Vanegas et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-04907 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Sep 09, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 08, 2025 4:57 AM EST |
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions, LP
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Innotex Corp
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
L.N. Curtis and Sons
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallory Safety and Supply LLC
|
|
Defendant
Milliken & Company
|
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Municipal Emergency Services, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Co
|
|
Defendant
National Foam, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ricochet Manufacturing Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Safety Components Fabric Technologies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Southern Mills, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corp., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corp
|
|
Defendant
Veridian Limited
|
|
Defendant
W.L. Gore & Associates, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Witmer Public Safety Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allstar Fire Equipment Co.
|
|
Defendant
Amerex Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
CB Garment, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Fire & Security Americas Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Daikin America, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corp.
|
|
Defendant
E.I. Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Fire-Dex, LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Francy Alexa Vanegas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mario Arturo Vanegas
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Tue 09/10 9:33 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 09/9/2024), Vanegas et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-04907-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Southern District of Texas (wmil) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (wmil) |
|
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11980205.), filed by Mario Arturo Vanegas, Francy Alexa Vanegas. Service due by 12/9/2024 (wmil) |