California Southern District Court
Judge:M James Lorenz
Referred: Michelle M Pettit
Case #: 3:24-cv-01610
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332ij Diversity-Injunctive & Declaratory Relief
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Terminated:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 1:22 AM PST
Counter Claimant
Aqua Adventures, Inc.
Represented By
Cheryl Dunn Soto
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Joshua D. Franklin
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Counter Claimant
Craig Seering
Represented By
Cheryl Dunn Soto
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Joshua D. Franklin
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Counter Defendant
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Kristina Anne Fretwell
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman & Moore LLP
contact info
Sheryl W Leichenger
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman & Moore LLP
contact info
Defendant
Aqua Adventures, Inc.
Represented By
Cheryl Dunn Soto
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Joshua D. Franklin
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 10
Defendant
Eric Meech
Represented By
Joseph Y. Avrahamy
Law Offices Of Joseph Y. Avrahamy
contact info
Defendant
Craig Seering
Represented By
Cheryl Dunn Soto
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Joshua D. Franklin
Franklin Soto Leeds LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Scottsdale Insurance Company
Represented By
Kristina Anne Fretwell
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman & Moore LLP
contact info
Sheryl W Leichenger
Selman Leichenger Edson Hsu Newman & Moore LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, March 17, 2025
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 03/17 10:30 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 03/17/2025. (mjw)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Dismiss Mon 03/17 9:32 AM
Joint MOTION to Dismiss Entire Action by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Fretwell, Kristina) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
20 20 minutes ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 03/05 10:55 AM
MINUTE ORDER : Before the Court is the parties' Joint Status Report [ECF No.19 ]. In that Status Report, the parties request the Court continue the deadline for the parties to file a Joint Motion to Dismiss. As requested, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the parties' request. The Court now SETS the deadline to file a Joint Motion to Dismiss as March 17, 2025 . The Court VACATES the Settlement Disposition Conference (SDC) currently set for March 6, 2025. The Court RESETS the SDC for March 18, 2025 , at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. For purposes of the SDC, the parties shall jointly call the undersigned's Chambers line. If a Joint Motion to Dismiss is timely filed, the SDC will be vacated without further court order or action by the parties. IT IS SO ORDERED by the Honorable Michelle M. Pettit on March 5, 2025. (no document attached) (lah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
19 19 misc Status Report Mon 03/03 3:33 PM
STATUS REPORT by Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2025
18 18 minutes ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/03 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER : The parties filed a Joint Notice of Settlement [ECF No.17 ] indicating they have settled this matter. Accordingly, the parties shall file a Joint Motion to Dismiss no later than March 3, 2025 . The Court SETS a telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference (SDC) on March 6, 2025 , at 9:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. For purposes of the SDC, the parties shall jointly call the undersigned's Chambers line. If a Joint Motion to Dismiss is timely filed, the SDC will be vacated without further court order or action by the parties. The parties also request to vacate the deadline for Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Scottsdale to respond to the counterclaim [ECF No.16 ]. For good cause, the Court GRANTS the request and VACATES Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Scottsdale's deadline to respond to the counterclaim while the parties effectuate the settlement. IT IS SO ORDERED by the Honorable Michelle M. Pettit on January 3, 2025. (no document attached) (lah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
17 17 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 01/02 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Scottsdale Insurance Company (Fretwell, Kristina) (dim)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Status Report Thu 01/02 1:43 PM
STATUS REPORT by Scottsdale Insurance Company, Aqua Adventures, Inc., Craig Seering, Eric Meech, Does 1 through 10. (Soto, Cheryl) (dim)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 15, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 11/15 4:46 PM
MINUTE ORDER : The Court GRANTS the parties Joint Motion to Continue ENE and CMC [ECF No. 14]. Accordingly, the Court VACATES its Notice and Order for ENE and CMC [ECF. No. 12]. A new Notice and Order for ENE and CMC will be docketed by separate entry. The parties SHALL file a Status Report on or before January 3, 2024 . Plaintiff/Counter-Defendant Scottsdale Insurance Company SHALL respond to the Counterclaim [ECF No. 13] on or before January 8, 2024 . IT IS SO ORDERED by the Honorable Michelle M. Pettit on November 15, 2024. (no document attached) (lah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
14 14 motion Continue Thu 11/14 4:31 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue ENE and CMC by Aqua Adventures, Inc.. (Soto, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Complaint Counterclaim Thu 10/31 5:19 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Scottsdale Insurance Company by Aqua Adventures, Inc., Craig Seering.(Soto, Cheryl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Thursday, October 17, 2024
12 12 10 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Thu 10/17 2:56 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/17/2024.(ddf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/08 10:00 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Eric Meech.(Avrahamy, Joseph)Attorney Joseph Y. Avrahamy added to party Eric Meech(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/04 2:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua D. Franklin on behalf of Aqua Adventures, Inc., Craig Seering (Franklin, Joshua)Attorney Joshua D. Franklin added to party Aqua Adventures, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joshua D. Franklin added to party Craig Seering(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
9 9 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 10/03 9:59 AM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 10/3/2024. (jms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/02 3:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Aqua Adventures, Inc., Craig Seering. (Soto, Cheryl)Attorney Cheryl Dunn Soto added to party Aqua Adventures, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Cheryl Dunn Soto added to party Craig Seering(pty:dft) (jms)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 10/02 3:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Aqua Adventures, Inc., Craig Seering. (Soto, Cheryl) (jms)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/23 9:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Craig Seering served. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 09/23 9:28 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Aqua Adventures, Inc. served. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
4 4 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 09/19 2:44 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. Eric Meech served. (Fretwell, Kristina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/10 2:04 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Scottsdale Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Scottsdale Insurance Company. (Fretwell, Kristina) (dim)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 11:03 AM
Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axi) (anh)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/10 10:57 AM
COMPLAINT against Aqua Adventures, Inc., Does 1 through 10, Eric Meech, Craig Seering ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-19169783.), filed by Scottsdale Insurance Company. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1610-L-MMP. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit are assigned to the case. (Fretwell, Kristina)(axi) (anh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D