zuru, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38968440) filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
35 35 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 1) (Judge) (ADR-12) Wed 01/22 3:40 PM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 1 by Judge Michelle Williams Court. Case ordered to Magistrate Judge for Settlement Conference. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 10/24/2025. (yl)
Related: [-]
34 34 19 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Wed 01/22 3:32 PM
CIVIL TRIAL ORDER by Judge Michelle Williams Court. The Scheduling Order governing this action is set forth in the Schedule of Pretrial and Trial Dates chart. The parties should refer to the Court's Standing Order for requirements regarding specific motions, discovery, certain types of filings, courtesy copies, emailing signature items to Chambers, alternative dispute resolution, and other matters pertaining to all cases. The jury trial is set for January 12, 2026 at 8:30 a.m. The final pretrial conference is set for January 2, 2026 at 1:30 p.m. The last date to amend pleadings or add parties is March 14, 2025.The last date to hear motions is October 10, 2025. The discovery cut-off is July 18, 2025. The last date to conduct settlement conference is July 18, 2025. Stipulations extending dates set by the Court are not effective unless approved by the Court, and without compelling factual support and a showing of due diligence, stipulations continuing dates set by the Court will be denied. IT IS SO ORDERED. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]
33 33 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 01/21 4:47 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Michelle W. Court: The Court has considered the parties' Joint Rule 16(b)/26(f) Report with respect to the Scheduling Conference and has concluded that the hearing on January 31, 2025 is not necessary. Accordingly, the Scheduling Conference is taken off calendar and under submission. No appearance by counsel is necessary. A separate order will issue setting the deadlines and dates for this case. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tj)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
32 32 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 01/17 5:53 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC.. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
31 31 notice Deficiency in Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form Wed 12/11 8:44 AM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronic Filed Document regarding Answer to Complain t30 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7-1.1 No notice of interested parties. Other error(s) with document(s): Counsel shall file the notice on or before 12/13/24. Failure to file the notice may result in the document being stricken. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
30 30 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/06 3:59 PM
ANSWER to Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Counterclaim,27 JURY DEMAND. (Zuru LLC's Answer to Defendants' Counterclaims) filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC.(Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
29 29 9 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Mon 11/25 2:49 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Michelle Williams Court. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This matter is set for a Scheduling Conference on JANUARY 31, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 6A of the First Street Courthouse, 350 West First Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012. (et)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
28 28 12 pgs order Order Wed 11/20 3:48 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Michelle Williams Court. (yl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
27 27 answer Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Counterclaim Fri 11/15 5:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 with JURY DEMAND , COUNTERCLAIM against Zuru, LLC filed by Defendants Moose Toys LLC, Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd.(White, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A to Counterclaims
26 26 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/15 10:19 AM
ORDER by Honorable Michelle Williams Court: granting24 Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin M. Barrett APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, Moose Toys LLC, designating William A. White as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
25 25 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/15 10:16 AM
ORDER by Honorable Michelle Williams Court: granting23 Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. Alquist APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, Moose Toys LLC, designating William A. White as local counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY (sbou)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 11/13 4:19 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Caitlin M. Barrett to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, Moose Toys LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38575401) filed by Defendant Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, Moose Toys LLC. (White, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice (G-64) Wed 11/13 4:13 PM
APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Elizabeth A. Alquist to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, Moose Toys LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-38575232) filed by Defendant Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, Moose Toys LLC. (White, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
22 22 cs_rasgn Chief District Judge Transferring Case Tue 11/12 10:45 PM
ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE ( 24-0166 approved by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Michelle Williams Court, this case is transferred from Judge Hernan D. Vera to the calendar of Honorable Michelle Williams Court for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:24-cv-07693 MWC(KSx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
21 21 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/01 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, identifying Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd, Defendant; Moose Creative Pty Ltd, Owner of Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd. (Attorney William A. White added to party Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd(pty:dft))(White, William)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 11/01 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Moose Toys LLC, identifying Moose Toys LLC, Defendant; MTHU LLC, Member of Moose Toys LLC; MTTUS Pty Ltd., Member of MTHU LLC Parent; MTHA Pty Ltd., of MTTUS Pty Ltd. (Attorney William A. White added to party Moose Toys LLC(pty:dft))(White, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
17 17 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 09/16 9:11 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER by Judge Hernan D. Vera. (wm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
16 16 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 09/12 5:41 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC, upon Defendant Moose Toys LLC served on 9/12/2024, answer due 10/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Authorized Agent for Service of Process, By serving Jessie Gastelum - authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Thu 09/12 5:36 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC, upon Defendant Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd served on 9/12/2024, answer due 10/3/2024. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation System, Authorized Agent for Service of Process, By serving Jessie Gastelum - authorized person to accept service of process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
14 14 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/10 9:58 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Moose Toys LLC. (et)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 09/10 9:57 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Moose Creative Management Pty Ltd. (et)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 09/10 9:55 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et)
Related: [-]
11 11 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 09/10 9:54 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 09/10 9:54 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Hernan D. Vera and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (et)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Errata Tue 09/10 9:17 AM
NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. correcting Summons Request3 (please use replacement version at Dkt. 8) (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
8 8 notice Summons Request Mon 09/09 11:12 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification) (AO 120) Mon 09/09 11:08 PM
REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Zuru, LLC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 09/09 11:07 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC identifying Zuru, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 09/09 11:06 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC, identifying Zuru, Inc., Defendants. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 09/09 11:02 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Summons Request Mon 09/09 11:01 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 09/09 10:59 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. (Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 09/09 10:57 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-38180219 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Zuru, LLC. (Attorney Jean-Paul Ciardullo added to party Zuru, LLC(pty:pla))(Ciardullo, Jean-Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter