New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Leda D Wettre
Case #: 2:24-cv-09055
Nature of Suit880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA)
Cause18:1836(b) Civil Action to Protect Trade Secrets
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024
Terminated:Nov 25, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 05, 2025 4:54 AM EST
Defendant
SCOTT MORAN
Represented By
VINCENT NATHANIEL BARBERA
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Plaintiff
BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC.
Represented By
PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
THE BRINK'S COMPANY
Represented By
PHILIP ANDREW GOLDSTEIN
Mcguire Woods LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, November 25, 2024
35 35 1 pgs order Order of Dismissal Wed 11/27 12:57 PM
NOTICE & ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL with prejudice. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 11/25/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
34 34 2 pgs notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (aty) Fri 11/22 8:58 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
33 33 1 pgs order Order Fri 11/01 4:46 PM
LETTER ORDER granting four-week extension of deadlines. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 11/1/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 31, 2024
32 32 misc Letter Thu 10/31 3:11 PM
Letter from Philip A. Goldstein re: Request to Extend Deadlines/Adjourn Motion Date. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Tue 10/22 1:54 PM
Answer Due Deadline Update - The document30 submitted by SCOTT MORAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 11/4/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
31 31 2 pgs order Order Tue 10/22 1:52 PM
LETTER ORDER granting defendant's request for an additional extension of time through 11/4/2024 for Mr. Moran to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 10/21/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Fri 10/18 4:05 PM
Letter re1 Complaint,,,5 Application/Petition,,,. (BARBERA, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
29 29 2 pgs order Order Mon 10/07 4:35 PM
LETTER ORDER granting extension of time to respond to petition through 10/21/2024. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 10/7/2024. (lag, )
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
28 28 misc Letter Fri 10/04 8:20 PM
Letter re5 Application/Petition,,,. (BARBERA, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
utility Update Answer Due Deadline Fri 10/04 10:44 AM
Clerk`s Text Order - The document submitted by SCOTT MORAN has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/21/2024. (sm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion to Seal Thu 10/03 6:14 PM
ORDER terminating24 Motion to Seal - The Court is in receipt of plaintiffs' Motion to Seal portions of the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and supporting exhibits (ECF24 ). In accordance with Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)(ii), a Motion to Seal shall be filed "within 14 days following completion of the briefing on the underlying motion of materials sought to be sealed." Accordingly, the Motion to Seal is terminated without prejudice, and the parties shall file an omnibus Motion to Seal once the Motion for Preliminary Injunction is fully briefed. The Motion for Preliminary Injunction and supporting exhibits (ECF5 ) shall remain under temporary seal pending the outcome of the renewed Motion to Seal. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 10/3/2024. (rn)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Application/Petition Thu 10/03 4:15 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for Extension of Time for by SCOTT MORAN. (BARBERA, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 10/03 4:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by VINCENT NATHANIEL BARBERA on behalf of SCOTT MORAN (BARBERA, VINCENT)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 09/30 11:00 AM
Set Deadlines as to24 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 10/21/2024 before Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
24 24 motion Seal Fri 09/27 12:46 PM
MOTION to Seal by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY.(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Philip A. Goldstein,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Index,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
23 23 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:35 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Exhibit 3 to Goldstein Declaration by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:34 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Exhibit 2 to Goldstein Declaration by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:33 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Exhibit 1 to Goldstein Declaration by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:31 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Declaration of Philip A. Goldstein by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:30 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Exhibit 3 to Powell Declaration by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:29 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Exhibit 2 to Powell Declaration by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
17 17 134 pgs misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:28 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Exhibit 1 to Powell Declaration by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
16 16 12 pgs misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:26 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Declaration of Jamal Powell by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/27 11:25 AM
REDACTION to5 Application/Petition,,, Memorandum of Law in Support by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 09/24 1:33 PM
Set Deadlines as to13 MOTION to Seal . Motion set for 10/21/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
14 14 service Certificate of Service Fri 09/20 4:21 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY re 8 Order,, (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Seal Fri 09/20 3:21 PM
MOTION to Seal by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY.(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Index,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Unreported Cases,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
12 12 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/20 2:54 PM
REDACTION to9 Redacted Document,1 Complaint,,, Exhibit F to Complaint Related [+] by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-] dacted
11 11 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/20 2:53 PM
REDACTION to9 Redacted Document,1 Complaint,,, Exhibit E to Complaint Related [+] by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-] dacted
10 10 misc Redacted Document Fri 09/20 2:52 PM
REDACTION to9 Redacted Document,1 Complaint,,, Exhibit C to Complaint Related [+] by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-] dacted
9 9 31 pgs misc Redacted Document Fri 09/20 2:50 PM
REDACTION to1 Complaint,,, Complaint Related [+] by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-] dacted
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
8 8 order Order Wed 09/18 7:42 AM
TEXT ORDER - The Court has considered Plaintiff's ex-parte application for an OTSC for Preliminary Injunction. (ECF Nos.5 -6 .) The request is DENIED for failure to meet the heightened standards of Fed. R. Civ. P. 65. Plaintiff has failed to make a clear and specific showing of good and sufficient reasons why expedited treatment is warranted. L. Civ. R. 65.1(a). The Clerk of Court is directed to file the application, which will be treated as a motion, to which Defendant can respond in the normal course. So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 9/18/2024. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 09/17 8:48 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. SCOTT MORAN served on 9/16/2024, answer due 10/7/2024. (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
6 6 service Certificate of Service Mon 09/16 3:51 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY re5 Application/Petition,,, (GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Application/Petition Mon 09/16 3:49 PM
APPLICATION/PETITION for a Preliminary Injunction for by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY.(GOLDSTEIN, PHILIP) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Law in Support,
Att: 2 Declaration in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2,
Att: 5 Exhibit 3,
Att: 6 Declaration in Support,
Att: 7 Exhibit 1,
Att: 8 Exhibit 2,
Att: 9 Exhibit 3,
Att: 10 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order,
Att: 11 Proposed Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 09/11 8:36 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
4 4 service Summons Issued Tue 09/10 4:49 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to SCOTT MORAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
3 3 misc Statement 7.1.1 Third Party Funding Tue 09/10 4:48 PM
Third Party Litigation Funding disclosure statement pursuant to L.Civ.R 7.1.1(a)(1-3) filed by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY. (jr)
Related: [-]
2 2 2 pgs misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 09/10 4:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC. identifying BRINK'S SECURITY INTERNATIONAL, INC. as Corporate Parent, and by THE BRINK'S COMPANY identifying that BlackRock Inc. owns more than 10% of corporate stock. (jr)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/10 4:39 PM
COMPLAINT against SCOTT MORAN ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number NEW50807) with JURY DEMAND, filed by BRINK'S GLOBAL SERVICES USA, INC., THE BRINK'S COMPANY.(jr) NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Counsel is advised that pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.3(c)(2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Civil Cover Sheet