Delaware District Court
Judge:Richard G Andrews
Case #: 1:24-cv-01022
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Sep 10, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 09, 2025 5:31 AM EDT
Defendant
Lebronze Alloys
Represented By
Jonathan Barbee
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth K. Clarke
contact info
Bonnie St. Charles
contact info
Benoit Quarmby
contact info
Defendant
Lebronze Alloys North America LLC
Represented By
Jonathan Barbee
contact info
Alexandra M. Joyce
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Daniel M. Silver
Mccarter & English, LLP
contact info
Elizabeth K. Clarke
contact info
Bonnie St. Charles
contact info
Benoit Quarmby
contact info
Plaintiff
Materion Corporation
Represented By
Aaron S. Lukas
contact info
William B. Coblentz
contact info
Kaan Ekiner
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Barry P. Golob
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
24 24 notice Notice re Attorney Appearance - Requesting Removal of Co-Counsel Tue 05/06 10:40 AM
NOTICE requesting Clerk to remove Jonathan Barbee as co-counsel.. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
23 23 respm Brief - Reply Tue 03/04 12:23 PM
REPLY BRIEF re13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
22 22 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Thu 02/13 11:11 AM
ORDER re21 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re13 MOTION to Dismiss. Reply Brief due 3/4/2025). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/13/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
21 21 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Wed 02/12 9:54 AM
STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to file Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss to March 4, 2025 - filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
20 20 respm Brief - Answering Brief in Opposition Mon 02/10 4:38 PM
ANSWERING BRIEF in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Materion Corporation.Reply Brief due date per Local Rules is 2/18/2025. (Ekiner, Kaan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 02/05 4:35 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney William B. Coblentz,Barry P. Golob,Aaron S. Lukas for Materion Corporation added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (scs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
19 19 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Tue 02/04 4:06 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for W. Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas, and Barry P. Golob. ( re18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas, and Barry P. Golob )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4607183).(Ekiner, Kaan)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 02/04 4:05 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas, and Barry P. Golob - filed by Materion Corporation. (Ekiner, Kaan)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Tue 02/04 4:09 PM
SO ORDERED, re18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney W. Blake Coblentz, Aaron S. Lukas, and Barry P. Golob filed by Materion Corporation. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2025. (aas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
17 17 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 01/23 9:47 AM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Materion Corporation. (Ekiner, Kaan) Modified on 1/23/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Thu 01/23 1:13 PM
SO ORDERED, re17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re13 MOTION to Dismiss. Answering Brief due 2/10/2025). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/23/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Thu 01/02 12:09 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Materion Corporation. (Ekiner, Kaan) Modified on 1/2/2025 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set Briefing Schedule - open,ans,reply,surreply Thu 01/02 1:06 PM
SO ORDERED, re16 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Briefing Schedule: re13 MOTION to Dismiss (Answering Brief due 1/27/2025). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/2/2025. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
15 15 misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Mon 12/23 11:43 AM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent LBI North America, Corporate Parent Vista Metals, Inc. for Lebronze Alloys North America LLC; Corporate Parent Financiere LBA for Lebronze Alloys filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
14 14 respm Brief - Opening Brief in Support Mon 12/23 11:36 AM
OPENING BRIEF in Support re13 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. Answering Brief/Response due date per Local Rules is 1/6/2025. (Joyce, Alexandra) Modified on 12/23/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss/Fail to State Claim Mon 12/23 11:34 AM
MOTION to Dismiss - filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC.(Joyce, Alexandra) Modified on 12/23/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
12 12 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 01 Attorney Credit Card Payment Wed 11/13 2:13 PM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Bonnie St. Charles. ( re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bonnie St. Charles )( Payment of $ 50, receipt number ADEDC-4547167).(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/13 2:10 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bonnie St. Charles - filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Wed 11/13 2:21 PM
SO ORDERED, re11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Bonnie St. Charles, filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 11/13/2024. (aas)
Related: [-]
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Wed 11/13 4:44 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Bonnie St. Charles for Lebronze Alloys,Bonnie St. Charles for Lebronze Alloys North America LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (oam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
utility Add Attorneys - PHV only Thu 10/10 3:00 PM
Pro Hac Vice Attorney Benoit Quarmby, Jonathan Barbee, Elizabeth K. Clarke for Lebronze Alloys and Lebronze Alloys North America LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (cdd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
10 10 misc -District Court Pro Hac Vice Fee - 03 Attorneys Credit Card Payment Thu 10/03 11:57 AM
Pro Hac Vice Fee - Credit Card Payment received for Benoit Quarmby, Elizabeth Clarke, and Jonathan Barbee. ( re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benoit Quarmby, Elizabeth Clarke, and Jonathan Barbee )( Payment of $ 150, receipt number ADEDC-4514679).(Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 10/03 11:49 AM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benoit Quarmby, Elizabeth Clarke, and Jonathan Barbee - filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. (Joyce, Alexandra)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED Thu 10/03 12:19 PM
SO ORDERED, re9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney Benoit Quarmby, Elizabeth Clarke, and Jonathan Barbee, filed by Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 10/3/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 motion Stipulation to EXTEND Time Mon 09/30 12:17 PM
STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time - filed by Materion Corporation. (Ekiner, Kaan) Modified on 9/30/2024 (nms)
Related: [-]
order SO ORDERED ~Util - Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 09/30 1:06 PM
SO ORDERED, re8 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Extend Time (*Reset Answer Deadlines: Lebronze Alloys North America LLC answer due 12/23/2024). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 9/30/2024. (nms)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
7 7 service Waiver of Service Executed - 60 day ddl Wed 09/25 12:00 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Materion Corporation: For Lebronze Alloys waiver sent on 9/24/2024, answer due 12/23/2024. (Ekiner, Kaan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 09/18 12:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Richard G. Andrews. Please include the initials of the Judge (RGA) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 09/13 1:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Materion Corporation.Lebronze Alloys North America LLC served on 9/11/2024, answer due 10/2/2024. (Ekiner, Kaan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 3:41 PM
Summons Issued as to Lebronze Alloys on 9/10/2024; Lebronze Alloys North America LLC on 9/10/2024.(mws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
4 4 1 pgs misc Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1 Tue 09/10 3:38 PM
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Other Affiliate BlackRock, Inc., Other Affiliate BlackRock Fund Advisors for Materion Corporation filed by Materion Corporation. (mws)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs misc Patent/Trademark Report to Commissioner of Patents Tue 09/10 3:35 PM
Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 10,858,723; US 11,008,818; US 10,190,201. (mws)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs misc Magistrate Consent Forms Tue 09/10 3:33 PM
Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (mws)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 09/10 3:33 PM
COMPLAINT for PATENT INFRINGEMENT filed with Jury Demand against Lebronze Alloys, Lebronze Alloys North America LLC (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ADEDC-4495180.) - filed by Materion Corporation.(mws)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Exhibit A,
Att: 2 22 pgs Exhibit B,
Att: 3 7 pgs Exhibit C,
Att: 4 5 pgs Exhibit D,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit E,
Att: 6 5 pgs Exhibit F,
Att: 7 9 pgs Exhibit G,
Att: 8 3 pgs Exhibit H,
Att: 9 5 pgs Exhibit I,
Att: 10 4 pgs Exhibit J,
Att: 11 4 pgs Exhibit K,
Att: 12 3 pgs Exhibit L,
Att: 13 9 pgs Exhibit M,
Att: 14 5 pgs Exhibit N,
Att: 15 2 pgs Exhibit O,
Att: 16 3 pgs Exhibit P,
Att: 17 2 pgs Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 4 pgs Exhibit R,
Att: 19 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet